Elena Sturdza v. United Arab Emirates, et al Featured Case
Plaintiff - Appellant: Elena Sturdza
Defendant - Appellee: United Arab Emirates and Vasilios Demetriou, Personal Representative of the Estate of Angelos C. Demetriou
Case Number: 10-7054
Filed: April 29, 2010
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2011 Filing 33 PER CURIAM ORDER filed [SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS] [1285732] denying motion to clarify [1270516-2], FURTHER ORDERED, on the court's own motion, that the court will dispose of the appeal without oral argument on the basis of the record and presentations in the briefs pursuant to Fed. R. App. 34(a)(2); D.C.Cir.Rule 34(j). Before Judges: Ginsburg, Tatel and Brown. [10-7054]
November 15, 2010 Filing 32 NOTICE FILED [1277336] by Vasilios Demetriou advising that a brief will not be filed. [Service Date: 11/15/2010 ] [10-7054]
October 22, 2010 PER ABOVE ORDER lodged appendix [1269468-2] is filed [10-7054]
October 22, 2010 Filing 30 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1273285] granting motion for leave to file [1270515-2]; The Clerk is directed to file appendix [1269468-2] [10-7054]
October 8, 2010 Filing 29 MOTION filed [1270516] by Elena Sturdza to clarify order , order failure warning, order order by cert/1st class mail, order initial submissions for appellant/petitioner, order initial submissions for appellee/respondent [1270516-2] (Response to Motion served by mail due on 10/21/2010) [Service Date: 10/08/2010 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [10-7054]
October 8, 2010 Filing 28 MOTION filed [1270515] by Elena Sturdza for leave to file appendix (Response to Motion served by mail due on 10/21/2010) [Service Date: 10/08/2010 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [10-7054]
October 1, 2010 Filing 27 MODIFIED EVENT FROM FILED TO LODGED--APPENDIX [1269468] filed [Volumes: 1] [Service Date: 10/01/2010] [10-7054]--[Edited 10/06/2010 by KRM]
September 23, 2010 Filing 26 APPELLANT BRIEF [1267778] filed by Elena Sturdza [Service Date: 09/23/2010 ] Length of Brief: 11,578 words. [10-7054]
August 11, 2010 Filing 25 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1260094] setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 09/23/2010. Appendix due 09/23/2010. APPELLEE Brief due on 10/25/2010. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 11/08/2010 [10-7054]
June 29, 2010 Filing 24 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1252558] by Elena Sturdza [Service Date: 06/29/2010 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - All transcripts needed for the appeal have been completed and received. [10-7054]
June 29, 2010 Filing 23 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1252557] by Elena Sturdza [Service Date: 06/29/2010 ] [10-7054]
June 16, 2010 Filing 22 CORRECTED CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1250075] by Elena Sturdza [Service Date: 06/15/2010 ] [10-7054]
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE submitted [1250074] by Elena Sturdza [Service Date: 06/15/2010 ] [10-7054]
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE submitted [1250073] by Elena Sturdza [Service Date: 06/15/2010 ] [10-7054]
June 15, 2010 Filing 19 AMENDED CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1250072] by Elena Sturdza [Service Date: 06/15/2010 ] [10-7054]
June 10, 2010 Filing 18 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1249173] granting motion to permit pro se electronic filing [1246091-2] [10-7054]
June 10, 2010 Filing 17 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1249172] dismissing as moot motion for exemption from electronic access fees [1246092-2] [10-7054]
June 9, 2010 Filing 16 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1249045] by John A. King and co-counsel Patrick James Attridge on behalf of Appellee Vasilios Demetriou. [10-7054]
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE submitted [1249044] by Elena Sturdza [Service Date: 06/09/2010 ] [10-7054]
June 9, 2010 Filing 14 INCORRECT DOCKET ENTRY-DISREGARD--TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1249043] by Elena Sturdza [Service Date: 06/09/2010 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - All transcripts needed for the appeal have been completed and received. [10-7054]--[Edited 06/16/2010 by KRM]
June 9, 2010 Filing 13 INCORRECT DOCKET ENTRY-DISREGARD--ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1249041] by Elena Sturdza Pro Se on behalf of Appellant Elena Sturdza. [10-7054]--[Edited 06/16/2010 by KRM]
June 9, 2010 Filing 12 INCORRECT DOCKET ENTRY-DISREGARD--DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1249040] by Elena Sturdza [Service Date: 06/09/2010 ] [10-7054]--[Edited 06/16/2010 by KRM]
June 9, 2010 Filing 11 AMENDED CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1249038] by Elena Sturdza [Service Date: 06/09/2010 ] [10-7054]
June 9, 2010 Filing 10 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1249031] by Elena Sturdza [Service Date: 06/09/2010 ] [10-7054]
June 9, 2010 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1249018] by Elena Sturdza [Service Date: 06/09/2010 ] [10-7054]
May 22, 2010 Filing 8 MODIFIED DOCKET TEXT--MOTION filed [1246092] by Elena Sturdza requesting waiver of PACER fees [Service Date: 05/22/2010 by email] Pages: 1-10. [10-7054]--[Edited 05/25/2010 by KRM]
May 22, 2010 Filing 7 MOTION filed [1246091] by Elena Sturdza to permit pro se electronic filing (Response to Motion served by mail due on 06/04/2010) [Service Date: 05/22/2010 by email] Pages: 1-10. [10-7054]
May 13, 2010 Filing 6 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT [1244925] RECEIVED from Elena Sturdza [signed for on 05/11/2010] for order [1243907-2] sent to Appellant Elena Sturdza [10-7054]
May 10, 2010 FIRST CLASS MAIL SENT [1243912] of order [1243888-2] to appellant [10-7054]
May 10, 2010 CERTIFIED MAIL SENT [1243907] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.7007-0710-0004-7189-8672] of order [1243888-2]. Certified Mail Receipt due 06/09/2010 from Elena Sturdza. [10-7054]
May 10, 2010 Filing 3 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1243888] directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 06/09/2010. APPELLANT certificate as to parties, etc. due 06/09/2010. APPELLANT statement of issues due 06/09/2010. APPELLANT underlying decision due 06/09/2010. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 06/09/2010. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 06/09/2010. APPELLANT transcript status report due 06/09/2010. APPELLANT procedural motions due 06/09/2010. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 06/24/2010; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties, etc. due 06/09/2010. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 06/09/2010. APPELLEE procedural motions due 06/09/2010. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 06/24/2010, Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution; The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [10-7054]
April 29, 2010 Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEAL filed [1242496] by Elena Sturdza seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:98-cv-02051-HHK. Assigned USCA Case Number [10-7054]
April 29, 2010 PRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. [10-7054]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Elena Sturdza v. United Arab Emirates, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: Elena Sturdza
Represented By: Elena Sturdza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: United Arab Emirates
Represented By: G. Hamilton Loeb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Vasilios Demetriou, Personal Representative of the Estate of Angelos C. Demetriou
Represented By: John A. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?