Judicial Watch, Inc. v. Adam B. Schiff, et al
Defendant / Appellee: Adam B. Schiff, Chairman, U.S. House Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence and U.S. House Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence
Plaintiff / Appellant: Judicial Watch, Inc.
Case Number: 20-5270
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1864410] filed by Judicial Watch, Inc. [Service Date: 10/01/2020 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [20-5270] (Peterson, James) [Entered: 10/01/2020 03:10 PM]
October 1, 2020 STATEMENT [1864405] with Disclosure Listing filed by Judicial Watch, Inc. [Service Date: 10/01/2020 ] [20-5270] (Peterson, James) [Entered: 10/01/2020 03:04 PM]
October 1, 2020 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1864401] filed by Judicial Watch, Inc. [Service Date: 10/01/2020 ] [20-5270] (Peterson, James) [Entered: 10/01/2020 02:57 PM]
October 1, 2020 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1864398] filed by Judicial Watch, Inc. [Service Date: 10/01/2020 ] [20-5270] (Peterson, James) [Entered: 10/01/2020 02:55 PM]
October 1, 2020 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1864397] filed by Judicial Watch, Inc. [Service Date: 10/01/2020 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [20-5270] (Peterson, James) [Entered: 10/01/2020 02:53 PM]
October 1, 2020 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1864396] filed by Judicial Watch, Inc. [Service Date: 10/01/2020 ] [20-5270] (Peterson, James) [Entered: 10/01/2020 02:50 PM]
October 1, 2020 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1864395] submitted by Judicial Watch, Inc. [20-5270] (Peterson, James) [Entered: 10/01/2020 02:48 PM]
October 1, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1864394] filed by James F. Peterson on behalf of Appellant Judicial Watch, Inc.. [20-5270] (Peterson, James) [Entered: 10/01/2020 02:46 PM]
October 1, 2020 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1864280] filed by Adam B. Schiff and U.S. House Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence [Service Date: 10/01/2020 ] [20-5270] (Letter, Douglas) [Entered: 10/01/2020 10:26 AM]
October 1, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1864279] filed by Douglas N. Letter and co-counsel Todd B. Tatelman on behalf of Appellees Adam B. Schiff and U.S. House Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence. [20-5270] (Letter, Douglas) [Entered: 10/01/2020 10:23 AM]
September 1, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1859429] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 10/01/2020. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 10/01/2020. APPELLANT statement of issues due 10/01/2020. APPELLANT underlying decision due 10/01/2020. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 10/01/2020. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 10/01/2020. APPELLANT transcript status report due 10/01/2020. APPELLANT procedural motions due 10/01/2020. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 10/16/2020; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 10/01/2020. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 10/01/2020. APPELLEE procedural motions due 10/01/2020. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 10/16/2020 [20-5270] [Entered: 09/01/2020 05:47 PM]
August 31, 2020 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1859427] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-03790-BAH filed by Judicial Watch, Inc.. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 20-5270. [20-5270] [Entered: 09/01/2020 05:45 PM]
August 31, 2020 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [20-5270] [Entered: 09/01/2020 05:44 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Judicial Watch, Inc. v. Adam B. Schiff, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Adam B. Schiff, Chairman, U.S. House Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence
Represented By: Douglas N. Letter
Represented By: Todd B. Tatelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. House Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence
Represented By: Douglas N. Letter
Represented By: Todd B. Tatelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Judicial Watch, Inc.
Represented By: James F. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?