VoteVets Action Fund v. DVA, et al
Defendant / Appellee: Robert Wilkie, in his official capacity as Secretary of the United States Department of Veterans Affairs and United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Plaintiff / Appellant: VoteVets Action Fund
Case Number: 19-5337
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 STATEMENT [1823661] with Disclosure Listing filed by VoteVets Action Fund [Service Date: 01/10/2020 ] [19-5337] (Jones, Karianne) [Entered: 01/10/2020 04:45 PM]
December 24, 2019 CORRECTED DOCKETING STATEMENT [1821515] filed by VoteVets Action Fund [Service Date: 12/24/2019 ] [19-5337] (Jones, Karianne) [Entered: 12/24/2019 01:16 PM]
December 23, 2019 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1821340] submitted by VoteVets Action Fund [Service Date: 12/23/2019 ] [19-5337] (Jones, Karianne) [Entered: 12/23/2019 12:57 PM]
December 23, 2019 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1821339] filed by VoteVets Action Fund [Service Date: 12/23/2019 ] [19-5337] (Jones, Karianne) [Entered: 12/23/2019 12:56 PM]
December 23, 2019 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1821338] filed by VoteVets Action Fund [Service Date: 12/23/2019 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [19-5337] (Jones, Karianne) [Entered: 12/23/2019 12:55 PM]
December 23, 2019 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1821337] filed by VoteVets Action Fund [Service Date: 12/23/2019 ] [19-5337] (Jones, Karianne) [Entered: 12/23/2019 12:54 PM]
December 23, 2019 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1821336] filed by VoteVets Action Fund [Service Date: 12/23/2019 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [19-5337] (Jones, Karianne) [Entered: 12/23/2019 12:52 PM]
December 23, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1821334] filed by Karianne M. Jones and co-counsel Benjamin Seel on behalf of Appellant VoteVets Action Fund. [19-5337] (Jones, Karianne) [Entered: 12/23/2019 12:51 PM]
December 23, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1821332] filed by VoteVets Action Fund [Service Date: 12/23/2019 ] [19-5337] (Jones, Karianne) [Entered: 12/23/2019 12:50 PM]
December 23, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1821266] filed by DVA and Robert Wilkie [Service Date: 12/23/2019 ] [19-5337] (Winik, Daniel) [Entered: 12/23/2019 09:35 AM]
December 23, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1821257] filed by Daniel Winik and co-counsel Mark B. Stern on behalf of Appellees DVA and Robert Wilkie. [19-5337] (Winik, Daniel) [Entered: 12/23/2019 09:16 AM]
December 3, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1818477] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 01/02/2020. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 01/02/2020. APPELLANT statement of issues due 01/02/2020. APPELLANT underlying decision due 01/02/2020. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 01/02/2020. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 01/02/2020. APPELLANT transcript status report due 01/02/2020. APPELLANT procedural motions due 01/02/2020. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 01/17/2020; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 01/02/2020. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 01/02/2020. APPELLEE procedural motions due 01/02/2020. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 01/17/2020 [19-5337] [Entered: 12/03/2019 12:41 PM]
November 27, 2019 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1818475] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:18-cv-01925-TJK filed by Votevets Action Fund. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5337. [19-5337] [Entered: 12/03/2019 12:40 PM]
November 27, 2019 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-5337] [Entered: 12/03/2019 12:40 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VoteVets Action Fund v. DVA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Robert Wilkie, in his official capacity as Secretary of the United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Mark B. Stern
Represented By: Daniel Winik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: VoteVets Action Fund
Represented By: Karianne Jones
Represented By: Benjamin M. Seel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?