Morris Davis v. James Billington, et al Featured Case

Plaintiff - Appellee: Morris D. Davis
Defendant - Appellee: James H. Billington, in his official capacity as the Librarian of Congress
Defendant - Appellant: Daniel P. Mulhollan, in his individual capacity
Case Number: 11-5092
Filed: April 15, 2011
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Jobs

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date FiledDescription
June 1, 2012 Summary Davis v. Billington, et al.

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 3, 2012 TRANSCRIPT [1397875] of oral argument [11-5092]
July 25, 2012 MANDATE ISSUED to Clerk, District Court [11-5092]
July 13, 2012 FIRST CLASS MAIL RETURNED [1383944] marked "Return to Sender - Unable to Forward". Mail had been sent to Attorney Frederick V. Mulhauser for Appellee Morris D. Davis. [11-5092]
July 13, 2012 FIRST CLASS MAIL RETURNED [1383943] marked "Return to Sender - Unable to Forward". Mail had been sent to Attorney Mr. Arthur B. Spitzer for Appellee Morris D. Davis. [11-5092]
June 1, 2012 32 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1376530] withholding issuance of the mandate. [11-5092]
June 1, 2012 31 Featured Case OPINION filed [1376529] (Pages: 19) for the Court by Judge Sentelle, DISSENTING OPINION (Pages: 27) by Judge Rogers [11-5092]
June 1, 2012 30 PER CURIAM JUDGMENT filed [1376528] that the order of the District Court, denying Mulhollan's motion to dismiss, appealed from in this cause is hereby vacated, and the case is remanded with instructions to dismiss Davis's Bivens claims for the reasons in the accompanying opinion . Before Judges: Sentelle, Henderson and Rogers. [11-5092]
November 10, 2011 29 ORAL ARGUMENT HELD before Judges Sentelle, Henderson and Rogers. [11-5092]
November 4, 2011 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Sharon Swingle, on behalf of Appellant Daniel P. Mulhollan. [11-5092] (Swingle, Sharon)
October 31, 2011 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Aden J. Fine, on behalf of Appellee Morris D. Davis. [11-5092] (Fine, Aden)
October 28, 2011 26 PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1338529] allocating oral argument time as follows: Appellant -- 15 Minutes, Appellee -- 15 Minutes. One counsel per side to argue; directing party to file Form 72 notice of arguing attorney - due 11/03/2011 [11-5092]
September 16, 2011 25 APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF [1330023] filed by Daniel P. Mulhollan [Service Date: 09/16/2011 ] Length of Brief: 6,819 words. [11-5092] (Swingle, Sharon)
September 13, 2011 PER ABOVE ORDER lodged Amicus brief [1329211-2] is filed [11-5092]
September 13, 2011 23 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1329315] granting motion of Dr. Louis Fisher and Morton Rosenberg to participate as amicus curiae in support of appellee [1328866-2]; The Clerk is directed to file the lodged amicus brief [1329211-2] [11-5092]
September 9, 2011 22 AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1329211] filed by Louis Fisher and Morton Rosenberg [Service Date: 09/13/2011 ] Length of Brief: 5,609. [11-5092]
September 9, 2011 21 MOTION filed [1328866] by Louis Fisher and Morton Rosenberg to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] [Service Date: 09/09/2011 ] [11-5092]
September 2, 2011 20 APPELLEE BRIEF [1327626] filed by Morris D. Davis [Service Date: 09/02/2011 ] Length of Brief: 13,568 words. [11-5092] (Fine, Aden)
August 16, 2011 19 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1324506] scheduling oral argument before Judges SENTELLE, HENDERSON, ROGERS Thursday, 11/10/2011 AM [11-5092]
August 1, 2011 18 JOINT APPENDIX [1321972] filed [Volumes: 1] [Service Date: 08/01/2011 ] [11-5092] (Swingle, Sharon)
August 1, 2011 17 APPELLANT BRIEF [1321966] filed by Daniel P. Mulhollan [Service Date: 08/01/2011 ] Length of Brief: 13,199 words. [11-5092] (Swingle, Sharon)
July 11, 2011 16 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1317897] granting the joinit motion to extend time to file briefs [1317211-2], The following revised briefing schedule will now apply: APPELLANT Brief due 08/01/2011. Appendix due 08/01/2011. APPELLEE Brief due on 09/02/2011. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 09/16/2011 [11-5092]
July 7, 2011 15 JOINT MOTION filed [1317211] by Daniel P. Mulhollan and Morris D. Davis to extend time to file brief to 08/01/2011. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 07/21/2011) [Service Date: 07/07/2011 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [11-5092] (Fine, Aden)
June 8, 2011 14 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1312254] setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 07/21/2011. Appendix due 07/21/2011. APPELLEE Brief due on 08/22/2011. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 09/06/2011 [11-5092]
May 20, 2011 13 LETTER FILED [1309057] by Daniel P. Mulhollan and James H. Billington to substitute attorney Robert E. Kopp substituted by Sharon Swingle [Service Date: 05/20/2011 ] [11-5092] (Swingle, Sharon)
May 16, 2011 12 Featured Case UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE submitted [1308143] by Daniel P. Mulhollan [Service Date: 05/16/2011 ] [11-5092] (Swingle, Sharon)
May 16, 2011 11 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1308137] by Daniel P. Mulhollan [Service Date: 05/16/2011 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [11-5092] (Swingle, Sharon)
May 16, 2011 10 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1308133] by Daniel P. Mulhollan [Service Date: 05/16/2011 ] [11-5092] (Swingle, Sharon)
May 16, 2011 9 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL FILED [1308130] by Daniel P. Mulhollan [Service Date: 05/16/2011 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [11-5092] (Swingle, Sharon)
May 16, 2011 8 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1308124] by Sharon Swingle and co-counsel Thomas M. Bondy on behalf of Appellant Daniel P. Mulhollan. [11-5092] (Swingle, Sharon)
May 16, 2011 7 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1308123] by Daniel P. Mulhollan [Service Date: 05/16/2011 ] [11-5092] (Swingle, Sharon)
May 16, 2011 6 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1308121] by Daniel P. Mulhollan [Service Date: 05/16/2011 ] [11-5092] (Swingle, Sharon)
May 16, 2011 5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1308095] by Aden J. Fine and co-counsel Arthur Barry Spitzer and Frederick V. Mulhauser on behalf of Appellee Morris D. Davis. [11-5092] (Fine, Aden)
May 16, 2011 4 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1308094] by Morris D. Davis [Service Date: 05/16/2011 ] [11-5092] (Fine, Aden)
April 15, 2011 3 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1303540] directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 05/16/2011. APPELLANT certificate as to parties, etc. due 05/16/2011. APPELLANT statement of issues due 05/16/2011. APPELLANT underlying decision due 05/16/2011. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 05/16/2011. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 05/16/2011. APPELLANT transcript status report due 05/16/2011. APPELLANT procedural motions due 05/16/2011. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 05/31/2011; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties, etc. due 05/16/2011. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 05/16/2011. APPELLEE procedural motions due 05/16/2011. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 05/31/2011 [11-5092]
April 15, 2011 2 NOTICE OF APPEAL filed [1303531] by Daniel P. Mulhollan seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:10-cv-00036-RBW. Assigned USCA Case Number [11-5092]
April 15, 2011 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [11-5092]

Search for this case: Morris Davis v. James Billington, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: Morris D. Davis
Represented By: Frederick V. Mulhauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: James H. Billington, in his official capacity as the Librarian of Congress
Represented By: Robert E. Kopp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: Daniel P. Mulhollan, in his individual capacity
Represented By: Robert E. Kopp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?