John Fletcher v. Scott Harris

Defendant / Appellee: Scott Harris, Clerk of the United States Supreme Court, believed to be Scott Harris
Plaintiff / Appellant: John P. Fletcher
Case Number: 19-5132
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 NOTICE [1795092] of inability to serve the party opposed filed by John P. Fletcher [Service Date: 06/28/2019 ] [19-5132] [Entered: 06/28/2019 03:46 PM]
June 24, 2019 MOTION [1795089] to dispense with appendix filed by John P. Fletcher [Service Date: 06/28/2019 ] Length Certification: 3 pages. [19-5132] [Entered: 06/28/2019 03:43 PM]
June 24, 2019 MOTION [1795088] filed by John P. Fletcher [Service Date: 06/28/2019 ] Length Certification: 3 pages. [19-5132] [Entered: 06/28/2019 03:41 PM]
June 24, 2019 APPELLANT BRIEF [1795078] filed by John P. Fletcher [Service Date: 06/28/2019 ] Length of Brief: 2,587. [19-5132] [Entered: 06/28/2019 03:29 PM]
June 18, 2019 NOTICE [1793390] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court is granted [Case Number 19-5132: IFP] [19-5132] [Entered: 06/18/2019 02:19 PM]
June 6, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1791472] filed referring motion ifp in district court [ # 1791445-2 ] to the district court for consideration., holding case in abeyance. Case 19-5132 held in abeyance pending decision in 1:19cv169-UNA from U.S. District Court; The Clerk is directed to transmit a copy of this order and the original motion to the district court. [19-5132] [Entered: 06/06/2019 02:00 PM]
June 4, 2019 RECEIPT [1793420] received from for documents [ # 1786907-2 ] sent to Appellant John P. Fletcher [Per Warden:Unable to obtain ACKNOWLEDGMENT due to Institution rules - Material Given to John Fletcher by prison official] [19-5132] [Entered: 06/18/2019 03:42 PM]
June 3, 2019 PRISONER TRUST ACCOUNT REPORT [1791448] filed by John P. Fletcher [19-5132] [Entered: 06/06/2019 01:13 PM]
June 3, 2019 PRISONER CONSENT TO COLLECTION [1791447] filed by John P. Fletcher [19-5132] [Entered: 06/06/2019 01:12 PM]
June 3, 2019 MOTION [1791445] leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court filed by John P. Fletcher [Service Date: 06/06/2019 ] Length Certification: 7 pages. [19-5132] [Entered: 06/06/2019 01:10 PM]
May 8, 2019 LETTER [1786907] sent to warden sending Clerk order [ # 1786906-5 ]. Prisoner acknowledgment of receipt from Warden due 06/07/2019. [19-5132] [Entered: 05/08/2019 02:53 PM]
May 8, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1786906] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 07/08/2019. APPENDIX due 07/08/2019. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to send this order to appellant by whatever means necessary to ensure receipt. [19-5132] [Entered: 05/08/2019 02:51 PM]
May 8, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1786901] filed directing party to file motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis or payment of docketing fee. APPELLANT payment of docketing fee or motion to proceed in forma pauperis in district court due 06/07/2019; directing party to file ifp prisoner submissions: APPELLANT prisoner trust account report due 06/07/2019. APPELLANT consent to collection form due 06/07/2019. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to send this order to appellant by whatever means necessary to ensure receipt. [19-5132] [Entered: 05/08/2019 02:44 PM]
May 8, 2019 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1786890] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-00169-UNA filed by John P. Fletcher. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5132. [19-5132] [Entered: 05/08/2019 02:34 PM]
May 8, 2019 US PRISONER CASE docketed. [19-5132] [Entered: 05/08/2019 02:33 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John Fletcher v. Scott Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Scott Harris, Clerk of the United States Supreme Court, believed to be Scott Harris
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: John P. Fletcher
Represented By: John P. Fletcher
Represented By: Warden (Buena Vista)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?