Government of Guam v. USA
Defendant / Appellant: United States of America
Plaintiff / Appellee: Government of Guam
Case Number: 19-5131
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 JOINT APPENDIX [1794487] filed by USA. [Volumes: 1] [Service Date: 06/25/2019 ] [19-5131] (Heron, Rachel) [Entered: 06/25/2019 04:37 PM]
June 25, 2019 APPELLANT BRIEF [1794484] filed by USA [Service Date: 06/25/2019 ] Length of Brief: 10,703 words. [19-5131] (Heron, Rachel) [Entered: 06/25/2019 04:34 PM]
June 19, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1793534] filed by John D.S. Gilmour and co-counsel William J. Jackson, Mark Donatiello on behalf of Appellee Government of Guam. [19-5131] (Stern, Bezalel) [Entered: 06/19/2019 01:49 PM]
May 16, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1788192] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 06/25/2019. APPENDIX due 06/25/2019. APPELLEE Brief due on 07/25/2019. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 08/15/2019 [19-5131] [Entered: 05/16/2019 05:02 PM]
May 9, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1787195] filed by Rachel Heron on behalf of Appellant USA. [19-5131] (Heron, Rachel) [Entered: 05/09/2019 03:50 PM]
May 8, 2019 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1786855] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:17-cv-02487-KBJ filed by USA. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5131. [19-5131] [Entered: 05/08/2019 01:28 PM]
May 8, 2019 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-5131] [Entered: 05/08/2019 01:27 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Government of Guam v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: United States of America
Represented By: Eric Allen Grant
Represented By: Michael Augustini
Represented By: Rachel Heron
Represented By: Evelyn S. Ying
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Government of Guam
Represented By: Bezalel Adin Stern Esquire
Represented By: Mark Vincent Donatiello
Represented By: William James Jackson
Represented By: John Dalston Smith Gilmour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?