Westmoreland Mining Holdings v. EPA
Petitioner: Westmoreland Mining Holdings LLC
Respondent: Environmental Protection Agency
Intervenor: Sierra Club, Conservation Law Foundation, Montana Environmental Information Center, Natural Resources Defense Council, Exelon Corporation, Ohio Environmental Council, Environment America, National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Law and Policy Center, American Lung Association, Clean Air Council, Citizens for Pennsylvania's Future, Environmental Integrity Project, Physicians for Social Responsibility, American Academy of Pediatrics, Chesapeake Climate Action Network, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc., American Public Health Association, Public Service Enterprise Group Incorporated, Natural Resources Council of Maine, Calpine Corporation, State of Vermont, State of Minnesota, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Delaware, State of California, State of North Carolina, State of Connecticut, State of Michigan, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of Rhode Island, State of New Jersey, State of Illinois, State of New York, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, City of New York, State of Oregon, ADA Carbon Solutions, LLC, ADA-ES, Inc. and Advanced Emissions Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 20-1160
Filed: May 22, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1864430] filed directing any intervenor noted on the docket in No. 20-1160, who wishes to participate in Nos. 20-1221, et al., or 20-1268, is directed to submit notice in each case within 14 days of the date of this order, and to indicate which party it supports. Notice of Intention to Intervene due 10/15/2020. [20-1160, 20-1221, 20-1265, 20-1266, 20-1270, 20-1271, 20-1268] [Entered: 10/01/2020 04:02 PM]
September 28, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1863712] filed considering motions to sever and hold case in abeyance [ # 1858948-2 ] [ # 1857786-2 ]. Case No. 20-1268 be severed from these consolidated cases and held in abeyance pending further order of the court. The parties in No. 20-1268 are directed to file status reports at 90-day intervals beginning 90 days from the date of this order, and to file motions to govern further proceedings within 30 days of the completion of the relevant administrative reconsideration proceedings. Case No. 20-1160 be severed from these consolidated cases and held in abeyance pending further order of the court. The parties in No. 20-1160 are directed to file motions to govern further proceedings within 30 days of this courts resolution of No. 20-1221, et al. [20-1160, 20-1221, 20-1265, 20-1266, 20-1268, 20-1270, 20-1271] [Entered: 09/28/2020 02:24 PM]
September 11, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1860992] filed granting motion for leave to intervene [ # 1852573-2 ] in 20-1160, granting motion for leave to intervene [ # 1848452-2 ] in 20-1160, granting motion for leave to intervene [ # 1848439-2 ] in 20-1160, granting motion for leave to intervene [ # 1848211-2 ] in 20-1160, granting motion for leave to intervene [ # 1848088-2 ] in 20-1160 [20-1160, 20-1221, 20-1265, 20-1266, 20-1268, 20-1270, 20-1271] [Entered: 09/11/2020 12:07 PM]
September 4, 2020 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT [1860071] to motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1858948-2 ] filed by American Lung Association, American Public Health Association, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc., Chesapeake Climate Action Network, Citizens for Pennsylvania's Future, Clean Air Council, Conservation Law Foundation, Environment America, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Integrity Project, Environmental Law and Policy Center, Montana Environmental Information Center, NAACP, Natural Resources Council of Maine, Natural Resources Defense Council, Ohio Environmental Council, Physicians for Social Responsibility and Sierra Club in 20-1160 [Service Date: 09/04/2020 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 193 words. [20-1160, 20-1221, 20-1265, 20-1266, 20-1268, 20-1270, 20-1271] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 09/04/2020 06:31 PM]
September 4, 2020 CERTIFIED INDEX TO RECORD [1860049] filed by EPA in 20-1160, Andrew Wheeler in 20-1221, EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 20-1265, 20-1266, 20-1268, 20-1270, 20-1271 [Service Date: 09/04/2020 ] [20-1160, 20-1221, 20-1265, 20-1266, 20-1268, 20-1270, 20-1271] (Greenfield, Meghan) [Entered: 09/04/2020 04:09 PM]
August 28, 2020 MOTION [1858948] to hold case in abeyance filed by Westmoreland Mining Holdings LLC in 20-1160 (Service Date: 08/28/2020 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 1,508 words. [20-1160, 20-1221, 20-1265, 20-1266, 20-1268, 20-1270, 20-1271] (DeLaquil, Mark) [Entered: 08/28/2020 05:52 PM]
August 26, 2020 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1858372] filed by City of Baltimore, City of Chicago, City of New York, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Michigan, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington, State of Wisconsin and Erie County in 20-1265 [Service Date: 08/26/2020 ] [20-1265, 20-1160, 20-1221, 20-1266, 20-1268, 20-1270, 20-1271] (Frankel, David) [Entered: 08/26/2020 11:49 AM]
August 26, 2020 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1858371] filed by City of Baltimore, City of Chicago, City of New York, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, Erie County, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Michigan, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and State of Wisconsin in 20-1265 [Service Date: 08/26/2020 ] [20-1265, 20-1160, 20-1221, 20-1266, 20-1268, 20-1270, 20-1271] (Frankel, David) [Entered: 08/26/2020 11:44 AM]
August 24, 2020 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1858071] filed by Calpine Corporation, Exelon Corporation, National Grid Generation, LLC and Public Service Enterprise Group Incorporated in 20-1270 [Service Date: 08/24/2020 ] [20-1160, 20-1221, 20-1265, 20-1266, 20-1268, 20-1270, 20-1271] (Poloncarz, Kevin) [Entered: 08/24/2020 05:59 PM]
August 24, 2020 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1858069] filed by Calpine Corporation, Exelon Corporation, National Grid Generation, LLC and Public Service Enterprise Group Incorporated in 20-1270 [Service Date: 08/24/2020 ] [20-1160, 20-1221, 20-1265, 20-1266, 20-1268, 20-1270, 20-1271] (Poloncarz, Kevin) [Entered: 08/24/2020 05:57 PM]
August 24, 2020 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1857930] filed by Texas Campaign for the Environment, Air Alliance Houston, Chesapeake Climate Action Network, Clean Air Council, Downwinders at Risk, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Integrity Project, Montana Environmental Information Center and Sierra Club in 20-1268, Air Alliance Houston, Chesapeake Climate Action Network, Clean Air Council, Downwinders at Risk, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Integrity Project, Montana Environmental Information Center and Sierra Club in 20-1221 [Service Date: 08/24/2020 ] [20-1268, 20-1160, 20-1221, 20-1265, 20-1266, 20-1270, 20-1271] (Pew, James) [Entered: 08/24/2020 12:17 PM]
August 24, 2020 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1857928] filed by Air Alliance Houston, Chesapeake Climate Action Network, Clean Air Council, Downwinders at Risk, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Integrity Project, Montana Environmental Information Center, Sierra Club and Texas Campaign for the Environment in 20-1268, Air Alliance Houston, Chesapeake Climate Action Network, Clean Air Council, Downwinders at Risk, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Integrity Project, Montana Environmental Information Center and Sierra Club in 20-1221 [Service Date: 08/24/2020 ] [20-1268, 20-1160, 20-1221, 20-1265, 20-1266, 20-1270, 20-1271] (Pew, James) [Entered: 08/24/2020 12:15 PM]
August 21, 2020 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1857817] filed by Puget Sound Energy, Inc. in 20-1271 [Service Date: 08/21/2020 ] [20-1160, 20-1265, 20-1221, 20-1266, 20-1268, 20-1270, 20-1271] (Berge, Megan) [Entered: 08/21/2020 08:04 PM]
August 21, 2020 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1857816] filed by Puget Sound Energy, Inc. in 20-1271 [Service Date: 08/21/2020 ] [20-1160, 20-1221, 20-1265, 20-1266, 20-1268, 20-1270, 20-1271] (Berge, Megan) [Entered: 08/21/2020 08:01 PM]
August 21, 2020 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1857810] filed by Westmoreland Mining Holdings LLC in 20-1160 [Service Date: 08/21/2020 ] [20-1160, 20-1221, 20-1265, 20-1266, 20-1268, 20-1270, 20-1271] (DeLaquil, Mark) [Entered: 08/21/2020 06:09 PM]
August 21, 2020 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1857809] filed by Westmoreland Mining Holdings LLC in 20-1160 [Service Date: 08/21/2020 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [20-1160, 20-1221, 20-1265, 20-1266, 20-1268, 20-1270, 20-1271] (DeLaquil, Mark) [Entered: 08/21/2020 06:06 PM]
August 21, 2020 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1857807] filed by Westmoreland Mining Holdings LLC in 20-1160 [Service Date: 08/21/2020 ] [20-1160, 20-1221, 20-1265, 20-1266, 20-1268, 20-1270, 20-1271] (DeLaquil, Mark) [Entered: 08/21/2020 06:03 PM]
August 21, 2020 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1857806] submitted by Westmoreland Mining Holdings LLC in 20-1160 [Service Date: 08/21/2020 ] [20-1160, 20-1221, 20-1265, 20-1266, 20-1268, 20-1270, 20-1271] (DeLaquil, Mark) [Entered: 08/21/2020 05:56 PM]
August 21, 2020 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1857805] filed by Westmoreland Mining Holdings LLC in 20-1160 [Service Date: 08/21/2020 ] [20-1160, 20-1221, 20-1265, 20-1266, 20-1268, 20-1270, 20-1271] (DeLaquil, Mark) [Entered: 08/21/2020 05:48 PM]
August 21, 2020 UNOPPOSED MOTION [1857786] to sever issue, to hold case in abeyance filed by Air Alliance Houston, Chesapeake Climate Action Network, Clean Air Council, Downwinders at Risk, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Integrity Project, Montana Environmental Information Center, Sierra Club and Texas Campaign for the Environment in 20-1268, Air Alliance Houston, Chesapeake Climate Action Network, Clean Air Council, Downwinders at Risk, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Integrity Project, Montana Environmental Information Center and Sierra Club in 20-1221 [Service Date: 08/21/2020 ] Length Certification: 660 words. [20-1268, 20-1160, 20-1221, 20-1265, 20-1266, 20-1270, 20-1271] (Dycus, Patton) [Entered: 08/21/2020 04:57 PM]
August 21, 2020 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1857666] filed by ADA Carbon Solutions, LLC, ADA-ES, Inc. and Advanced Emissions Solutions, Inc. in 20-1266 [Service Date: 08/21/2020 ] [20-1266, 20-1160, 20-1221, 20-1265, 20-1268, 20-1270, 20-1271] (Boudreau, Lorene) [Entered: 08/21/2020 12:34 PM]
August 21, 2020 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1857620] filed by ADA Carbon Solutions, LLC, ADA-ES, Inc. and Advanced Emissions Solutions, Inc. in 20-1266 [Service Date: 08/21/2020 ] [20-1266, 20-1160, 20-1221, 20-1265, 20-1268, 20-1270, 20-1271] (Boudreau, Lorene) [Entered: 08/21/2020 11:37 AM]
August 17, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1856851] filed granting motion to extend time [ # 1856419-2 ]; extending Clerk order [ # 1848038-2 ] in 20-1160; PETITIONER and RESPONDENT procedural motions due 08/28/2020 [20-1160, 20-1221, 20-1265, 20-1266, 20-1268, 20-1270, 20-1271] [Entered: 08/17/2020 02:38 PM]
August 13, 2020 UNOPPOSED MOTION [1856419] to extend time to file initial submissions to 08/28/2020 filed by EPA in 20-1160, Andrew Wheeler in 20-1221, EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 20-1265, 20-1266, 20-1268, 20-1270, 20-1271 [Service Date: 08/13/2020 ] Length Certification: 3 pages. [20-1160, 20-1221, 20-1265, 20-1266, 20-1268, 20-1270, 20-1271] (Greenfield, Meghan) [Entered: 08/13/2020 01:44 PM]
July 29, 2020 NOTICE [1854139] to withdraw attorney Robert David Cheren who represented Westmoreland Mining Holdings LLC in 20-1160 filed by Westmoreland Mining Holdings LLC [Service Date: 07/29/2020 ] [20-1160] (DeLaquil, Mark) [Entered: 07/29/2020 07:30 PM]
July 28, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1853752] filed directing party to file in 20-1266 payment of docketing fee: PETITIONER payment of docketing fee due 08/21/2020. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution [20-1266, 20-1160, 20-1221, 20-1265, 20-1268, 20-1270, 20-1271] [Entered: 07/28/2020 12:01 PM]
July 27, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1853582] filed consolidating cases 20-1265 (Consolidation started 07/27/2020) with 20-1160; directing party to file in 20-1265 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 08/26/2020. PETITIONER statement of issues due 08/26/2020 [20-1160, 20-1221, 20-1265, 20-1266, 20-1268, 20-1270, 20-1271] [Entered: 07/27/2020 11:45 AM]
July 23, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1853201] filed consolidating cases 20-1268, 20-1270 (Consolidation started 07/23/2020) with 20-1160; directing party to file in 20-1268, 20-1270 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 08/24/2020. PETITIONER statement of issues due 08/24/2020 [20-1160, 20-1221, 20-1266, 20-1268, 20-1270, 20-1271] [Entered: 07/23/2020 12:57 PM]
July 22, 2020 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1853075] filed by Air Alliance Houston, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Lung Association, American Public Health Association, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc., Chesapeake Climate Action Network, Citizens for Pennsylvania's Future, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Conservation Law Foundation, Downwinders at Risk, Environment America, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Integrity Project, Environmental Law and Policy Center, Montana Environmental Information Center, NAACP, Natural Resources Council of Maine, Natural Resources Defense Council, Physicians for Social Responsibility, Sierra Club, The Ohio Environmental Council and United States Public Interest Research Group, Inc. [Service Date: 07/22/2020 ] [20-1221] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 07/22/2020 05:49 PM]
July 22, 2020 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1853073] filed by Air Alliance Houston, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Lung Association, American Public Health Association, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc., Chesapeake Climate Action Network, Citizens for Pennsylvania's Future, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Conservation Law Foundation, Downwinders at Risk, Environment America, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Integrity Project, Environmental Law and Policy Center, Montana Environmental Information Center, NAACP, Natural Resources Council of Maine, Natural Resources Defense Council, Physicians for Social Responsibility, Sierra Club, The Ohio Environmental Council and United States Public Interest Research Group, Inc. [Service Date: 07/22/2020 ] [20-1221] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 07/22/2020 05:46 PM]
July 22, 2020 CORRECTED ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1852984] filed by Megan H. Berge and co-counsel Debra J. Jezouit; Jared R. Wigginton on behalf of Petitioner Puget Sound Energy, Inc. in 20-1271. [20-1271, 20-1266, 20-1160, 20-1221] (Berge, Megan) [Entered: 07/22/2020 03:16 PM]
July 22, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1852958] filed by Megan H. Berge and co-counsel Jared R. Wigginton on behalf of Petitioner Puget Sound Energy, Inc. in 20-1271. [20-1271, 20-1160, 20-1221, 20-1266] (Berge, Megan) [Entered: 07/22/2020 02:23 PM]
July 22, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1852941] filed consolidating cases 20-1266, 20-1271 (Consolidation started 07/22/2020) with 20-1160; directing parties to file in 20-1266, 20-1271 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 08/21/2020. PETITIONER statement of issues due 08/21/2020 [20-1160, 20-1221, 20-1266, 20-1271] [Entered: 07/22/2020 01:32 PM]
July 20, 2020 MOTION [1852573] for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by Advanced Emissions Solutions, Inc., ADA Carbon Solutions, LLC, and ADA-ES, Inc. [Service Date: 07/20/2020 ] [20-1160]--[MODIFIED PARTY FILER--Edited 07/21/2020 by LMC] (Boudreau, Lorene) [Entered: 07/20/2020 04:45 PM]
June 25, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1848984] filed by John D. Walke and co-counsel Emily K. Davis on behalf of Petitioner Natural Resources Defense Council. [20-1221] (Walke, John) [Entered: 06/25/2020 04:27 PM]
June 22, 2020 MOTION [1848452] for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by Calpine Corporation, Exelon Corporation, and Public Service Enterprise Group Incorporated [Service Date: 06/22/2020 ] [20-1160]--[Edited 06/23/2020 by TAM] (Poloncarz, Kevin) [Entered: 06/22/2020 06:46 PM]
June 22, 2020 MOTION [1848439] for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] filed by Commonwealths of Massachusetts and Pennsylvania, States of California, Connecticut, Delaware, Illinois, Maine, Maryland, Michigan, Minnesota, New Jersey, New York, North Carolina, Oregon, Rhode Island, Vermont, and the City of New York [Service Date: 06/22/2020 ] [20-1160]--[Edited 06/24/2020 by TAM] (Frankel, David) [Entered: 06/22/2020 05:03 PM]
June 22, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1848349] filed consolidating case 20-1221 (Consolidation started 06/22/2020) with 20-1160; directing parties to file in 20-1221 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 07/22/2020. PETITIONER statement of issues due 07/22/2020 [20-1160, 20-1221] [Entered: 06/22/2020 11:07 AM]
June 19, 2020 CORRECTED MOTION [1848211] for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by American Academy of Pediatrics and 18 other public health, environmental, and civil rights organizations [Service Date: 06/19/2020 ] [20-1160] (Weeks, Ann) [Entered: 06/19/2020 01:48 PM]
June 19, 2020 MOTION [1848088] for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by American Academy of Pediatrics, American Lung Association, American Public Health Association, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc., Chesapeake Climate Action Network, Citizens for Pennsylvania's Future, Clean Air Council, Conservation Law Foundation, Environment America, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Integrity Project, Environmental Law and Policy Center, Montana Environmental Information Center, NAACP, Natural Resources Council of Maine, Natural Resources Defense Council, Ohio Environmental Council, Physicians for Social Responsibility and Sierra Club [Service Date: 06/19/2020 ] [20-1160]--[MODIFIED PARTY FILER--Edited 06/19/2020 by LMC] (Weeks, Ann) [Entered: 06/19/2020 09:01 AM]
June 18, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1848038] filed granting motion to extend time [ # 1847824-2 ]; PETITIONER docketing statement, certificate as to parties, statement of issues, underlying decision, deferred appendix statement due 08/21/2020. PETITIONER and RESPONDENT procedural motions due 08/21/2020. PETITIONER and RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 09/04/2020; RESPONDENT certified index to record due 09/04/2020. [20-1160] [Entered: 06/18/2020 05:16 PM]
June 17, 2020 UNOPPOSED MOTION [1847824] to extend time to file initial submissions to 08/21/2020 filed by EPA [Service Date: 06/17/2020 ] Length Certification: 3 pages. [20-1160] (Greenfield, Meghan) [Entered: 06/17/2020 07:41 PM]
June 5, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1845941] filed by Meghan E. Greenfield on behalf of Respondent EPA. [20-1160] (Greenfield, Meghan) [Entered: 06/05/2020 01:47 PM]
May 22, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1844038] filed directing party to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 06/22/2020. PETITIONER certificate as to parties due 06/22/2020. PETITIONER statement of issues due 06/22/2020. PETITIONER underlying decision due 06/22/2020. PETITIONER deferred appendix statement due 06/22/2020. PETITIONER procedural motions due 06/22/2020. PETITIONER dispositive motions due 07/06/2020; directing party to file initial submissions: RESPONDENT entry of appearance due 06/22/2020. RESPONDENT procedural motions due 06/22/2020. RESPONDENT certified index to record due 07/06/2020. RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 07/06/2020 [20-1160] [Entered: 05/22/2020 01:56 PM]
May 22, 2020 CERTIFIED COPY [1844034] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1844031-2 ] [20-1160] [Entered: 05/22/2020 01:46 PM]
May 22, 2020 PETITION FOR REVIEW [1844031] of a decision by federal agency filed by Westmoreland Mining Holdings LLC [Service Date: 05/22/2020 ] Disclosure Statement: Attached; Certificate of Parties: Not Applicable to this Filing. [20-1160] [Entered: 05/22/2020 01:43 PM]
May 22, 2020 PETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [20-1160] [Entered: 05/22/2020 01:20 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Westmoreland Mining Holdings v. EPA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Westmoreland Mining Holdings LLC
Represented By: Robert David Cheren
Represented By: Andrew Michael Grossman
Represented By: Mark W. DeLaquil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Meghan Greenfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Sierra Club
Represented By: Sanjay Narayan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Conservation Law Foundation
Represented By: Ann Brewster Weeks Esquire
Represented By: Hayden Wong Hashimoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Montana Environmental Information Center
Represented By: James Samuel Pew
Represented By: Neil Gormley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Natural Resources Defense Council
Represented By: Emily Kingsbury Davis
Represented By: John DuVal Walke Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Exelon Corporation
Represented By: Kevin James Poloncarz Esquire
Represented By: Donald Lynn Ristow Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Ohio Environmental Council
Represented By: Ann Brewster Weeks Esquire
Represented By: Hayden Wong Hashimoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Environment America
Represented By: Michael Landis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: National Association for the Advancement of Colored People
Represented By: James Samuel Pew
Represented By: Neil Gormley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Environmental Defense Fund
Represented By: Vickie Lynn Patton
Represented By: Tomas Elias Carbonell
Represented By: Susannah Weaver
Represented By: Sean H. Donahue
Represented By: Liana James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Environmental Law and Policy Center
Represented By: Ann Jaworski
Represented By: Robert Michaels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: American Lung Association
Represented By: Deborah M. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Clean Air Council
Represented By: James Samuel Pew
Represented By: Neil Gormley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Citizens for Pennsylvania's Future
Represented By: Ann Brewster Weeks Esquire
Represented By: Hayden Wong Hashimoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Environmental Integrity Project
Represented By: Patton Dycus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Physicians for Social Responsibility
Represented By: Deborah M. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: American Academy of Pediatrics
Represented By: Deborah M. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Chesapeake Climate Action Network
Represented By: James Samuel Pew
Represented By: Neil Gormley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: James Samuel Pew
Represented By: Neil Gormley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: American Public Health Association
Represented By: Deborah M. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Public Service Enterprise Group Incorporated
Represented By: Kevin James Poloncarz Esquire
Represented By: Donald Lynn Ristow Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Natural Resources Council of Maine
Represented By: Ann Brewster Weeks Esquire
Represented By: Hayden Wong Hashimoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Calpine Corporation
Represented By: Kevin James Poloncarz Esquire
Represented By: Donald Lynn Ristow Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Vermont
Represented By: Nicholas Frank Persampieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Minnesota
Represented By: Peter Surdo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Maine
Represented By: Laura Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Maryland
Represented By: Michael F. Strande
Represented By: Joshua Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Delaware
Represented By: Valerie Melissa Edge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of California
Represented By: Micaela Harms
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Wiener
Represented By: David Alexander Zonana
Represented By: Erin C. Ganahl
Represented By: Robert William Byrne Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of North Carolina
Represented By: Francisco Benzoni
Represented By: Amy Lynn Bircher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Connecticut
Represented By: Matthew Ivan Levine
Represented By: Scott Norman Koschwitz Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Michigan
Represented By: Neil David Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Represented By: Megan M. Herzog
Represented By: Melissa Ann Hoffer Esquire
Represented By: David S. Frankel
Represented By: Tracy Leigh Triplett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Rhode Island
Represented By: Gregory Stage Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of New Jersey
Represented By: Lisa Jo Morelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Illinois
Represented By: Daniel Isaac Rottenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of New York
Represented By: Andrew Gerard Frank
Represented By: Michael J. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Commonwealth of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Ann R. Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: City of New York
Represented By: Christopher Gene King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Oregon
Represented By: Steven Novick
Represented By: Paul Andrew Garrahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: ADA Carbon Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Brendan K. Collins Esquire
Represented By: Lorene Boudreau
Represented By: Ronald Mathew Varnum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: ADA-ES, Inc.
Represented By: Brendan K. Collins Esquire
Represented By: Lorene Boudreau
Represented By: Ronald Mathew Varnum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Advanced Emissions Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Brendan K. Collins Esquire
Represented By: Lorene Boudreau
Represented By: Ronald Mathew Varnum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?