Trumpeter Swan Society, et al v. EPA, et al
Intervenor / Appellee: National Rifle Association of America, National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc., Association of Battery Recyclers, Inc. and Safari Club International
Plaintiff / Appellant: Western Nebraska Resources Council, Trumpeter Swan Society, Center for Biological Diversity, Tennessee Ornithological Society, Preserve Our Wildlife Organization, Loon Lake Loon Association and Cascades Raptor Center
Defendant / Appellee: Environmental Protection Agency and Gina McCarthy, Administrator, Environmental Protection Agency
Case Number: 13-5228
Filed: July 24, 2013
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2015 MANDATE ISSUED to Clerk, District Court [13-5228]
February 24, 2015 PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1539341] denying petition for rehearing [ # 1536163-2 ] Before Judges: Tatel, Millett and Pillard. [13-5228]
February 5, 2015 PETITION filed [1536163] by Appellants Cascades Raptor Center, Center for Biological Diversity, Loon Lake Loon Association, Preserve Our Wildlife Organization, Tennessee Ornithological Society, Trumpeter Swan Society and Western Nebraska Resources Council for rehearing [Service Date: 02/05/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 11-15. [13-5228] (Keats, Adam)
December 23, 2014 PER CURIAM JUDGMENT filed [1528838] that the judgment of the District Court appealed from in this cause is hereby affirmed for the reasons in the accompanying opinion . Before Judges: Tatel, Millett and Pillard. [13-5228]
December 23, 2014 OPINION filed [1528839] (Pages: 12) for the Court by Judge Tatel [13-5228]
December 23, 2014 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1528840] withholding issuance of the mandate. [13-5228]
October 24, 2014 ORAL ARGUMENT HELD before Judges Tatel, Millett and Pillard. [13-5228]
October 17, 2014 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, William John Snape, III, on behalf of Appellants Cascades Raptor Center, Center for Biological Diversity, Loon Lake Loon Association, Preserve Our Wildlife Organization, Tennessee Ornithological Society, Trumpeter Swan Society and Western Nebraska Resources Council. [13-5228] (Snape, William)
October 17, 2014 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Christopher L. Bell, on behalf of Appellee National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc.. [13-5228] (Bell, Christopher)
October 17, 2014 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Jennifer S. Neumann, on behalf of Appellees EPA and Gina McCarthy. [13-5228] (Neumann, Jennifer)
October 14, 2014 PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1516830], on the court's own motion, that the court's October 10, 2014 order allocating oral argument time be amended to reflect that appellees may share its argument time with respondent intervenors as they see fit. Only one counsel for intervenor will be permitted to argue. [13-5228]
October 10, 2014 PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1516747] allocating oral argument time as follows: Appellants - 10 Minutes, Appellees - 10 Minutes. One counsel per side to argue; directing party to file Form 72 notice of arguing attorney by 10/17/2014 [13-5228]
July 16, 2014 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1502996] scheduling oral argument on Friday, 10/24/2014. [13-5228]
April 28, 2014 NOTICE FILED [1490352] by EPA and Gina McCarthy Request to avoid calendaring oral argument for October 16 or 17, 2014. [Service Date: 04/28/2014 ] [13-5228] (Neumann, Jennifer)
April 3, 2014 CORRECTED APPELLANT FINAL BRIEF [1486891] filed by Cascades Raptor Center, Center for Biological Diversity, Loon Lake Loon Association, Preserve Our Wildlife Organization, Tennessee Ornithological Society, Trumpeter Swan Society and Western Nebraska Resources Council [Service Date: 04/03/2014 ] Length of Brief: 8,057 words. [13-5228] (Keats, Adam)
April 2, 2014 INCORRECT DOCKET ENTRY-DISREGARD-corrected brief filed-APPELLANT FINAL BRIEF [1486693] filed by Cascades Raptor Center, Center for Biological Diversity, Loon Lake Loon Association, Preserve Our Wildlife Organization, Tennessee Ornithological Society, Trumpeter Swan Society and Western Nebraska Resources Council [Service Date: 04/02/2014 ] Length of Brief: 8,057 words. [13-5228]--[Edited 04/04/2014 by LMC] (Keats, Adam)
April 2, 2014 APPELLANT FINAL REPLY BRIEF [1486694] filed by Cascades Raptor Center, Center for Biological Diversity, Loon Lake Loon Association, Preserve Our Wildlife Organization, Tennessee Ornithological Society, Trumpeter Swan Society and Western Nebraska Resources Council [Service Date: 04/02/2014 ] Length of Brief: 3,921 words. [13-5228] (Keats, Adam)
April 1, 2014 APPELLEE FINAL BRIEF [1486495] filed by Association of Battery Recyclers, Inc., National Rifle Association of America, National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc. and Safari Club International [Service Date: 04/01/2014 ] Length of Brief: 8,283 Words. [13-5228] (Bell, Christopher)
March 27, 2014 APPELLEE FINAL BRIEF [1485824] filed by EPA and Gina McCarthy [Service Date: 03/27/2014 ] Length of Brief: 12,748 words. [13-5228] (Neumann, Jennifer)
March 25, 2014 JOINT APPENDIX [1485367] filed by Cascades Raptor Center, Center for Biological Diversity, Loon Lake Loon Association, Preserve Our Wildlife Organization, Tennessee Ornithological Society, Trumpeter Swan Society and Western Nebraska Resources Council. [Volumes: 1] [Service Date: 03/25/2014 ] [13-5228] (Keats, Adam)
March 19, 2014 ERRATA FILED [1484417] by Cascades Raptor Center, Center for Biological Diversity, Loon Lake Loon Association, Preserve Our Wildlife Organization, Tennessee Ornithological Society, Trumpeter Swan Society and Western Nebraska Resources Council to Appellant/Petitioner reply brief [ # 1484323-2 ] . Reason for errata: Counsel inadvertantly failed to denote the authorities principally relied on in brief. [Service Date: 03/19/2014 ] [13-5228] (Keats, Adam)
March 18, 2014 APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF [1484323] filed by Cascades Raptor Center, Center for Biological Diversity, Loon Lake Loon Association, Preserve Our Wildlife Organization, Tennessee Ornithological Society, Trumpeter Swan Society and Western Nebraska Resources Council [Service Date: 03/18/2014 ] Length of Brief: 3,938 words. [13-5228] (Keats, Adam)
February 20, 2014 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1480745] granting appellants' unopposed motion to extend time to file the reply brief and deferred appendix [ # 1480419-2 ], The following revised briefing schedule will now apply: APPELLANT Reply Brief due 03/18/2014. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 03/25/2014. Final Briefs due 04/08/2014. [13-5228]
February 18, 2014 JOINT APPELLEE BRIEF [1480361] filed by Association of Battery Recyclers, Inc., National Rifle Association of America, National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc. and Safari Club International [Service Date: 02/18/2014 ] Length of Brief: 8,525 Words. [13-5228] (Bell, Christopher)
February 18, 2014 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1480419] by Cascades Raptor Center, Center for Biological Diversity, Loon Lake Loon Association, Preserve Our Wildlife Organization, Tennessee Ornithological Society, Trumpeter Swan Society and Western Nebraska Resources Council to extend time to file reply brief and appendix to 03/18/2014. [Service Date: 02/18/2014 ] Pages: 1-10. [13-5228] (Keats, Adam)
February 3, 2014 APPELLEE BRIEF [1478074] filed by EPA and Gina McCarthy [Service Date: 02/03/2014 ] Length of Brief: 12,808 words. [13-5228] (Neumann, Jennifer)
December 17, 2013 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1470904] granting federal appellees' unopposed motion to extend time to file their brief [ # 1470572-2 ], The following revised briefing schedule will now apply: APPELLEE Brief due on 02/03/2014. Intervenors-APPELLEE Brief due on 02/18/2014. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 03/04/2014. Deferred APPENDIX due 03/11/2014. Final Briefs due 03/25/2014. [13-5228]
December 15, 2013 JOINT UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1470572] by EPA, Gina McCarthy and Safari Club International to extend time to file brief to 02/03/2014. [Service Date: 12/15/2013 ] Pages: 1-10. [13-5228] (Neumann, Jennifer)
November 27, 2013 APPELLANT BRIEF [1468205] filed by Cascades Raptor Center, Center for Biological Diversity, Loon Lake Loon Association, Preserve Our Wildlife Organization, Tennessee Ornithological Society, Trumpeter Swan Society and Western Nebraska Resources Council [Service Date: 11/27/2013 ] Length of Brief: 26 Pages. [13-5228] (Keats, Adam)
October 15, 2013 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1461338] setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 11/29/2013. APPELLEE Brief due on 12/30/2013. INTERVENOR-APPELLEE Brief due on 01/14/2014. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 01/28/2014. Deferred Appendix due 02/04/2014. Final Briefs due 02/18/2014. [13-5228]
October 11, 2013 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1460876] discharging order to show cause [ # 1457653-3 ]; directing that intervenors-appellees be limited to one joint brief, not to exceed 8,750 words. [13-5228]
October 11, 2013 JOINT RESPONSE FILED [1460806] by Association of Battery Recyclers, Inc., National Rifle Association of America, National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc. and Safari Club International to order [ # 1457653-2 ],[ # 1457653-3 ] [Service Date: 10/11/2013 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [13-5228] (Snarr, Michael)
September 20, 2013 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1457653] to show cause regarding briefing format for intervenors - Proposed formats due 10/11/2013 [13-5228]
September 3, 2013 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1454653] by William J. Snape III and co-counsel Adam Keats on behalf of Appellants Cascades Raptor Center, Center for Biological Diversity, Loon Lake Loon Association, Preserve Our Wildlife Organization, Tennessee Ornithological Society, Trumpeter Swan Society and Western Nebraska Resources Council. [13-5228] (Keats, Adam)
August 23, 2013 INCORRECT DOCKET ENTRY-DISREGARD-corrected document filed-STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL FILED [1453365] by Cascades Raptor Center, Center for Biological Diversity, Loon Lake Loon Association, Preserve Our Wildlife Organization, Tennessee Ornithological Society, Trumpeter Swan Society and Western Nebraska Resources Council [Service Date: 08/23/2013 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [13-5228]--[Edited 08/26/2013 by LMC] (Snape, William)
August 23, 2013 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1453193] by EPA and Gina McCarthy [Service Date: 08/23/2013 ] [13-5228] (Neumann, Jennifer)
August 23, 2013 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [1453367] to statement [ # 1453365-2 ], certificate [ # 1453193-2 ], certificate [ # 1453079-2 ], record [ # 1453077-2 ], report status of transcript (interim) [ # 1453074-2 ], report status of transcript (final) [ # 1453074-3 ], notice [ # 1453073-2 ], statement [ # 1453072-2 ], statement [ # 1453070-2 ] filed by Cascades Raptor Center, Center for Biological Diversity, Loon Lake Loon Association, Preserve Our Wildlife Organization, Tennessee Ornithological Society, Trumpeter Swan Society and Western Nebraska Resources Council. [13-5228] (Snape, William)
August 23, 2013 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1453380] by Association of Battery Recyclers, Inc., National Rifle Association of America, National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc. and Safari Club International [Service Date: 08/23/2013 ] [13-5228] (Seidman, Anna)
August 23, 2013 CORRECTED STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL FILED [1453372] by Cascades Raptor Center, Center for Biological Diversity, Loon Lake Loon Association, Preserve Our Wildlife Organization, Tennessee Ornithological Society, Trumpeter Swan Society and Western Nebraska Resources Council [Service Date: 08/23/2013 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [13-5228] (Snape, William)
August 22, 2013 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1453070] by Cascades Raptor Center, Center for Biological Diversity, Loon Lake Loon Association, Preserve Our Wildlife Organization, Tennessee Ornithological Society, Trumpeter Swan Society and Western Nebraska Resources Council [Service Date: 08/22/2013 ] [13-5228] (Snape, William)
August 22, 2013 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1453069] by Christopher A. Conte on behalf of Appellee National Rifle Association of America. [13-5228] (Conte, Christopher)
August 22, 2013 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1453066] by Cascades Raptor Center, Center for Biological Diversity, Loon Lake Loon Association, Preserve Our Wildlife Organization, Tennessee Ornithological Society, Trumpeter Swan Society and Western Nebraska Resources Council [Service Date: 08/22/2013 ] [13-5228] (Snape, William)
August 22, 2013 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1453072] by Cascades Raptor Center, Center for Biological Diversity, Loon Lake Loon Association, Preserve Our Wildlife Organization, Tennessee Ornithological Society, Trumpeter Swan Society and Western Nebraska Resources Council [Service Date: 08/22/2013 ] [13-5228] (Snape, William)
August 22, 2013 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE submitted [1453077] by Cascades Raptor Center, Center for Biological Diversity, Loon Lake Loon Association, Preserve Our Wildlife Organization, Tennessee Ornithological Society, Trumpeter Swan Society and Western Nebraska Resources Council [Service Date: 08/22/2013 ] [13-5228] (Snape, William)
August 22, 2013 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [1453079] to record [ # 1453077-2 ], report status of transcript (interim) [ # 1453074-2 ], notice [ # 1453073-2 ], statement [ # 1453072-2 ], statement [ # 1453070-2 ] filed by Cascades Raptor Center, Center for Biological Diversity, Loon Lake Loon Association, Preserve Our Wildlife Organization, Tennessee Ornithological Society, Trumpeter Swan Society and Western Nebraska Resources Council. [13-5228] (Snape, William)
August 22, 2013 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1453073] by William J. Snape, III and co-counsel Adam Keats (pending) on behalf of Appellants Cascades Raptor Center, Center for Biological Diversity, Loon Lake Loon Association, Preserve Our Wildlife Organization, Tennessee Ornithological Society, Trumpeter Swan Society and Western Nebraska Resources Council. [13-5228] (Snape, William)
August 22, 2013 MODIFIED DOCKET TEXT--TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1453074] by Cascades Raptor Center, Center for Biological Diversity, Loon Lake Loon Association, Preserve Our Wildlife Organization, Tennessee Ornithological Society, Trumpeter Swan Society and Western Nebraska Resources Council [Service Date: 08/22/2013 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - All transcripts needed for the appeal have been completed and received. [13-5228]--[Edited 08/23/2013 by LMC] (Snape, William)
August 21, 2013 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1452843] by Robert N. Steinwurtzel and co-counsel Michael S. Snarr Thomas Edward Hogan on behalf of Appellee Association of Battery Recyclers, Inc.. [13-5228] (Snarr, Michael)
August 19, 2013 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1452312] by Anna M. Seidman on behalf of Appellee Safari Club International. [13-5228] (Seidman, Anna)
August 12, 2013 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1451262] by Roger R. Martella, Jr. and co-counsel Christopher L. Bell on behalf of Appellee National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc.. [13-5228] (Bell, Christopher)
August 5, 2013 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1450051] by Jennifer Scheller Neumann and co-counsel David Gunter on behalf of Appellees EPA and Gina McCarthy. [13-5228] (Neumann, Jennifer)
July 24, 2013 NOTICE OF APPEAL filed [1448209] by Cascades Raptor Center, Center for Biological Diversity, Loon Lake Loon Association, Preserve Our Wildlife Organization, Tennessee Ornithological Society, Trumpeter Swan Society and Western Nebraska Resources Council seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:12-cv-00929-EGS. Assigned USCA Case Number [13-5228]
July 24, 2013 [THIS ORDER AMENDED BY ORDER OF 07/24/2013] CLERK'S ORDER filed [1448215] directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 08/23/2013. APPELLANT certificate as to parties, etc. due 08/23/2013. APPELLANT statement of issues due 08/23/2013. APPELLANT underlying decision due 08/23/2013. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 08/23/2013. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 08/23/2013. APPELLANT transcript status report due 08/23/2013. APPELLANT procedural motions due 08/23/2013. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 09/09/2013; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties, etc. due 08/23/2013. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 08/23/2013. APPELLEE procedural motions due 08/23/2013. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 09/09/2013 [13-5228]--[Edited 07/24/2013 by LMC]
July 24, 2013 CLERK'S AMENDED ORDER filed [1448297] directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 08/23/2013. APPELLANT certificate as to parties, etc. due 08/23/2013. APPELLANT statement of issues due 08/23/2013. APPELLANT underlying decision due 08/23/2013. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 08/23/2013. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 08/23/2013. APPELLANT transcript status report due 08/23/2013. APPELLANT procedural motions due 08/23/2013. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 09/09/2013; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties, etc. due 08/23/2013. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 08/23/2013. APPELLEE procedural motions due 08/23/2013. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 09/09/2013 [13-5228]
July 24, 2013 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [13-5228]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Trumpeter Swan Society, et al v. EPA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor / appellee: National Rifle Association of America
Represented By: Christopher A. Conte
Represented By: Anna M. Seidman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor / appellee: National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Roger Romulus Martella Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Linden Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor / appellee: Association of Battery Recyclers, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Steven Snarr Esquire
Represented By: Thomas Edward Hogan
Represented By: Robert N. Steinwurtzel Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor / appellee: Safari Club International
Represented By: Anna M. Seidman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Western Nebraska Resources Council
Represented By: Adam Frazer Keats
Represented By: William John Snape III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Trumpeter Swan Society
Represented By: Adam Frazer Keats
Represented By: William John Snape III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Adam Frazer Keats
Represented By: William John Snape III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Tennessee Ornithological Society
Represented By: Adam Frazer Keats
Represented By: William John Snape III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Preserve Our Wildlife Organization
Represented By: Adam Frazer Keats
Represented By: William John Snape III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Loon Lake Loon Association
Represented By: Adam Frazer Keats
Represented By: William John Snape III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Cascades Raptor Center
Represented By: Adam Frazer Keats
Represented By: William John Snape III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Jennifer Scheller Neumann
Represented By: John David Gunter II
Represented By: Justin David Heminger
Represented By: Robert Geoffrey Dreher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Gina McCarthy, Administrator, Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Jennifer Scheller Neumann
Represented By: John David Gunter II
Represented By: Justin David Heminger
Represented By: Robert Geoffrey Dreher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?