NLRB v. Leggett & Platt, Inc.
Petitioner: National Labor Relations Board
Respondent: Leggett & Platt, Inc.
Case Number: 20-1134
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1840048] filed setting briefing schedule: PETITIONER Brief due 06/08/2020. RESPONDENT Brief due on 07/08/2020. INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT Brief due 07/15/2020. PETITIONER Reply Brief due 08/05/2020. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 08/12/2020. Final Briefs due 08/26/2020. [20-1060, 20-1061, 20-1134] [Entered: 04/27/2020 04:54 PM]
April 24, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1839740] filed consolidating cases 20-1134 (Cross-appeal started 04/24/2020) with 20-1060 [20-1060, 20-1061, 20-1134] [Entered: 04/24/2020 02:44 PM]
April 24, 2020 CERTIFIED COPY [1839729] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1839727-2 ] [20-1134] [Entered: 04/24/2020 02:22 PM]
April 22, 2020 CROSS-APPLICATION FOR ENFORCEMENT [1839727] of a decision by federal agency filed by NLRB [Service Date: 04/22/2020 ] [20-1134] [Entered: 04/24/2020 02:19 PM]
April 22, 2020 CROSS-APPLICATION FOR ENFORCEMENT CASE docketed. [20-1134] [Entered: 04/24/2020 02:17 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: NLRB v. Leggett & Platt, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: National Labor Relations Board
Represented By: David S. Habenstreit
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Heaney Esquire
Represented By: Barbara Ann Sheehy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Leggett & Platt, Inc.
Represented By: Arthur Tracy Carter
Represented By: Arrissa Kathryn Meyer Esquire
Represented By: Alfred John Harper III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?