Fresno Community Hospital and, et al v. Alex Azar, II
Plaintiff / Appellant: Lovelace Health System, Inc., doing business as Lovelace Medical Center - Downtown, Topeka Hospital, LLC, doing business as The University of Kansas Health System, St. Francis Campus, West Valley Medical Center, Inc., doing business as West Valley Medical Center, Bayfront HMA Medical Center, LLC, doing business as Bayfront Health Punta Gorda, AHS Claremore Regional Hospital, LLC, doing business as Hillcrest Hospital Claremore, AHS Southcrest Hospital, LLC, doing business as Hillcrest Hospital South, Watertown Medical Center LLC, doing business as Watertown Regional Medical Center, Reedley Community Hospital, doing business as Adventist Medical Center - Reedley, Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., doing business as Lodi Memorial Hospital, Physicians Surgical Hospitals, LLC, doing business as Physicians Surgical Hospital, Pocatello Hospital, LLC, doing business as Portneuf Medical Center, Beth Israel Deaconess Hospital - Plymouth, Inc., Baystate Wing Hospital Corporation, doing business as Baystate Wing Hospital, Baystate Medical Center, Inc., Castle Medical Center, San Joaquin Community Hospital, Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center, doing business as Community Regional Medical Center, BSA Hospital, LLC, doing business as Baptist St. Anthonys Hospital, Kent County Memorial Hospital, Baystate Franklin Medical Center, Bailey Medical Center, LLC, doing business as Bailey Medical Center, AHS Pryor Hospital, LLC, doing business as Hillcrest Hospital Pryor, Beth Israel Deaconess Hospital - Milton, Inc., Women & Infants Hospital of Rhode Island, Lovelace Health System, Inc., doing business as Lovelace Regional Hospital - Roswell, HH Killeen Health System, LLC (Harker Heights), doing business as Seton Medical Center Harker Heights, AHS Cushing Hospital, LLC, doing business as Hillcrest Hospital Cushing, Affinity Hospital, LLC, doing business as Grandview Medical Center, Hanford Community Hospital, doing business as Adventist Medical Center - Reedley, doing business as Adventist Medical Center - Selma, Lovelace Health System, Inc., doing business as Lovelace Westside Hospital, AHS Hillcrest Medical Center, LLC, doing business as Hillcrest Medical Center, Portland Adventist Medical Center, doing business as Adventist Medical Center - Portland, Montclair Hospital, LLC, doing business as Mountainside Hospital, Simi Valley Hospital & Health Care Services, doing business as Simi Valley Hospital, Biloxi HMA, LLC, doing business as Merit Health Biloxi, St. Helena Hospital, doing business as St. Helena Hospital Napa Valley, Feather River Hospital, Sonora Community Hospital, doing business as Sonora Regional Medical Center, White Memorial Medical Center, Glendale Adventist Medical Center, AHS Henryetta Hospital, LLC, doing business as Hillcrest Hospital Henryetta, Valley Health System, LLC, doing business as Desert Springs Hospital Medical Center, Baystate Noble Hospital Corporation, doing business as Baystate Noble Hospital, Lovelace Health System, Inc., doing business as Lovelace Womens Hospital, Berwick Hospital Company, LLC, doing business as Berwick Hospital Center, ARMC, L.P., doing business as Abilene Regional Medical Center, West Boca Medical Center, Inc, doing business as West Boca Medical Center, Ukiah Adventist Hospital, doing business as Ukiah Valley Medical Center, Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center, doing business as Clovis Community Medical Center, Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center, Inc., Bay County Health, LLC, doing business as Bay Medical Center, Tulsa Spine And Specialty Hospital, LLC, doing business as Tulsa Spine & Specialty Hospital, Pasack Valley Hospital, LLC, doing business as Hackensack UMC at Pasack Valley and Beth Israel Deaconess Hospital - Needham, Inc.
Defendant / Appellee: Alex Michael Azar, II, Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services
Case Number: 19-5254
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1817321] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 01/06/2020. APPENDIX due 01/06/2020. APPELLEE Brief due on 02/05/2020. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 02/26/2020 [19-5254] [Entered: 11/22/2019 04:56 PM]
October 29, 2019 AMENDED CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1813226] filed by Affinity Hospital, LLC, AHS Claremore Regional Hospital, LLC, AHS Cushing Hospital, LLC, AHS Henryetta Hospital, LLC, AHS Hillcrest Medical Center, LLC, AHS Pryor Hospital, LLC, AHS Southcrest Hospital, LLC, ARMC, L.P., Bailey Medical Center, LLC, Bay County Health, LLC, Bayfront HMA Medical Center, LLC, Baystate Franklin Medical Center, Baystate Medical Center, Inc., Baystate Noble Hospital Corporation, Baystate Wing Hospital Corporation, Berwick Hospital Company, LLC, Beth Israel Deaconess Hospital - Milton, Inc., Beth Israel Deaconess Hospital - Needham, Inc., Beth Israel Deaconess Hospital - Plymouth, Inc., Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center, Inc., Biloxi HMA, LLC, BSA Hospital, LLC, Castle Medical Center, Feather River Hospital, Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center, Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center, Glendale Adventist Medical Center, Hanford Community Hospital, HH Killeen Health System, LLC (Harker Heights), Kent County Memorial Hospital, Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., Lovelace Health System, Inc., Lovelace Health System, Inc., Lovelace Health System, Inc., Lovelace Health System, Inc., Montclair Hospital, LLC, Pasack Valley Hospital, LLC, Physicians Surgical Hospitals, LLC, Pocatello Hospital, LLC, Portland Adventist Medical Center, Reedley Community Hospital, San Joaquin Community Hospital, Simi Valley Hospital & Health Care Services, Sonora Community Hospital, St. Helena Hospital, Topeka Hospital, LLC, Tulsa Spine And Specialty Hospital, LLC, Ukiah Adventist Hospital, Valley Health System, LLC, Watertown Medical Center LLC, West Boca Medical Center, Inc, West Valley Medical Center, Inc., White Memorial Medical Center and Women & Infants Hospital of Rhode Island [Service Date: 10/29/2019 ] [19-5254] (Roth, Robert) [Entered: 10/29/2019 08:00 PM]
October 28, 2019 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1812971] filed by Affinity Hospital, LLC, AHS Claremore Regional Hospital, LLC, AHS Cushing Hospital, LLC, AHS Henryetta Hospital, LLC, AHS Hillcrest Medical Center, LLC, AHS Pryor Hospital, LLC, AHS Southcrest Hospital, LLC, ARMC, L.P., Bailey Medical Center, LLC, Bay County Health, LLC, Bayfront HMA Medical Center, LLC, Baystate Franklin Medical Center, Baystate Medical Center, Inc., Baystate Noble Hospital Corporation, Baystate Wing Hospital Corporation, Berwick Hospital Company, LLC, Beth Israel Deaconess Hospital - Milton, Inc., Beth Israel Deaconess Hospital - Needham, Inc., Beth Israel Deaconess Hospital - Plymouth, Inc., Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center, Inc., Biloxi HMA, LLC, BSA Hospital, LLC, Castle Medical Center, Feather River Hospital, Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center, Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center, Glendale Adventist Medical Center, Hanford Community Hospital, HH Killeen Health System, LLC (Harker Heights), Kent County Memorial Hospital, Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., Lovelace Health System, Inc., Lovelace Health System, Inc., Lovelace Health System, Inc., Lovelace Health System, Inc., Montclair Hospital, LLC, Pasack Valley Hospital, LLC, Physicians Surgical Hospitals, LLC, Pocatello Hospital, LLC, Portland Adventist Medical Center, Reedley Community Hospital, San Joaquin Community Hospital, Simi Valley Hospital & Health Care Services, Sonora Community Hospital, St. Helena Hospital, Topeka Hospital, LLC, Tulsa Spine And Specialty Hospital, LLC, Ukiah Adventist Hospital, Valley Health System, LLC, Watertown Medical Center LLC, West Boca Medical Center, Inc, West Valley Medical Center, Inc., White Memorial Medical Center and Women & Infants Hospital of Rhode Island [Service Date: 10/28/2019 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [19-5254] (Roth, Robert) [Entered: 10/28/2019 08:07 PM]
October 28, 2019 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1812970] submitted by Affinity Hospital, LLC, AHS Claremore Regional Hospital, LLC, AHS Cushing Hospital, LLC, AHS Henryetta Hospital, LLC, AHS Hillcrest Medical Center, LLC, AHS Pryor Hospital, LLC, AHS Southcrest Hospital, LLC, ARMC, L.P., Bailey Medical Center, LLC, Bay County Health, LLC, Bayfront HMA Medical Center, LLC, Baystate Franklin Medical Center, Baystate Medical Center, Inc., Baystate Noble Hospital Corporation, Baystate Wing Hospital Corporation, Berwick Hospital Company, LLC, Beth Israel Deaconess Hospital - Milton, Inc., Beth Israel Deaconess Hospital - Needham, Inc., Beth Israel Deaconess Hospital - Plymouth, Inc., Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center, Inc., Biloxi HMA, LLC, BSA Hospital, LLC, Castle Medical Center, Feather River Hospital, Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center, Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center, Glendale Adventist Medical Center, Hanford Community Hospital, HH Killeen Health System, LLC (Harker Heights), Kent County Memorial Hospital, Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., Lovelace Health System, Inc., Lovelace Health System, Inc., Lovelace Health System, Inc., Lovelace Health System, Inc., Montclair Hospital, LLC, Pasack Valley Hospital, LLC, Physicians Surgical Hospitals, LLC, Pocatello Hospital, LLC, Portland Adventist Medical Center, Reedley Community Hospital, San Joaquin Community Hospital, Simi Valley Hospital & Health Care Services, Sonora Community Hospital, St. Helena Hospital, Topeka Hospital, LLC, Tulsa Spine And Specialty Hospital, LLC, Ukiah Adventist Hospital, Valley Health System, LLC, Watertown Medical Center LLC, West Boca Medical Center, Inc, West Valley Medical Center, Inc., White Memorial Medical Center and Women & Infants Hospital of Rhode Island [Service Date: 10/28/2019 ] [19-5254] (Roth, Robert) [Entered: 10/28/2019 08:05 PM]
October 28, 2019 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1812969] filed by Affinity Hospital, LLC, AHS Claremore Regional Hospital, LLC, AHS Cushing Hospital, LLC, AHS Henryetta Hospital, LLC, AHS Hillcrest Medical Center, LLC, AHS Pryor Hospital, LLC, AHS Southcrest Hospital, LLC, ARMC, L.P., Bailey Medical Center, LLC, Bay County Health, LLC, Bayfront HMA Medical Center, LLC, Baystate Franklin Medical Center, Baystate Medical Center, Inc., Baystate Noble Hospital Corporation, Baystate Wing Hospital Corporation, Berwick Hospital Company, LLC, Beth Israel Deaconess Hospital - Milton, Inc., Beth Israel Deaconess Hospital - Needham, Inc., Beth Israel Deaconess Hospital - Plymouth, Inc., Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center, Inc., Biloxi HMA, LLC, BSA Hospital, LLC, Castle Medical Center, Feather River Hospital, Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center, Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center, Glendale Adventist Medical Center, Hanford Community Hospital, HH Killeen Health System, LLC (Harker Heights), Kent County Memorial Hospital, Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., Lovelace Health System, Inc., Lovelace Health System, Inc., Lovelace Health System, Inc., Lovelace Health System, Inc., Montclair Hospital, LLC, Pasack Valley Hospital, LLC, Physicians Surgical Hospitals, LLC, Pocatello Hospital, LLC, Portland Adventist Medical Center, Reedley Community Hospital, San Joaquin Community Hospital, Simi Valley Hospital & Health Care Services, Sonora Community Hospital, St. Helena Hospital, Topeka Hospital, LLC, Tulsa Spine And Specialty Hospital, LLC, Ukiah Adventist Hospital, Valley Health System, LLC, Watertown Medical Center LLC, West Boca Medical Center, Inc, West Valley Medical Center, Inc., White Memorial Medical Center and Women & Infants Hospital of Rhode Island [Service Date: 10/28/2019 ] [19-5254] (Roth, Robert) [Entered: 10/28/2019 08:04 PM]
October 28, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1812968] filed by Affinity Hospital, LLC, AHS Claremore Regional Hospital, LLC, AHS Cushing Hospital, LLC, AHS Henryetta Hospital, LLC, AHS Hillcrest Medical Center, LLC, AHS Pryor Hospital, LLC, AHS Southcrest Hospital, LLC, ARMC, L.P., Bailey Medical Center, LLC, Bay County Health, LLC, Bayfront HMA Medical Center, LLC, Baystate Franklin Medical Center, Baystate Medical Center, Inc., Baystate Noble Hospital Corporation, Baystate Wing Hospital Corporation, Berwick Hospital Company, LLC, Beth Israel Deaconess Hospital - Milton, Inc., Beth Israel Deaconess Hospital - Needham, Inc., Beth Israel Deaconess Hospital - Plymouth, Inc., Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center, Inc., Biloxi HMA, LLC, BSA Hospital, LLC, Castle Medical Center, Feather River Hospital, Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center, Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center, Glendale Adventist Medical Center, Hanford Community Hospital, HH Killeen Health System, LLC (Harker Heights), Kent County Memorial Hospital, Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., Lovelace Health System, Inc., Lovelace Health System, Inc., Lovelace Health System, Inc., Lovelace Health System, Inc., Montclair Hospital, LLC, Pasack Valley Hospital, LLC, Physicians Surgical Hospitals, LLC, Pocatello Hospital, LLC, Portland Adventist Medical Center, Reedley Community Hospital, San Joaquin Community Hospital, Simi Valley Hospital & Health Care Services, Sonora Community Hospital, St. Helena Hospital, Topeka Hospital, LLC, Tulsa Spine And Specialty Hospital, LLC, Ukiah Adventist Hospital, Valley Health System, LLC, Watertown Medical Center LLC, West Boca Medical Center, Inc, West Valley Medical Center, Inc., White Memorial Medical Center and Women & Infants Hospital of Rhode Island [Service Date: 10/28/2019 ] [19-5254] (Roth, Robert) [Entered: 10/28/2019 08:02 PM]
October 28, 2019 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1812967] filed by Affinity Hospital, LLC, AHS Claremore Regional Hospital, LLC, AHS Cushing Hospital, LLC, AHS Henryetta Hospital, LLC, AHS Hillcrest Medical Center, LLC, AHS Pryor Hospital, LLC, AHS Southcrest Hospital, LLC, ARMC, L.P., Bailey Medical Center, LLC, Bay County Health, LLC, Bayfront HMA Medical Center, LLC, Baystate Franklin Medical Center, Baystate Medical Center, Inc., Baystate Noble Hospital Corporation, Baystate Wing Hospital Corporation, Berwick Hospital Company, LLC, Beth Israel Deaconess Hospital - Milton, Inc., Beth Israel Deaconess Hospital - Needham, Inc., Beth Israel Deaconess Hospital - Plymouth, Inc., Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center, Inc., Biloxi HMA, LLC, BSA Hospital, LLC, Castle Medical Center, Feather River Hospital, Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center, Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center, Glendale Adventist Medical Center, Hanford Community Hospital, HH Killeen Health System, LLC (Harker Heights), Kent County Memorial Hospital, Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., Lovelace Health System, Inc., Lovelace Health System, Inc., Lovelace Health System, Inc., Lovelace Health System, Inc., Montclair Hospital, LLC, Pasack Valley Hospital, LLC, Physicians Surgical Hospitals, LLC, Pocatello Hospital, LLC, Portland Adventist Medical Center, Reedley Community Hospital, San Joaquin Community Hospital, Simi Valley Hospital & Health Care Services, Sonora Community Hospital, St. Helena Hospital, Topeka Hospital, LLC, Tulsa Spine And Specialty Hospital, LLC, Ukiah Adventist Hospital, Valley Health System, LLC, Watertown Medical Center LLC, West Boca Medical Center, Inc, West Valley Medical Center, Inc., White Memorial Medical Center, Women & Infants Hospital of Rhode Island and Mr. Alex Michael Azar, II [Service Date: 10/28/2019 ] [19-5254] (Roth, Robert) [Entered: 10/28/2019 07:59 PM]
October 28, 2019 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1812966] filed by Affinity Hospital, LLC, AHS Claremore Regional Hospital, LLC, AHS Cushing Hospital, LLC, AHS Henryetta Hospital, LLC, AHS Hillcrest Medical Center, LLC, AHS Pryor Hospital, LLC, AHS Southcrest Hospital, LLC, ARMC, L.P., Bailey Medical Center, LLC, Bay County Health, LLC, Bayfront HMA Medical Center, LLC, Baystate Franklin Medical Center, Baystate Medical Center, Inc., Baystate Noble Hospital Corporation, Baystate Wing Hospital Corporation, Berwick Hospital Company, LLC, Beth Israel Deaconess Hospital - Milton, Inc., Beth Israel Deaconess Hospital - Needham, Inc., Beth Israel Deaconess Hospital - Plymouth, Inc., Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center, Inc., Biloxi HMA, LLC, BSA Hospital, LLC, Castle Medical Center, Feather River Hospital, Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center, Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center, Glendale Adventist Medical Center, Hanford Community Hospital, HH Killeen Health System, LLC (Harker Heights), Kent County Memorial Hospital, Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., Lovelace Health System, Inc., Lovelace Health System, Inc., Lovelace Health System, Inc., Lovelace Health System, Inc., Montclair Hospital, LLC, Pasack Valley Hospital, LLC, Physicians Surgical Hospitals, LLC, Pocatello Hospital, LLC, Portland Adventist Medical Center, Reedley Community Hospital, San Joaquin Community Hospital, Simi Valley Hospital & Health Care Services, Sonora Community Hospital, St. Helena Hospital, Topeka Hospital, LLC, Tulsa Spine And Specialty Hospital, LLC, Ukiah Adventist Hospital, Valley Health System, LLC, Watertown Medical Center LLC, West Boca Medical Center, Inc, West Valley Medical Center, Inc., White Memorial Medical Center and Women & Infants Hospital of Rhode Island [Service Date: 10/28/2019 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [19-5254] (Roth, Robert) [Entered: 10/28/2019 07:58 PM]
October 28, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1812964] filed by Robert L. Roth and co-counsel Katrina A. Pagonis and John R. Hellow on behalf of Appellants Affinity Hospital, LLC, AHS Claremore Regional Hospital, LLC, AHS Cushing Hospital, LLC, AHS Henryetta Hospital, LLC, AHS Hillcrest Medical Center, LLC, AHS Pryor Hospital, LLC, AHS Southcrest Hospital, LLC, ARMC, L.P., Bailey Medical Center, LLC, Bay County Health, LLC, Bayfront HMA Medical Center, LLC, Baystate Franklin Medical Center, Baystate Medical Center, Inc., Baystate Noble Hospital Corporation, Baystate Wing Hospital Corporation, Berwick Hospital Company, LLC, Beth Israel Deaconess Hospital - Milton, Inc., Beth Israel Deaconess Hospital - Needham, Inc., Beth Israel Deaconess Hospital - Plymouth, Inc., Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center, Inc., Biloxi HMA, LLC, BSA Hospital, LLC, Castle Medical Center, Feather River Hospital, Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center, Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center, Glendale Adventist Medical Center, Hanford Community Hospital, HH Killeen Health System, LLC (Harker Heights), Kent County Memorial Hospital, Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., Lovelace Health System, Inc., Lovelace Health System, Inc., Lovelace Health System, Inc., Lovelace Health System, Inc., Montclair Hospital, LLC, Pasack Valley Hospital, LLC, Physicians Surgical Hospitals, LLC, Pocatello Hospital, LLC, Portland Adventist Medical Center, Reedley Community Hospital, San Joaquin Community Hospital, Simi Valley Hospital & Health Care Services, Sonora Community Hospital, St. Helena Hospital, Topeka Hospital, LLC, Tulsa Spine And Specialty Hospital, LLC, Ukiah Adventist Hospital, Valley Health System, LLC, Watertown Medical Center LLC, West Boca Medical Center, Inc, West Valley Medical Center, Inc., White Memorial Medical Center, Women & Infants Hospital of Rhode Island and Appellee Mr. Alex Michael Azar, II. [19-5254] (Roth, Robert) [Entered: 10/28/2019 07:54 PM]
October 23, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1812276] filed by Mr. Alex Michael Azar, II [Service Date: 10/23/2019 ] [19-5254] (Schoen, Karen) [Entered: 10/23/2019 09:20 PM]
October 23, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1812154] filed by Karen Schoen and co-counsel Michael S. Raab on behalf of Appellee Mr. Alex Michael Azar, II. [19-5254] (Schoen, Karen) [Entered: 10/23/2019 01:13 PM]
September 27, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1808405] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 10/28/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 10/28/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 10/28/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 10/28/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 10/28/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 10/28/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 10/28/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 10/28/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 11/12/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 10/28/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 10/28/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 10/28/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 11/12/2019 [19-5254] [Entered: 09/27/2019 02:22 PM]
September 27, 2019 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1808403] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:18-cv-00867-CKK filed by AHS Claremore Regional Hospital, LLC, AHS Cushing Hospital, LLC, AHS Henryetta Hospital, LLC, AHS Hillcrest Medical Center, LLC, AHS Pryor Hospital, LLC, AHS Southcrest Hospital, LLC, Affinity Hospital, LLC, Armc, L.P., BSA Hospital, LLC, Bailey Medical Center, LLC, Bay County Health, LLC, Bayfront Hma Medical Center, LLC, Baystate Franklin Medical Center, Baystate Medical Center, Inc., Baystate Noble Hospital Corporation, Baystate Wing Hospital Corporation, Berwick Hospital Company, LLC, Beth Israel Deaconess Hospital - Milton, Inc., Beth Israel Deaconess Hospital - Needham, Inc., Beth Israel Deaconess Hospital - Plymouth, Inc., Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center, Inc., Biloxi HMA, LLC, Castle Medical Center, Feather River Hospital, Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center, Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center, Glendale Adventist Medical Center, HH Killeen Health System, LLC (Harker Heights), Hanford Community Hospital, Kent County Memorial Hospital, Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., Lovelace Health System, Inc., Lovelace Health System, Inc., Lovelace Health System, Inc., Lovelace Health System, Inc., Montclair Hospital, LLC, Pasack Valley Hospital, LLC, Physicians Surgical Hospitals, LLC, Pocatello Hospital, LLC, Portland Adventist Medical Center, Reedley Community Hospital, San Joaquin Community Hospital, Simi Valley Hospital & Health Care Services, Sonora Community Hospital, St. Helena Hospital, Topeka Hospital, LLC, Tulsa Spine And Specialty Hospital, LLC, Ukiah Adventist Hospital, Valley Health System, LLC, Watertown Medical Center LLC, West Boca Medical Center, Inc, West Valley Medical Center, Inc., White Memorial Medical Center and Women & Infants Hospital of Rhode Island. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5254. [19-5254] [Entered: 09/27/2019 02:14 PM]
September 27, 2019 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-5254] [Entered: 09/27/2019 02:13 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fresno Community Hospital and, et al v. Alex Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Lovelace Health System, Inc., doing business as Lovelace Medical Center - Downtown
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Topeka Hospital, LLC, doing business as The University of Kansas Health System, St. Francis Campus
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: John R. Hellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: West Valley Medical Center, Inc., doing business as West Valley Medical Center
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: John R. Hellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Bayfront HMA Medical Center, LLC, doing business as Bayfront Health Punta Gorda
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: John R. Hellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AHS Claremore Regional Hospital, LLC, doing business as Hillcrest Hospital Claremore
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: John R. Hellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AHS Southcrest Hospital, LLC, doing business as Hillcrest Hospital South
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: John R. Hellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Watertown Medical Center LLC, doing business as Watertown Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: John R. Hellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Reedley Community Hospital, doing business as Adventist Medical Center - Reedley
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: John R. Hellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, Inc., doing business as Lodi Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: John R. Hellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Physicians Surgical Hospitals, LLC, doing business as Physicians Surgical Hospital
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: John R. Hellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Pocatello Hospital, LLC, doing business as Portneuf Medical Center
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: John R. Hellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Beth Israel Deaconess Hospital - Plymouth, Inc.
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: John R. Hellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Baystate Wing Hospital Corporation, doing business as Baystate Wing Hospital
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: John R. Hellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Baystate Medical Center, Inc.
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: John R. Hellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Castle Medical Center
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: John R. Hellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: San Joaquin Community Hospital
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: John R. Hellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center, doing business as Community Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: John R. Hellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BSA Hospital, LLC, doing business as Baptist St. Anthonys Hospital
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: John R. Hellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Kent County Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: John R. Hellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Baystate Franklin Medical Center
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: John R. Hellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Bailey Medical Center, LLC, doing business as Bailey Medical Center
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: John R. Hellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AHS Pryor Hospital, LLC, doing business as Hillcrest Hospital Pryor
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: John R. Hellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Beth Israel Deaconess Hospital - Milton, Inc.
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: John R. Hellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Women & Infants Hospital of Rhode Island
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: John R. Hellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Lovelace Health System, Inc., doing business as Lovelace Regional Hospital - Roswell
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HH Killeen Health System, LLC (Harker Heights), doing business as Seton Medical Center Harker Heights
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: John R. Hellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AHS Cushing Hospital, LLC, doing business as Hillcrest Hospital Cushing
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: John R. Hellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Affinity Hospital, LLC, doing business as Grandview Medical Center
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: John R. Hellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Hanford Community Hospital, doing business as Adventist Medical Center - Reedley, doing business as Adventist Medical Center - Selma
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: John R. Hellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Lovelace Health System, Inc., doing business as Lovelace Westside Hospital
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: John R. Hellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AHS Hillcrest Medical Center, LLC, doing business as Hillcrest Medical Center
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: John R. Hellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Portland Adventist Medical Center, doing business as Adventist Medical Center - Portland
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: John R. Hellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Montclair Hospital, LLC, doing business as Mountainside Hospital
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: John R. Hellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Simi Valley Hospital & Health Care Services, doing business as Simi Valley Hospital
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: John R. Hellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Biloxi HMA, LLC, doing business as Merit Health Biloxi
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: John R. Hellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: St. Helena Hospital, doing business as St. Helena Hospital Napa Valley
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: John R. Hellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Feather River Hospital
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: John R. Hellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Sonora Community Hospital, doing business as Sonora Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: John R. Hellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: White Memorial Medical Center
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: John R. Hellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Glendale Adventist Medical Center
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: John R. Hellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AHS Henryetta Hospital, LLC, doing business as Hillcrest Hospital Henryetta
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: John R. Hellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Valley Health System, LLC, doing business as Desert Springs Hospital Medical Center
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: John R. Hellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Baystate Noble Hospital Corporation, doing business as Baystate Noble Hospital
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: John R. Hellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Lovelace Health System, Inc., doing business as Lovelace Womens Hospital
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Berwick Hospital Company, LLC, doing business as Berwick Hospital Center
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: John R. Hellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ARMC, L.P., doing business as Abilene Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: John R. Hellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: West Boca Medical Center, Inc, doing business as West Boca Medical Center
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: John R. Hellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Ukiah Adventist Hospital, doing business as Ukiah Valley Medical Center
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: John R. Hellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Fresno Community Hospital and Medical Center, doing business as Clovis Community Medical Center
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center, Inc.
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: John R. Hellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Bay County Health, LLC, doing business as Bay Medical Center
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: John R. Hellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Tulsa Spine And Specialty Hospital, LLC, doing business as Tulsa Spine & Specialty Hospital
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: John R. Hellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Pasack Valley Hospital, LLC, doing business as Hackensack UMC at Pasack Valley
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: John R. Hellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Beth Israel Deaconess Hospital - Needham, Inc.
Represented By: Robert L. Roth Esquire
Represented By: John R. Hellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Alex Michael Azar, II, Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Karen Schoen
Represented By: Michael S. Raab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?