Exhaustless Inc. v. FAA
Petitioner: Exhaustless Inc.
Respondent: Federal Aviation Administration
Case Number: 19-1158
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1800864] filed directing party to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 09/05/2019. PETITIONER certificate as to parties due 09/05/2019. PETITIONER statement of issues due 09/05/2019. PETITIONER underlying decision due 09/05/2019. PETITIONER deferred appendix statement due 09/05/2019. PETITIONER procedural motions due 09/05/2019. PETITIONER dispositive motions due 09/20/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: RESPONDENT entry of appearance due 09/05/2019. RESPONDENT procedural motions due 09/05/2019. RESPONDENT certified index to record due 09/20/2019. RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 09/20/2019 [19-1158] [Entered: 08/06/2019 11:32 AM]
August 5, 2019 CERTIFIED COPY [1800701] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1800699-2 ] [19-1158] [Entered: 08/05/2019 02:23 PM]
August 2, 2019 PETITION FOR REVIEW [1800699] of a decision by federal agency filed by Exhaustless Inc. [Service Date: 08/05/2019 ] Disclosure Statement: Not Attached; Certificate of Parties: Not Applicable to this Filing. [19-1158] [Entered: 08/05/2019 02:19 PM]
August 2, 2019 PETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [19-1158] [Entered: 08/05/2019 02:17 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Exhaustless Inc. v. FAA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Exhaustless Inc.
Represented By: Kevin McArdle Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Federal Aviation Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?