Laurence Schneider, et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, National, et al

Plaintiff: State of Iowa, ex rel. Laurence Schneider, United States of America, ex rel. Laurence Schneider, State of California, ex rel. Laurence Schneider, State of Georgia, ex rel. Laurence Schneider, State of Tennessee, ex rel. Laurence Schneider, State of Virginia, ex rel. Laurence Schneider, State of New Jersey, ex rel. Laurence Schneider, State of Montana, ex rel. Laurence Schneider, State of Illinois, ex rel. Laurence Schneider, District of Columbia, ex rel. Laurence Schneider, State of Massachusetts, ex rel. Laurence Schneider, State of Hawaii, ex rel. Laurence Schneider, State of North Carolina, ex rel. Laurence Schneider, State of Delaware, ex rel. Laurence Schneider, State of Minnesota, ex rel. Laurence Schneider, State of New Mexico, ex rel. Laurence Schneider, State of Rhode Island, ex rel. Laurence Schneider, State of Indiana, ex rel. Laurence Schneider, State of New York, ex rel. Laurence Schneider and State of Nevada, ex rel. Laurence Schneider
Defendant / Appellee: Chase Home Finance, LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association and JP Morgan Chase & Co.
Plaintiff / Appellant: Laurence Schneider
Not Yet Classified: United States of America
Case Number: 19-7025
Filed: April 5, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1789557] filed granting motion to extend time [ # 1789431-2 ]; directing response to motion for summary affirmance [ # 1789291-2 ] Appellant's response due on 06/21/2019. Appellees' replies, if any, due 07/12/2019 [19-7025] [Entered: 05/24/2019 05:29 PM]
May 24, 2019 CONSENT MOTION [1789431] to extend time to file motion to 06/21/2019 filed by Laurence Schneider (Service Date: 05/24/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 214. [19-7025] (Black, Joseph) [Entered: 05/24/2019 12:58 PM]
May 24, 2019 NOTICE [1789373] to join motion for summary affirmance [ # 1789291-2 ] filed by and Appellee filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, JP Morgan Chase & Co. and Chase Home Finance, LLC [Service Date: 05/24/2019 ] [19-7025] (Wick, Robert) [Entered: 05/24/2019 11:28 AM]
May 23, 2019 MOTION [1789291] for summary affirmance (Response to Motion served by hand due on 06/03/2019). (Response to Motion served by mail due on 06/03/2019) filed by USA (Service Date: 05/23/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 1,221 Words. [19-7025] (Hudak, Brian) [Entered: 05/23/2019 09:37 PM]
May 9, 2019 STATEMENT [1787197] with Disclosure Listing filed by Chase Home Finance, LLC, JP Morgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association [Service Date: 05/09/2019 ] [19-7025] (Wick, Robert) [Entered: 05/09/2019 04:02 PM]
May 8, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1786847] filed by JP Morgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association and Chase Home Finance, LLC [Service Date: 05/08/2019 ] [19-7025] (Wick, Robert) [Entered: 05/08/2019 01:19 PM]
May 8, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1786830] filed by Robert D. Wick and co-counsel Christian J. Pistilli on behalf of Appellees Chase Home Finance, LLC, JP Morgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association. [19-7025] (Wick, Robert) [Entered: 05/08/2019 01:01 PM]
May 7, 2019 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [1786554] to certificate [ # 1786544-2 ], notice [ # 1786545-2 ], statement [ # 1786547-2 ], statement [ # 1786548-2 ], statement [ # 1786549-2 ], report status of transcript (final) [ # 1786551-2 ], record [ # 1786553-2 ] filed by Laurence Schneider. [19-7025] (Black, Joseph) [Entered: 05/07/2019 01:28 PM]
May 7, 2019 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1786553] submitted by Laurence Schneider [Service Date: 05/07/2019 ] [19-7025] (Black, Joseph) [Entered: 05/07/2019 01:25 PM]
May 7, 2019 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1786551] filed by Laurence Schneider [Service Date: 05/07/2019 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - All transcripts needed for the appeal have been completed and received. [19-7025] (Black, Joseph) [Entered: 05/07/2019 01:23 PM]
May 7, 2019 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1786549] filed by Laurence Schneider [Service Date: 05/07/2019 ] [19-7025] (Black, Joseph) [Entered: 05/07/2019 01:22 PM]
May 7, 2019 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1786548] filed by Laurence Schneider [Service Date: 05/07/2019 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [19-7025] (Black, Joseph) [Entered: 05/07/2019 01:21 PM]
May 7, 2019 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1786547] filed by Laurence Schneider [Service Date: 05/07/2019 ] [19-7025] (Black, Joseph) [Entered: 05/07/2019 01:19 PM]
May 7, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1786545] filed by Joseph A. Black and co-counsel Daniel E. Cohen, Robert L. DiMarco on behalf of Appellant Laurence Schneider. [19-7025] (Black, Joseph) [Entered: 05/07/2019 01:18 PM]
May 7, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1786544] filed by Laurence Schneider [Service Date: 05/07/2019 ] [19-7025] (Black, Joseph) [Entered: 05/07/2019 01:16 PM]
May 6, 2019 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1786209] filed by USA [Service Date: 05/06/2019 ] [19-7025] (Hudak, Brian) [Entered: 05/06/2019 02:50 PM]
April 11, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1782492] filed by Brian P. Hudak and co-counsel R. Craig Lawrence on behalf of USA and Appellee USA. [19-7025] (Hudak, Brian) [Entered: 04/11/2019 04:27 PM]
April 8, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1781748] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 05/08/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 05/08/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 05/08/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 05/08/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 05/08/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 05/08/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 05/08/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 05/08/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 05/23/2019. Directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 05/08/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 05/08/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 05/08/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 05/23/2019 [19-7025] [Entered: 04/08/2019 05:02 PM]
April 8, 2019 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1781746] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:14-cv-01047-RMC filed by Laurence Schneider. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-7025. [19-7025] [Entered: 04/08/2019 04:58 PM]
April 5, 2019 PRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-7025] [Entered: 04/08/2019 03:53 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laurence Schneider, et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, National, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Iowa, ex rel. Laurence Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America, ex rel. Laurence Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of California, ex rel. Laurence Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Georgia, ex rel. Laurence Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Tennessee, ex rel. Laurence Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Virginia, ex rel. Laurence Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New Jersey, ex rel. Laurence Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Montana, ex rel. Laurence Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Illinois, ex rel. Laurence Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District of Columbia, ex rel. Laurence Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Massachusetts, ex rel. Laurence Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Hawaii, ex rel. Laurence Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of North Carolina, ex rel. Laurence Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Delaware, ex rel. Laurence Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Minnesota, ex rel. Laurence Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New Mexico, ex rel. Laurence Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Rhode Island, ex rel. Laurence Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Indiana, ex rel. Laurence Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New York, ex rel. Laurence Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Nevada, ex rel. Laurence Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Chase Home Finance, LLC
Represented By: Michael M. Maya
Represented By: Robert D. Wick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association
Represented By: Michael M. Maya
Represented By: Robert D. Wick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JP Morgan Chase & Co.
Represented By: Michael M. Maya
Represented By: Robert D. Wick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Laurence Schneider
Represented By: Roberto Di Marco
Represented By: Joseph A. Black Esquire
Represented By: Daniel E. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: United States of America
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Brian Paul Hudak Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?