Taquan Gullett v. James Duff, et al
Defendant / Appellee: James C. Duff, Inspector General, United States Department of Justice, United States of America, Personal private capacity, Lee Ann Bennett, Scott S. Harris, Clayton R. Higgins, Jr., Robert S. Mueller, III and William P. Barr
Plaintiff / Appellant: Taquan Gullett
Case Number: 19-5217
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 LETTER [1808630] sent to warden sending Clerk order [ # 1808615-4 ]. Prisoner acknowledgment of receipt from Warden due 10/30/2019. [19-5217] [Entered: 09/30/2019 04:13 PM]
September 30, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1808615] filed dismissing as moot motion ifp in this Court [ # 1808600-2 ] . The district court granted IFP on appeal. [Case Number 19-5217: PLRA Forms Due]; extending Clerk order ifp prisoner submission [ # 1802191-3 ] APPELLANT consent to collection form now due 10/30/2019, Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to send this order to appellant by whatever means necessary to ensure receipt. [19-5217] [Entered: 09/30/2019 03:41 PM]
September 26, 2019 PRISONER TRUST ACCOUNT REPORT [1808605] filed by Taquan Gullett [19-5217] [Entered: 09/30/2019 02:50 PM]
September 26, 2019 MOTION [1808600] to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis [Case Number 19-5217: IFP Pending USCA] filed by Taquan Gullett [Service Date: 09/30/2019 ] Length Certification: 5 Pages. [19-5217] [Entered: 09/30/2019 02:44 PM]
September 26, 2019 PETITION [1808596] for writ of scire facias filed by Appellant Taquan Gullett [Service Date: 09/23/2019 by US Mail] Length Certification: 24 Pages. [19-5217] [Entered: 09/30/2019 02:41 PM]
September 5, 2019 RECEIPT [1805670] received from R. Hicks, CSW for documents [ # 1802198-2 ] sent to Appellant Taquan Gullett [Per Warden: "Inmate refused to sign. It did not come as legal mail, not stamped."] [19-5217] [Entered: 09/09/2019 03:09 PM]
September 3, 2019 NOTICE [1804625] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court is granted [Case Number 19-5217: IFP] [19-5217] [Entered: 09/03/2019 12:14 PM]
August 23, 2019 NOTICE [1803638] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court to supplement record [19-5217] [Entered: 08/26/2019 01:36 PM]
August 14, 2019 LETTER [1802198] sent to warden sending Clerk order ifp motion or docket fee [ # 1802191-2 ]. Prisoner acknowledgment of receipt from Warden due 09/13/2019. [19-5217] [Entered: 08/14/2019 03:57 PM]
August 14, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1802191] filed directing party to file motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis or payment of docketing fee. APPELLANT payment of docketing fee or motion to proceed in forma pauperis in district court due 09/13/2019; directing party to file ifp prisoner submissions: APPELLANT prisoner trust account report due 09/13/2019. APPELLANT consent to collection form due 09/13/2019, Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution; The Clerk is directed to send this order to appellant by whatever means necessary to ensure receipt. [19-5217] [Entered: 08/14/2019 03:54 PM]
August 14, 2019 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1802185] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-02015-UNA filed by Taquan Gullett. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5217. [19-5217] [Entered: 08/14/2019 03:47 PM]
August 14, 2019 US PRISONER CASE docketed. [19-5217] [Entered: 08/14/2019 03:46 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Taquan Gullett v. James Duff, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: James C. Duff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Inspector General, United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States of America, Personal private capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lee Ann Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Scott S. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Clayton R. Higgins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Robert S. Mueller, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Taquan Gullett
Represented By: Warden (Coleman Medium)
Represented By: Taquan Gullett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?