Michael Davis v. L. Johnson, et al
Respondent / Appellee: United States of America and L. Johnson, Warden, CTF, DCDC
Petitioner / Appellant: Michael Lee Davis
Case Number: 19-5133
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 FIRST CLASS MAIL and CERTIFIED MAIL SENT [1793720] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.7019 0700 0000 5269 0877] of order [ # 1793711-4 ]. Certified Mail Receipt due 07/22/2019 from Michael Lee Davis. [19-5133] [Entered: 06/20/2019 02:08 PM]
June 20, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1793711] filed resending Clerk orders [ # 1789332-6 ], [ # 1787370-5 ]. APPELLANT payment of docketing fee or motion to proceed in forma pauperis in district court now due 07/22/2019. APPELLANT initial submissions, procedural and dispositive motions (if any) now due 07/22/2019. Any APPELLEE procedural and dispositive motions are now due 07/22/2019. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [19-5133] [Entered: 06/20/2019 01:18 PM]
June 5, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1791174] filed by USA [Service Date: 06/05/2019 ] [19-5133] (Curt, Suzanne) [Entered: 06/05/2019 02:09 PM]
June 5, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1791172] filed by Suzanne Grealy Curt on behalf of Appellee USA. [19-5133] (Curt, Suzanne) [Entered: 06/05/2019 02:08 PM]
May 24, 2019 LETTER [1789336] sent to warden sending Clerk order initial submissions for appellant/petitioner [ # 1789332-2 ]. Prisoner acknowledgment of receipt from Warden due 06/24/2019. [19-5133] [Entered: 05/24/2019 10:18 AM]
May 24, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1789332] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 06/24/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 06/24/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 06/24/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 06/24/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 06/24/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 06/24/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 06/24/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 06/24/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 07/08/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 06/24/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 06/24/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 06/24/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 07/08/2019. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to send this order to appellant by whatever means necessary to ensure receipt. [19-5133] [Entered: 05/24/2019 10:15 AM]
May 23, 2019 NOTICE [1789274] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court for certificate of appealability [COA Status: COA shall not issue] [19-5133] [Entered: 05/23/2019 04:38 PM]
May 10, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1787386] filed holding case in abeyance. Case 19-5133 held in abeyance pending COA decision in 1:18-cv-1897-JEB from U.S. District Court. The Clerk is directed to transmit a copy of this order to the district court. [19-5133] [Entered: 05/10/2019 02:11 PM]
May 10, 2019 LETTER [1787374] sent to warden sending Clerk order [ # 1787370-5 ]. Prisoner acknowledgment of receipt from Warden due 06/10/2019. [19-5133] [Entered: 05/10/2019 01:54 PM]
May 10, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1787370] filed directing party to file motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis or payment of docketing fee. APPELLANT payment of docketing fee or motion to proceed in forma pauperis in district court due 06/10/2019. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to send this order to appellant by whatever means necessary to ensure receipt. [19-5133] [Entered: 05/10/2019 01:47 PM]
May 8, 2019 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1786920] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:18-cv-01897-JEB filed by Michael Lee Davis. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5133. [19-5133] [Entered: 05/08/2019 03:22 PM]
May 8, 2019 US PRISONER CASE docketed. [19-5133] [Entered: 05/08/2019 03:20 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael Davis v. L. Johnson, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: United States of America
Represented By: Elizabeth Trosman Esquire
Represented By: USAO Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Suzanne Grealy Curt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: L. Johnson, Warden, CTF, DCDC
Represented By: Elizabeth Trosman Esquire
Represented By: USAO Appellate Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: Michael Lee Davis
Represented By: Michael Lee Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?