Stephen Jiggetts v. Daniel Cipullo, et al
Defendant / Appellant: Daniel W. Cipullo, Individually, and in his official capacity
Defendant / Appellee: District of Columbia
Plaintiff / Appellee: Stephen Jiggetts
Case Number: 19-7042
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 MANDATE ISSUED to Clerk, U.S. District Court. [19-7042] [Entered: 06/26/2019 02:06 PM]
June 26, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1794600] filed granting motion to dismiss case voluntarily [ # 1792905-2 ] The Clerk is directed to issue the mandate forthwith to the district court. [19-7042] [Entered: 06/26/2019 02:02 PM]
June 14, 2019 CONSENT UNOPPOSED MOTION [1792905] to dismiss case voluntarily filed by Daniel W. Cipullo [Service Date: 06/14/2019 ] Length Certification: 39 words. [19-7042] (Phillips, Graham) [Entered: 06/14/2019 02:41 PM]
June 14, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1792775] filed by Graham E. Phillips and co-counsel Loren L. AliKhan; Caroline S. Van Zile on behalf of Appellee DC and Appellant Daniel W. Cipullo. [19-7042] (Phillips, Graham) [Entered: 06/14/2019 10:18 AM]
May 20, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1788510] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 06/19/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 06/19/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 06/19/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 06/19/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 06/19/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 06/19/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 06/19/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 06/19/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 07/05/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 06/19/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 06/19/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 06/19/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 07/05/2019 [19-7042] [Entered: 05/20/2019 11:25 AM]
May 14, 2019 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1787706] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:15-cv-01951-RBW filed by Daniel W. Cipullo. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-7042. [19-7042] [Entered: 05/14/2019 10:36 AM]
May 14, 2019 PRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-7042] [Entered: 05/14/2019 10:33 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stephen Jiggetts v. Daniel Cipullo, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Daniel W. Cipullo, Individually, and in his official capacity
Represented By: Loren L. AliKhan
Represented By: Caroline S. Van Zile
Represented By: Graham E. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: District of Columbia
Represented By: Loren L. AliKhan
Represented By: Caroline S. Van Zile
Represented By: Graham E. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Stephen Jiggetts
Represented By: Timothy Francis Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?