Freedom Watch, Inc. v. Robert Mueller, III, et al
Defendant / Appellee: United States Department of Justice, Robert S. Mueller, III, Special Counsel and Federal Bureau of Investigation
Plaintiff / Appellant: Freedom Watch, Inc.
Case Number: 20-5071
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1843553] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 06/29/2020. APPELLEE Brief due on 07/29/2020. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 08/19/2020. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 08/26/2020. Final Briefs due 09/09/2020. [20-5071] [Entered: 05/19/2020 05:19 PM]
April 29, 2020 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1840594] filed by Freedom Watch, Inc. [Service Date: 04/29/2020 ] [20-5071] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 04/29/2020 06:15 PM]
April 29, 2020 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1840593] filed by Freedom Watch, Inc. [Service Date: 04/29/2020 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [20-5071] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 04/29/2020 06:14 PM]
April 29, 2020 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1840592] submitted by Freedom Watch, Inc. [Service Date: 04/29/2020 ] [20-5071] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 04/29/2020 06:14 PM]
April 29, 2020 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1840591] filed by Freedom Watch, Inc. [Service Date: 04/29/2020 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - All transcripts needed for the appeal have been completed and received. [20-5071] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 04/29/2020 06:13 PM]
April 29, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1840590] filed by Larry Klayman on behalf of Appellant Freedom Watch, Inc.. [20-5071] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 04/29/2020 06:12 PM]
April 29, 2020 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1840589] filed by Freedom Watch, Inc. [Service Date: 04/29/2020 ] [20-5071] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 04/29/2020 06:11 PM]
April 29, 2020 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1840588] filed by Freedom Watch, Inc. [Service Date: 04/29/2020 ] [20-5071] (Klayman, Larry) [Entered: 04/29/2020 06:11 PM]
April 27, 2020 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1840079] filed by DOJ, FBI and Robert S. Mueller, III [Service Date: 04/27/2020 ] [20-5071] (Pulham, Thomas) [Entered: 04/27/2020 06:33 PM]
March 30, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1835918] filed by Thomas Pulham and co-counsel Sharon Swingle on behalf of Appellees DOJ, FBI and Robert S. Mueller, III. [20-5071] (Pulham, Thomas) [Entered: 03/30/2020 11:40 AM]
March 26, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1835568] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 04/27/2020. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 04/27/2020. APPELLANT statement of issues due 04/27/2020. APPELLANT underlying decision due 04/27/2020. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 04/27/2020. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 04/27/2020. APPELLANT transcript status report due 04/27/2020. APPELLANT procedural motions due 04/27/2020. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 05/11/2020; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 04/27/2020. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 04/27/2020. APPELLEE procedural motions due 04/27/2020. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 05/11/2020 [20-5071] [Entered: 03/26/2020 03:49 PM]
March 26, 2020 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1835565] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:18-cv-00088-EGS filed by Freedom Watch, Inc.. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 20-5071. [20-5071] [Entered: 03/26/2020 03:48 PM]
March 26, 2020 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [20-5071] [Entered: 03/26/2020 03:47 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Freedom Watch, Inc. v. Robert Mueller, III, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: Thomas Gary Pulham
Represented By: Sharon Swingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Robert S. Mueller, III, Special Counsel
Represented By: Thomas Gary Pulham
Represented By: Sharon Swingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Represented By: Thomas Gary Pulham
Represented By: Sharon Swingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Freedom Watch, Inc.
Represented By: Larry Elliott Klayman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?