Eric Sanders v. EEOC
Plaintiff / Appellant: Eric Alan Sanders
Defendant / Appellee: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Case Number: 19-5154
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES, DOCKETING STATEMENT, ENTRY OF APPEARANCE, DEFERRED APPENDIX STATEMENT, STATEMENT OF ISSUES, TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT AND UNDERLYING DECISION [1794544] filed by Eric Alan Sanders [Service Date: 06/21/2019 ] [19-5154] [Entered: 06/26/2019 11:06 AM]
June 19, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1793516] filed granting motion to permit pro se electronic filing [ # 1792702-2 ]; considering motion to extend time [ # 1792703-2 ]; APPELLANT docketing statement, certificate as to parties, statement of issues, underlying decision, deferred appendix statement, notice of appearance, transcript status report due 07/29/2019. APPELLEE certificate as to parties and entry of appearance due 07/29/2019. APPELLANT and APPELLEE procedural motions due 07/29/2019. APPELLANT and APPELLEE dispositive motions due 08/12/2019. Appellant's failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution [19-5154] [Entered: 06/19/2019 12:30 PM]
June 7, 2019 MOTION [1792703] to extend time to file initial submissions filed by Eric Alan Sanders (Service Date: 06/02/2019 by Email) Length Certification: 2 pages. [19-5154] [Entered: 06/13/2019 04:15 PM]
June 7, 2019 MOTION [1792702] to permit pro se electronic filing status filed by Eric Alan Sanders (Service Date: 06/02/2019 by Email) Length Certification: 3 pages. [19-5154] [Entered: 06/13/2019 04:14 PM]
June 7, 2019 MOTION [1792699] to appoint counsel filed by Eric Alan Sanders (Service Date: 06/02/2019 by Email) Length Certification: 4 pages. [19-5154] [Entered: 06/13/2019 04:11 PM]
June 7, 2019 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT [1792695] received for order [1789672-2] sent to Appellant Eric Alan Sanders. [19-5154] [Entered: 06/13/2019 04:09 PM]
May 28, 2019 FIRST CLASS AND CERTIFIED MAIL SENT [1789672] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.70070710000471968252] of order [ # 1789671-2 ]. Certified Mail Receipt due 06/27/2019 from Eric Alan Sanders. [19-5154] [Entered: 05/28/2019 11:28 AM]
May 28, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1789671] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 06/27/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 06/27/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 06/27/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 06/27/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 06/27/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 06/27/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 06/27/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 06/27/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 07/12/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 06/27/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 06/27/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 06/27/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 07/12/2019, Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution; The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [19-5154] [Entered: 05/28/2019 11:24 AM]
May 28, 2019 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1789668] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:17-cv-02854-RBW filed by Eric Alan Sanders. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5154. [19-5154] [Entered: 05/28/2019 11:23 AM]
May 28, 2019 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-5154] [Entered: 05/28/2019 11:23 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eric Sanders v. EEOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Eric Alan Sanders
Represented By: Eric Alan Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?