Assoc. of Battery Recyclers v. EPA, et al
Petitioner: Association of Battery Recyclers, Inc., Natural Resources Defense Council, Frisco Unleaded, Doe Run Resources Corporation, California Communities Against Toxics, Johnson Controls Battery Group, Inc., Missouri Coalition for the Environment Foundation, Sierra Club and Clarios, LLC
Respondent: Lisa Perez Jackson, Environmental Protection Agency, Gina McCarthy, Andrew Wheeler, E. Scott Pruitt and Michael S. Regan
Intervenor: RSR Corporation
Case Number: 12-1373
Filed: September 17, 2012
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2023 CLERK'S ORDER [2016736] filed considering motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 2016678-2 ]; directing parties to file motions to govern future proceedings by 03/13/2024 [12-1373] [Entered: 09/13/2023 03:06 PM]
September 13, 2023 UNOPPOSED MOTION [2016678] to hold case in abeyance filed by EPA and Michael S. Regan [Service Date: 09/13/2023 ] Length Certification: 874 Words. [12-1373] (Coghlan, Andrew) [Entered: 09/13/2023 11:41 AM]
March 14, 2023 CLERK'S ORDER [1990105] filed considering motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1989754-2 ]; directing parties to file motions to govern future proceedings by 09/13/2023 [12-1373] [Entered: 03/14/2023 05:10 PM]
March 13, 2023 UNOPPOSED MOTION [1989754] to hold case in abeyance filed by EPA and Michael S. Regan [Service Date: 03/13/2023 ] Length Certification: 862 Words. [12-1373] (Coghlan, Andrew) [Entered: 03/13/2023 09:39 AM]
February 27, 2023 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1987768] filed by James S. Pew and co-counsel Neil Gormley, Tosh Sagar on behalf of Petitioners Sierra Club, California Communities Against Toxics, Missouri Coalition for the Environment Foundation and Natural Resources Defense Council. [12-1373] (Sagar, Tosh) [Entered: 02/27/2023 05:03 PM]
December 1, 2022 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1975773] filed by James S. Pew and co-counsel Neil Gormley on behalf of Petitioners Sierra Club, California Communities Against Toxics, Missouri Coalition for the Environment Foundation and Natural Resources Defense Council. [12-1373] (Gormley, Neil) [Entered: 12/01/2022 02:05 PM]
December 1, 2022 NOTICE [1975782] to withdraw attorney Emma Cordelia Cheuse who represented California Communities Against Toxics, Missouri Coalition for the Environment Foundation, Natural Resources Defense Council and Sierra Club in 12-1373 filed by California Communities Against Toxics, Missouri Coalition for the Environment Foundation, Natural Resources Defense Council and Sierra Club [Service Date: 12/01/2022 ] [12-1373] (Cheuse, Emma) [Entered: 12/01/2022 02:26 PM]
September 15, 2022 CLERK'S ORDER [1964295] filed considering motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1963181-2 ]; directing parties to file motions to govern future proceedings by 03/13/2023 [12-1373] [Entered: 09/15/2022 05:02 PM]
September 12, 2022 UNOPPOSED MOTION [1963181] to hold case in abeyance filed by EPA and Michael S. Regan [Service Date: 09/12/2022 ] Length Certification: 837 Words. [12-1373] (Coghlan, Andrew) [Entered: 09/12/2022 03:59 PM]
April 19, 2022 CLERK'S ORDER [1943602] filed granting motion to terminate party in case [ # 1942834-2 ]. The Clerk is directed to note the docket to reflect the withdrawal of RSR Corporation as an intervenor in this case. [12-1373] [Entered: 04/19/2022 03:05 PM]
April 12, 2022 UNOPPOSED MOTION [1942834] to terminate party filed by RSR Corporation [Service Date: 04/12/2022 ] Length Certification: 112 Words. [12-1373] (Garson, Kelly) [Entered: 04/12/2022 05:17 PM]
March 14, 2022 CLERK'S ORDER [1938992] filed considering motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1938786-2 ]; directing parties to file motions to govern future proceedings by 09/12/2022 [12-1373] [Entered: 03/14/2022 04:32 PM]
March 11, 2022 MOTION [1938786] to hold case in abeyance filed by EPA and Michael S. Regan (Service Date: 03/11/2022 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 845 Words. [12-1373] (Coghlan, Andrew) [Entered: 03/11/2022 04:18 PM]
January 11, 2022 NOTICE [1930131] to substitute attorney Debra J. Carfora substituted by Andrew S. Coghlan filed by EPA and Michael S. Regan [Service Date: 01/11/2022 ] [12-1373] (Coghlan, Andrew) [Entered: 01/11/2022 03:33 PM]
September 13, 2021 CLERK'S ORDER [1913834] filed considering motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1913668-2 ]; directing parties to file motions to govern future proceedings by 03/11/2022 [12-1373] [Entered: 09/13/2021 01:53 PM]
September 10, 2021 MOTION [1913668] to hold case in abeyance filed by EPA and Michael S. Regan (Service Date: 09/10/2021 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: This document complies with the word limit of Fed. R. App. P. 27(d)(2)(A) because, excluding the parts of the document exempted by Fed. R. App. P. 32(f), this document contains 1082 words.. [12-1373] (Carfora, Debra) [Entered: 09/10/2021 03:34 PM]
April 21, 2021 CLERK'S ORDER [1895421] filed granting motion to terminate party in case [ # 1893706-2 ] The Clerk is directed to note the docket to reflect the withdrawal of Frisco Unleaded as a party in this case. [12-1373] [Entered: 04/21/2021 10:40 AM]
April 8, 2021 UNOPPOSED MOTION [1893706] to terminate party filed by Frisco Unleaded [Service Date: 04/08/2021 ] Length Certification: 111 Words. [12-1373] (Cheuse, Emma) [Entered: 04/08/2021 02:51 PM]
March 21, 2021 CLERK'S ORDER [1890860] filed considering motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1888665-2 ]; directing parties to file motions to govern future proceedings by 09/10/2021 [12-1373] [Entered: 03/21/2021 05:56 PM]
March 5, 2021 MOTION [1888665] to hold case in abeyance filed by EPA and Andrew Wheeler (Service Date: 03/05/2021 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: This document complies with the word limit of Fed. R. App. P. 27(d)(2)(A) because, excluding the parts of the document exempted by Fed. R. App. P. 32(f), this document contains 1069 words. [12-1373] (Carfora, Debra) [Entered: 03/05/2021 06:41 PM]
December 7, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1874566] filed ORDERED that the Clerk update the docket to substitute the name Clarios, LLC, in place of Johnson Controls Battery Group, Inc., as a petitioner in this case. [12-1373] [Entered: 12/07/2020 10:27 AM]
November 10, 2020 UNOPPOSED MOTION [1870594] for leave to amend statement filed by Johnson Controls Battery Group, Inc. [Service Date: 11/10/2020 ] Length Certification: 516 Words. [12-1373] (Fitzgibbon, Timothy) [Entered: 11/10/2020 03:16 PM]
October 13, 2020 AMENDED STATEMENT [1865894] with Disclosure Listing filed by Johnson Controls Battery Group, Inc. [Service Date: 10/13/2020 ] [12-1373] (Fitzgibbon, Timothy) [Entered: 10/13/2020 12:30 PM]
September 25, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1863392] filed considering motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1860198-2 ]; directing party to file motions to govern future proceedings by 03/08/2021 [12-1373] [Entered: 09/25/2020 11:46 AM]
September 8, 2020 MOTION [1860198] to hold case in abeyance filed by EPA and Andrew Wheeler (Service Date: 09/08/2020 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: This document complies with the word limit of Fed. R. App. P. 27(d)(2)(A) because, excluding the parts of the document exempted by Fed. R. App. P. 32(f), this document contains 1063 words.. [12-1373] (Carfora, Debra) [Entered: 09/08/2020 11:31 AM]
August 20, 2020 NOTICE [1857451] to substitute attorney Robert N. Steinwurtzel substituted by Thomas E. Hogan filed by Association of Battery Recyclers, Inc. [Service Date: 08/20/2020 ] [12-1373] (DeLaquil, Mark) [Entered: 08/20/2020 01:42 PM]
August 19, 2020 NOTICE [1857317] to substitute attorney Timothy D. Backstrom substituted by Kelly N. Garson filed by RSR Corporation [Service Date: 08/19/2020 ] [12-1373] (Garson, Kelly) [Entered: 08/19/2020 04:33 PM]
August 6, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1855448] filed by Kelly N. Garson on behalf of Intervenor for Petitioner RSR Corporation. [12-1373] (Bergeson, Lynn) [Entered: 08/06/2020 03:27 PM]
March 10, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1832692] filed considering motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1831005-2 ]; directing parties to file motions to govern future proceedings by 09/08/2020 [12-1373] [Entered: 03/10/2020 10:46 AM]
March 4, 2020 NOTICE [1831690] to withdraw attorney Neil Gormley who represented California Communities Against Toxics, Frisco Unleaded, Missouri Coalition for the Environment Foundation, Natural Resources Defense Council and Sierra Club in 12-1373 filed by California Communities Against Toxics, Frisco Unleaded, Missouri Coalition for the Environment Foundation, Natural Resources Defense Council and Sierra Club [Service Date: 03/04/2020 ] [12-1373] (Gormley, Neil) [Entered: 03/04/2020 02:35 PM]
February 28, 2020 MOTION [1831005] to hold case in abeyance filed by EPA and Andrew Wheeler (Service Date: 02/28/2020 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: This document complies with the word limit of Fed. R. App. P. 27(d)(2)(A) because, excluding the parts of the document exempted by Fed. R. App. P. 32(f), this document contains 1057 words. [12-1373] (Carfora, Debra) [Entered: 02/28/2020 04:44 PM]
October 1, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1808803] filed considering motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1807438-2 ]; directing parties to file motions to govern future proceedings by 03/06/2020 [12-1373] [Entered: 10/01/2019 11:45 AM]
September 20, 2019 MOTION [1807438] to hold case in abeyance filed by EPA and Andrew Wheeler (Service Date: 09/20/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: This document complies with the word limit of Fed. R. App. P. 27(d)(2)(A) because, excluding the parts of the document exempted by Fed. R. App. P. 32(f), this document contains 1051 words.. [12-1373] (Carfora, Debra) [Entered: 09/20/2019 02:21 PM]
March 13, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1777347] filed considering motion to extend time [ # 1775245-2 ]; directing parties to file motions to govern future proceedings by 09/30/2019 [12-1373] [Entered: 03/13/2019 11:33 AM]
February 27, 2019 MOTION [1775245] to extend time to file motion to 09/30/2019 filed by EPA (Service Date: 02/27/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: This document complies with the word limit of Fed. R. App. P. 27(d)(2)(A) because, excluding the parts of the document exempted by Fed. R. App. P. 32(f), this document contains 1045 words.. [12-1373] (Carfora, Debra) [Entered: 02/27/2019 05:38 PM]
September 6, 2018 CLERK'S ORDER [1749360] filed considering motion to continue abeyance and extend time for motions to govern [ # 1747343-2 ]; directing parties to file motions to govern future proceedings by 03/08/2019 [12-1373] [Entered: 09/06/2018 06:10 PM]
August 24, 2018 MOTION [1747343] to extend time to file motion to 03/08/2019 filed by EPA (Service Date: 08/24/2018 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: This document contains 1053 words.. [12-1373] (Carfora, Debra) [Entered: 08/24/2018 03:01 PM]
December 5, 2017 CLERK'S ORDER [1707650] filed considering motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1705102-2 ]; directing party to file motions to govern future proceedings by 08/31/2018 [12-1373] [Entered: 12/05/2017 06:42 PM]
November 20, 2017 MOTION [1705102] to hold case in abeyance filed by EPA and E. Scott Pruitt (Service Date: 11/20/2017 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 991 words. [12-1373] (Carfora, Debra) [Entered: 11/20/2017 09:45 AM]
October 16, 2017 REPORT [1699330] filed by EPA and E. Scott Pruitt abeyance status is awaiting decision of agency [Service Date: 10/16/2017 ] [12-1373] (Carfora, Debra) [Entered: 10/16/2017 04:04 PM]
July 19, 2017 PER CURIAM ORDER [1684871] It is ORDERED that the case continue to be held in abeyance pending further order of the court. Respondents are directed to file a report on the status of the reconsideration proceedings within 90 days of the date of this order. The parties are directed to file motions to govern further proceedings by December 1, 2017. Before Judges: Rogers, Tatel and Griffith. [12-1373] [Entered: 07/19/2017 11:42 AM]
May 12, 2017 REPLY [1675040] filed by EPA and E. Scott Pruitt to response [Service Date: 05/12/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 559. [12-1373] (Carfora, Debra) [Entered: 05/12/2017 04:26 PM]
May 8, 2017 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1674318] to motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1673244-3 ], motion to adopt motion [ # 1673244-2 ] filed by California Communities Against Toxics, Frisco Unleaded, Missouri Coalition for the Environment Foundation, Natural Resources Defense Council and Sierra Club [Service Date: 05/08/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 965 words. [12-1373] (Cheuse, Emma) [Entered: 05/08/2017 04:15 PM]
April 28, 2017 MOTION [1673244] to hold case in abeyance (Response to Motion served by mail due on 05/08/2017) filed by EPA and E. Scott Pruitt (Service Date: 04/28/2017 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 852 words. [12-1373]--[Edited 05/01/2017 by AH] (Carfora, Debra) [Entered: 04/28/2017 04:07 PM]
April 27, 2017 NOTICE [1672925] to withdraw attorney Lisa Meghan Bell who represented E. Scott Pruitt and EPA in 12-1373 filed by EPA and E. Scott Pruitt [Service Date: 04/27/2017 ] [12-1373] [Entered: 04/27/2017 12:16 PM]
April 20, 2017 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1671920] filed by Debra J Carfora on behalf of Respondents EPA and E. Scott Pruitt. [12-1373] (Carfora, Debra) [Entered: 04/20/2017 10:10 AM]
January 18, 2017 CLERK'S ORDER [1656492] filed considering motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1651459-2 ]; granting motion to extend time [ # 1651459-3 ]; directing party to file motions to govern future proceedings by 05/01/2017 [12-1373] [Entered: 01/18/2017 03:51 PM]
December 16, 2016 UNOPPOSED MOTION [1651459] filed to hold case in abeyance, to extend time to file motion to 05/01/2017. filed by EPA and Gina McCarthy [Service Date: 12/16/2016 ] Length Certification: 6 pages. [12-1373] [Entered: 12/16/2016 05:11 PM]
September 28, 2016 CLERK'S ORDER [1638158] filed considering motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1637331-2 ]; granting motion to extend time [ # 1637331-3 ]; directing party to file motions to govern future proceedings by 12/16/2016 [12-1373] [Entered: 09/28/2016 12:35 PM]
September 23, 2016 UNOPPOSED MOTION [1637331] filed to hold case in abeyance, to extend time to file motion to 12/16/2016. filed by EPA and Gina McCarthy [Service Date: 09/23/2016 ] Pages: 1-10. [12-1373] [Entered: 09/23/2016 11:02 AM]
August 8, 2016 NOTICE [1629057] filed by EPA and Gina McCarthy to substitute attorney Angeline Purdy substituted by Lisa Bell [Service Date: 08/08/2016 ] [12-1373] [Entered: 08/08/2016 12:04 PM]
July 8, 2016 CLERK'S ORDER [1623787] filed considering motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1622703-3 ]; granting motion to extend time [ # 1622703-2 ]; directing party to file motions to govern future proceedings by 09/23/2016 [12-1373] [Entered: 07/08/2016 03:33 PM]
July 1, 2016 UNOPPOSED MOTION [1622703] filed by EPA to extend time to file motion to 09/23/2016., to hold case in abeyance [Service Date: 07/01/2016 ] Pages: 1-10. [12-1373] (Purdy, Angeline) [Entered: 07/01/2016 10:33 AM]
February 29, 2016 CLERK'S ORDER [1601347] filed considering motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1601143-3 ]; granting motion to extend time [ # 1601143-2 ]; directing party to file motions to govern future proceedings by 07/01/2016 [12-1373] [Entered: 02/29/2016 02:42 PM]
February 26, 2016 UNOPPOSED MOTION [1601143] filed by EPA to extend time to file motion to 07/01/2016., to hold case in abeyance [Service Date: 02/26/2016 ] Pages: 1-10. [12-1373] (Purdy, Angeline) [Entered: 02/26/2016 04:03 PM]
November 25, 2015 CLERK'S ORDER [1585574] filed considering motion to extend time [ # 1584676-2 ]; to continue case in abeyance [ # 1584676-3 ]; directing party to file motions to govern future proceedings by 02/26/2016 [12-1373] [Entered: 11/25/2015 03:56 PM]
November 20, 2015 UNOPPOSED MOTION [1584676] filed by EPA to extend time to file motion to 02/26/2016., to hold case in abeyance [Service Date: 11/20/2015 ] Pages: 1-10. [12-1373] (Purdy, Angeline) [Entered: 11/20/2015 01:27 PM]
May 29, 2015 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1554785] by EPA to hold case in abeyance, to extend time to file motion to 11/20/2015. [Service Date: 05/29/2015 ] Pages: 1-10. [12-1373] (Purdy, Angeline) [Entered: 05/29/2015 09:49 AM]
May 29, 2015 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1554864] considering motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1554785-2 ]; granting motion to extend time [ # 1554785-3 ]; directing party to file motions to govern future proceedings by 11/20/2015 [12-1373] [Entered: 05/29/2015 01:18 PM]
April 2, 2015 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1545571] considering motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1545002-2 ]; granting motion to extend time [ # 1545002-3 ]; directing party to file motions to govern future proceedings by 05/29/2015 [12-1373] [Entered: 04/02/2015 09:56 AM]
March 30, 2015 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1545002] by EPA to hold case in abeyance, to extend time to file motion to 05/29/2015. Pages: 1-10. [12-1373] (Purdy, Angeline) [Entered: 03/30/2015 05:54 PM]
November 5, 2014 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1520836] considering motion to continue case in abeyance [ # 1520116-3 ]; granting motion to extend time [ # 1520116-2 ]; directing party to file motions to govern future proceedings by 03/31/2015 [12-1373] [Entered: 11/05/2014 01:16 PM]
October 31, 2014 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1520116] by EPA to extend time to file motion to 03/31/2015., to hold case in abeyance [Service Date: 10/31/2014 ] Pages: 1-10. [12-1373] (Purdy, Angeline) [Entered: 10/31/2014 02:53 PM]
June 23, 2014 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1498863] considering motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1498721-2 ]; granting motion to extend time [ # 1498721-3 ]; directing party to file motions to govern future proceedings by 10/31/2014 [12-1373] [Entered: 06/23/2014 09:54 AM]
June 20, 2014 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1498721] by EPA to hold case in abeyance, to extend time to file motion to 10/31/2014. [Service Date: 06/20/2014 ] Pages: 1-10. [12-1373] (Purdy, Angeline) [Entered: 06/20/2014 02:33 PM]
June 13, 2014 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1497596] granting motion to extend time [ # 1494884-3 ]; considering motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1494884-2 ]; directing party to file motions to govern future proceedings by 06/20/2014 [12-1373] [Entered: 06/13/2014 04:19 PM]
May 28, 2014 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1494884] by EPA to hold case in abeyance, to extend time to file motion to 06/20/2014. Pages: 1-10. [12-1373] (Purdy, Angeline) [Entered: 05/28/2014 04:34 PM]
February 26, 2014 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1481693] granting motion to extend time [ # 1480943-2 ]; directing party to file motions to govern future proceedings by 05/28/2014 [12-1373] [Entered: 02/26/2014 03:19 PM]
February 21, 2014 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1480943] by EPA to extend time to file motion to 3/28/2014. [Service Date: 02/21/2014 ] Pages: 1-10. [12-1373] (Purdy, Angeline) [Entered: 02/21/2014 12:49 PM]
January 31, 2014 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1477807] granting unopposed motion to extend time [ # 1477757-2 ]; directing parties to file motions to govern future proceedings by 02/21/2014 [12-1373] [Entered: 01/31/2014 02:41 PM]
January 31, 2014 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1477757] by EPA to extend time to file motion to 02/21/2014. [Service Date: 01/31/2014 ] Pages: 1-10. [12-1373] (Purdy, Angeline) [Entered: 01/31/2014 11:51 AM]
December 17, 2013 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1470905] granting motion to extend time [ # 1470562-2 ]; directing party to file motions to govern future proceedings by 01/31/2014 [12-1373] [Entered: 12/17/2013 11:00 AM]
December 13, 2013 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1470562] by EPA to extend time to file motion to 01/31/2014. Pages: 1-10. [12-1373] (Purdy, Angeline) [Entered: 12/13/2013 05:52 PM]
October 8, 2013 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1460065] considering motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1456353-2 ]; directing party to file motions to govern future proceedings by 12/13/2013 [12-1373] [Entered: 10/08/2013 11:18 AM]
September 13, 2013 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1456353] by EPA to hold case in abeyance [Service Date: 09/13/2013 ] Pages: 1-10. [12-1373] (Purdy, Angeline) [Entered: 09/13/2013 10:45 AM]
August 13, 2013 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1451515] by Emma C. Cheuse and co-counsel Neil E. Gormley on behalf of Petitioners California Communities Against Toxics, Frisco Unleaded, Missouri Coalition for the Environment Foundation, Natural Resources Defense Council and Sierra Club. [12-1373] (Gormley, Neil) [Entered: 08/13/2013 04:21 PM]
June 17, 2013 REPORT FILED [1441709] by EPA abeyance status : reconsideration process ongoing. [Service Date: 06/17/2013 ] [12-1373] (Purdy, Angeline) [Entered: 06/17/2013 09:20 PM]
March 18, 2013 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1425872] by EPA to hold case in abeyance Pages: 1-10. [12-1373] (Purdy, Angeline) [Entered: 03/18/2013 10:56 AM]
March 18, 2013 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1426025] considering motion to continue case in abeyance [ # 1425872-2 ]; directing party to file abeyance status report due by 06/18/2013; directing parties to file motions to govern future proceedings by 09/13/2013 [12-1373] [Entered: 03/18/2013 03:41 PM]
September 17, 2012 MODIFIED DOCKET TEXT--PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1394809] dismissing as moot motion for leave to file surreply [ # 1389283-2 ]. The Clerk is directed to file the lodged document. Granting motion to hold issue 21 in abeyance, and that issue 21, along with the issues as to which the parties agree abeyance is appropriate, be severed from No. 12-1129, et al., assigned docket number 12-1373, and held in abeyance pending further order of the court. The parties are directed to file motions to govern further proceedings in No. 12-1373 within 30 days of the agencys resolution of the petitions for agency reconsideration or within 180 days of the date of this order, whichever is earlier. Setting briefing schedule and format in 12-1129, et al. (see order for details). Before Judges: Tatel, Griffith and Kavanaugh. [12-1129, 12-1373, 12-1130, 12-1134, 12-1135] [Entered: 09/17/2012 02:19 PM]
September 17, 2012 PER ABOVE ORDER lodged surreply [ # 1389451-2 ] is filed [12-1129, 12-1130, 12-1134, 12-1135] [Entered: 09/17/2012 02:21 PM]
September 17, 2012 PETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [12-1373] [Entered: 09/17/2012 01:12 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Assoc. of Battery Recyclers v. EPA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Association of Battery Recyclers, Inc.
Represented By: Mark W. DeLaquil
Represented By: Robert N. Steinwurtzel Esquire
Represented By: Thomas E. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Natural Resources Defense Council
Represented By: James Samuel Pew
Represented By: Emma Cordelia Cheuse
Represented By: Neil Gormley
Represented By: Tosh Sagar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Frisco Unleaded
Represented By: James Samuel Pew
Represented By: Emma Cordelia Cheuse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Doe Run Resources Corporation
Represented By: Dennis Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: California Communities Against Toxics
Represented By: James Samuel Pew
Represented By: Emma Cordelia Cheuse
Represented By: Neil Gormley
Represented By: Tosh Sagar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Johnson Controls Battery Group, Inc.
Represented By: Newman Jackson Smith Esquire Jr.
Represented By: Timothy J. Fitzgibbon
Represented By: Clarence Davis Esquire
Represented By: Bernard Frank Hawkins Esquire Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Missouri Coalition for the Environment Foundation
Represented By: James Samuel Pew
Represented By: Emma Cordelia Cheuse
Represented By: Neil Gormley
Represented By: Tosh Sagar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sierra Club
Represented By: James Samuel Pew
Represented By: Emma Cordelia Cheuse
Represented By: Neil Gormley
Represented By: Tosh Sagar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Clarios, LLC
Represented By: Newman Jackson Smith Esquire Jr.
Represented By: Timothy J. Fitzgibbon
Represented By: Clarence Davis Esquire
Represented By: Bernard Frank Hawkins Esquire Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lisa Perez Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Debra J. Carfora
Represented By: Andrew Coghlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gina McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Andrew Wheeler
Represented By: Debra J. Carfora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: E. Scott Pruitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael S. Regan
Represented By: Debra J. Carfora
Represented By: Andrew Coghlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: RSR Corporation
Represented By: Lynn L. Bergeson Esquire
Represented By: Timothy D. Backstrom Esquire
Represented By: Kelly N. Garson Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?