NLRB v. Leggett & Platt, Inc.
Petitioner: National Labor Relations Board
Respondent: Leggett & Platt, Inc.
Case Number: 19-1034
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1777137] filed setting briefing schedule: PETITIONERS Brief due 04/22/2019. RESPONDENT Brief due on 05/22/2019. PETITIONERS Reply Brief due 06/12/2019. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 06/19/2019. Final Briefs due 07/03/2019. [19-1003, 19-1005, 19-1034] [Entered: 03/12/2019 11:18 AM]
March 1, 2019 RESPONSE [1775604] to Application for Enforcement [ # 1773011-2 ] filed by Leggett & Platt, Inc. in 19-1003 [Service Date: 03/01/2019 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail] Length Certification: 5 Pages. [19-1003, 19-1005, 19-1034] (Carter, Arthur) [Entered: 03/01/2019 04:09 PM]
February 25, 2019 CERTIFIED INDEX TO RECORD [1774743] filed by NLRB in 19-1003, 19-1034 [Service Date: 02/25/2019 ] [19-1003, 19-1034] (Habenstreit, David) [Entered: 02/25/2019 02:43 PM]
February 19, 2019 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1773791] submitted by Keith Purvis in 19-1005 [Service Date: 02/19/2019 ] [19-1005, 19-1003, 19-1034] (Solem, Aaron) [Entered: 02/19/2019 11:55 AM]
February 19, 2019 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1773789] filed by Keith Purvis in 19-1005 [Service Date: 02/19/2019 ] [19-1005, 19-1003, 19-1034] (Solem, Aaron) [Entered: 02/19/2019 11:53 AM]
February 19, 2019 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1773788] filed by Keith Purvis in 19-1005 [Service Date: 02/19/2019 ] [19-1005, 19-1003, 19-1034] (Solem, Aaron) [Entered: 02/19/2019 11:51 AM]
February 12, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1773015] filed consolidating cases 19-1034 (Cross-appeal started 02/12/2019) with 19-1003 [19-1003, 19-1034] [Entered: 02/12/2019 01:19 PM]
February 12, 2019 CERTIFIED COPY [1773012] of Cross-Application for Enforcement sent to respondent [ # 1773011-2 ] [19-1034]--[Edited 02/13/2019 by AY] [Entered: 02/12/2019 01:08 PM]
February 8, 2019 CROSS-APPLICATION FOR ENFORCEMENT [1773011] of a decision by federal agency filed by NLRB [Service Date: 02/11/2019 ] [19-1034] [Entered: 02/12/2019 01:08 PM]
February 8, 2019 CROSS-APPLICATION FOR ENFORCEMENT CASE docketed. [19-1034] [Entered: 02/12/2019 01:07 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: NLRB v. Leggett & Platt, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: National Labor Relations Board
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Heaney Esquire
Represented By: David S. Habenstreit
Represented By: Barbara Ann Sheehy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Leggett & Platt, Inc.
Represented By: Alfred John Harper III
Represented By: Arthur Tracy Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?