Judicial Watch, Inc. v. DOJ
Defendant / Appellee: United States Department of Justice
Plaintiff / Appellant: Judicial Watch, Inc.
Case Number: 20-5304
Filed: October 9, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2020 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1870506] filed by DOJ [Service Date: 11/10/2020 ] [20-5304] (Pulham, Thomas) [Entered: 11/10/2020 12:05 PM]
November 9, 2020 STATEMENT [1870254] with Disclosure Listing filed by Judicial Watch, Inc. [Service Date: 11/09/2020 ] [20-5304] (Orfanedes, Paul) [Entered: 11/09/2020 11:15 AM]
November 9, 2020 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1870251] submitted by Judicial Watch, Inc. [Service Date: 11/09/2020 ] [20-5304] (Orfanedes, Paul) [Entered: 11/09/2020 11:11 AM]
November 9, 2020 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1870250] filed by Judicial Watch, Inc. [Service Date: 11/09/2020 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [20-5304] (Orfanedes, Paul) [Entered: 11/09/2020 11:10 AM]
November 9, 2020 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1870248] filed by Judicial Watch, Inc. [Service Date: 11/09/2020 ] [20-5304] (Orfanedes, Paul) [Entered: 11/09/2020 11:09 AM]
November 9, 2020 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1870247] filed by Judicial Watch, Inc. [Service Date: 11/09/2020 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [20-5304] (Orfanedes, Paul) [Entered: 11/09/2020 11:08 AM]
November 9, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1870246] filed by Paul J. Orfanedes and co-counsel Meredith Di Liberto on behalf of Appellant Judicial Watch, Inc.. [20-5304] (Orfanedes, Paul) [Entered: 11/09/2020 11:05 AM]
November 9, 2020 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1870245] filed by Judicial Watch, Inc. [Service Date: 11/09/2020 ] [20-5304] (Orfanedes, Paul) [Entered: 11/09/2020 11:02 AM]
November 9, 2020 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1870244] filed by Judicial Watch, Inc. [Service Date: 11/09/2020 ] [20-5304] (Orfanedes, Paul) [Entered: 11/09/2020 11:01 AM]
November 6, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1870156] filed by Thomas Pulham and co-counsel Sharon Swingle on behalf of Appellee DOJ. [20-5304] (Pulham, Thomas) [Entered: 11/06/2020 04:47 PM]
October 9, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1865642] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 11/09/2020. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 11/09/2020. APPELLANT statement of issues due 11/09/2020. APPELLANT underlying decision due 11/09/2020. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 11/09/2020. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 11/09/2020. APPELLANT transcript status report due 11/09/2020. APPELLANT procedural motions due 11/09/2020. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 11/23/2020; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 11/09/2020. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 11/09/2020. APPELLEE procedural motions due 11/09/2020. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 11/23/2020 [20-5304] [Entered: 10/09/2020 12:14 PM]
October 9, 2020 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1865640] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:17-cv-00832-CKK filed by Judicial Watch, Inc.. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 20-5304. [20-5304] [Entered: 10/09/2020 12:12 PM]
October 9, 2020 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [20-5304] [Entered: 10/09/2020 12:11 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Judicial Watch, Inc. v. DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Thomas Gary Pulham
Represented By: Sharon Swingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Judicial Watch, Inc.
Represented By: Paul J. Orfanedes Esquire
Represented By: Meredith L. Di Liberto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?