Louisville Gas and Electric Co, et al v. FERC
Petitioner: Louisville Gas and Electric Company and Kentucky Utilities Company
Respondent: Federal Energy Regulatory Commission
Case Number: 20-1452
Filed: November 13, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1872020] filed directing party to file payment of docketing fee. PETITIONER payment of docketing fee due 12/21/2020 [20-1459] [Entered: 11/19/2020 10:57 AM]
November 19, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1872018] filed consolidating cases 20-1459 (Consolidation started 11/19/2020) with 20-1452; directing party to file in 20-1459 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 12/21/2020. PETITIONER statement of issues due 12/21/2020 [20-1452, 20-1459] [Entered: 11/19/2020 10:52 AM]
November 16, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1871439] filed directing party to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 12/16/2020. PETITIONER certificate as to parties due 12/16/2020. PETITIONER statement of issues due 12/16/2020. PETITIONER underlying decision due 12/16/2020. PETITIONER deferred appendix statement due 12/16/2020. PETITIONER procedural motions due 12/16/2020. PETITIONER dispositive motions due 12/31/2020; directing party to file initial submissions: RESPONDENT entry of appearance due 12/16/2020. RESPONDENT procedural motions due 12/16/2020. RESPONDENT certified index to record due 12/31/2020. RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 12/31/2020 [20-1452] [Entered: 11/16/2020 03:34 PM]
November 16, 2020 CERTIFIED COPY [1871437] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1871429-2 ] [20-1452] [Entered: 11/16/2020 03:27 PM]
November 13, 2020 PETITION FOR REVIEW [1871429] of a decision by federal agency filed by Kentucky Utilities Company and Louisville Gas and Electric Company [Service Date: 11/13/2020 ] Disclosure Statement: Attached;. [20-1452] [Entered: 11/16/2020 03:14 PM]
November 13, 2020 PETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [20-1452] [Entered: 11/16/2020 03:07 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Louisville Gas and Electric Co, et al v. FERC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Federal Energy Regulatory Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Louisville Gas and Electric Company
Represented By: Julie M.K. Siegal
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kentucky Utilities Company
Represented By: Julie M.K. Siegal
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?