Alyson Slaughter v. National Railroad Passenger C
Defendant / Appellant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation, doing business as Amtrak
Plaintiff / Appellee: Alyson Slaughter, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Case Number: 20-7049
Filed: June 16, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1852392] filed granting motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1852021-3 ]. Case 20-7049 held in abeyance pending mediation in this case, suspending initial submissions schedule; directing parties to file motions to govern future proceedings by 10/19/2020 [20-7049] [Entered: 07/20/2020 09:45 AM]
July 16, 2020 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1852027] filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation [Service Date: 07/16/2020 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - All transcripts needed for the appeal have been completed and received. [20-7049] (Davis, Alison) [Entered: 07/16/2020 02:18 PM]
July 16, 2020 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1852026] filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation [Service Date: 07/16/2020 ] [20-7049] (Davis, Alison) [Entered: 07/16/2020 02:15 PM]
July 16, 2020 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1852025] filed by Alison N. Davis on behalf of Appellant National Railroad Passenger Corporation. [20-7049] (Davis, Alison) [Entered: 07/16/2020 02:14 PM]
July 16, 2020 JOINT UNOPPOSED MOTION [1852021] to hold case in abeyance filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation [Service Date: 07/16/2020 ] Length Certification: 498 words. [20-7049]--[RELIEF REPLACED--Edited 07/17/2020 by LMC] (Davis, Alison) [Entered: 07/16/2020 02:11 PM]
June 16, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1847381] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 07/16/2020. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 07/16/2020. APPELLANT statement of issues due 07/16/2020. APPELLANT underlying decision due 07/16/2020. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 07/16/2020. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 07/16/2020. APPELLANT transcript status report due 07/16/2020. APPELLANT procedural motions due 07/16/2020. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 07/31/2020; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 07/16/2020. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 07/16/2020. APPELLEE procedural motions due 07/16/2020. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 07/31/2020 [20-7049] [Entered: 06/16/2020 10:53 AM]
June 16, 2020 LETTER [1847374] sent regarding attorney membership to Jeffrey Kaliel for Alyson Slaughter. Application for Admission due 07/16/2020. [20-7049] [Entered: 06/16/2020 10:52 AM]
June 16, 2020 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1847370] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-02920-APM filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 20-7049. [20-7049] [Entered: 06/16/2020 10:50 AM]
June 16, 2020 PRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. [20-7049] [Entered: 06/16/2020 10:47 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Alyson Slaughter v. National Railroad Passenger C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation, doing business as Amtrak
Represented By: Alison Nadine Davis
Represented By: Lindsay Morgan Neinast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Alyson Slaughter, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Jeffrey Kaliel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?