Cook Inlet Tribal Council, Inc v. Evangelyn Dotomain, et al
Defendant / Appellant: United States of America, Sylvia Mathews Burwell, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health & Human Services, Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health & Human Services and Evangelyn Dotomain, Director, Alaska Area Office, U.S. Indian Health Service
Plaintiff / Appellee: Cook Inlet Tribal Council, Inc.
Case Number: 20-5192
Filed: June 30, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1849959] filed considering motion to govern future proceedings [ # 1849409-2 ] in 19-5005, removing case from abeyance, consolidating cases 20-5192 (Consolidation started 07/02/2020) with 19-5005; The schedule set by the courts order filed July 1, 2020, in No. 20-5192, will now apply in both consolidated cases. [19-5005, 20-5192] [Entered: 07/02/2020 10:36 AM]
July 1, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1849805] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 07/31/2020. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 07/31/2020. APPELLANT statement of issues due 07/31/2020. APPELLANT underlying decision due 07/31/2020. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 07/31/2020. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 07/31/2020. APPELLANT transcript status report due 07/31/2020. APPELLANT procedural motions due 07/31/2020. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 08/17/2020; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 07/31/2020. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 07/31/2020. APPELLEE procedural motions due 07/31/2020. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 08/17/2020 [20-5192] [Entered: 07/01/2020 01:38 PM]
July 1, 2020 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1849803] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:14-cv-01835-EGS filed by Alex M. Azar, Evangelyn Dotomain and USA. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 20-5192. [20-5192] [Entered: 07/01/2020 01:37 PM]
June 30, 2020 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [20-5192] [Entered: 07/01/2020 01:36 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Cook Inlet Tribal Council, Inc v. Evangelyn Dotomain, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: United States of America
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Sylvia Mathews Burwell, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health & Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health & Human Services
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Evangelyn Dotomain, Director, Alaska Area Office, U.S. Indian Health Service
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Cook Inlet Tribal Council, Inc.
Represented By: Lloyd Benton Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?