Richard Kaul, et al v. Federation of State Medical B, et al
Defendant / Appellee: Geico Indemnity, American Society of Interventional Pain Physicians, Robert Garrett, Brian R. Martinotti, ESQ. in his official and individual capacity, P.C. 1-50, Doreen Hafner, ESQ., North Jersey Media Group, Inc., John Burdine, M.D. in his official and individual capacity, Eric Kanefsky, ESQ., ABC Corp. 1-50, and/or XYZ, Christopher J. Christie, ESQ. in his official and individual capacity, Mississippi Medical Board, Richard Stanley, ESQ. in his official and individual capacity, GEICO General insurance Company, Cecelia Mouton, M.D. in her official and individual capacity, Robert Heary, M.D., Geico Casualty, Peter Staats, M.D., John Doe 1-50, Scott Metzger, M.D. in his official and individual capacity, Congress of Neurological Surgeons, Allstate New Jersey Insurance Company, Federation of State Medical Boards, Louisiana Medical Board, Pennsylvania Medical Board, Daniel Stolz, ESQ., John Roe 1-50, Marc Cohen, M.D., Geico, Andrew Kaufman, M.D. in his individual capacity and official capacity, Lewis Stein, ESQ., Steven Lomazow, M.D., Gregory Przybylski, M.D. in his individual capacity and official capacity, Jay Howard Solomon, ESQ. in his official and individual capacity, New Jersey Board of Medical Examiners, Richard Crist, John Diiorio, ESQ., Atlantic Health System, TD Bank, NA, Lindy Washburn, Hackensack University Medical Center and California Medical Board
Plaintiff / Appellant: Richard Arjun Kaul, M.D. and Arnold Erwin Feldman, M.D.
Case Number: 20-7120
Filed: December 29, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2021 MOTION [1885899] to dismiss case for lack of jurisdiction (Response to Motion served by mail due on 03/01/2021) filed by Allstate New Jersey Insurance Company (Service Date: 02/18/2021 by 3rd Party, Clerk, CM/ECF NDA, Email, US Mail) Length Certification: 5 pages or 716 Words. [20-7120] (Friddell, Winn) [Entered: 02/18/2021 08:22 AM]
February 16, 2021 MOTION [1885394] to dismiss case for lack of jurisdiction (Response to Motion served by mail due on 02/26/2021) filed by California Medical Board (Service Date: 02/16/2021 by CM/ECF NDA, Email, US Mail) Length Certification: 1,704 words. [20-7120] (Rhee, Christine) [Entered: 02/16/2021 01:45 PM]
February 16, 2021 MOTION [1885358] to dismiss case for lack of jurisdiction (Response to Motion served by mail due on 02/26/2021) filed by Congress of Neurological Surgeons (Service Date: 02/16/2021 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail) Length Certification: 129 words. [20-7120] (Shulan, Jonathan) [Entered: 02/16/2021 12:29 PM]
February 15, 2021 MOTION [1885245] to dismiss case (Response to Motion served by mail due on 02/25/2021) filed by Richard Stanley (Service Date: 02/15/2021 by CM/ECF NDA) Length 1,877 wprds. [20-7120] (Kupperman, Stephen) [Entered: 02/15/2021 04:28 PM]
February 12, 2021 MOTION [1885088] to dismiss case for lack of jurisdiction (Response to Motion served by mail due on 02/22/2021) filed by John Diiorio (Service Date: 02/12/2021 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail) Length Certification: 247 words. [20-7120] (Waters, Jason) [Entered: 02/12/2021 12:48 PM]
February 10, 2021 CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED [1885450] marked "return to sender - unclaimed - unable to forward". Certified Mail [1877763-2] had been sent to Party Richard Arjun Kaul. [20-7120] [Entered: 02/16/2021 03:43 PM]
February 10, 2021 MOTION [1884662] to dismiss case for lack of jurisdiction (Response to Motion served by mail due on 02/22/2021) filed by Atlantic Health System (Service Date: 02/10/2021 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail) Length Certification: 578 Words. [20-7120] (Sosnowsky, Mark) [Entered: 02/10/2021 02:03 PM]
February 5, 2021 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1883928] filed by Allstate New Jersey Insurance Company [Service Date: 02/05/2021 ] [20-7120] (Friddell, Winn) [Entered: 02/05/2021 11:41 AM]
February 5, 2021 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1883924] filed by Winn Cullen Friddell on behalf of Appellee Allstate New Jersey Insurance Company. [20-7120] (Friddell, Winn) [Entered: 02/05/2021 11:38 AM]
February 3, 2021 MOTION [1883602] to dismiss case for lack of jurisdiction (Response to Motion served by mail due on 02/16/2021) filed by Geico, Geico Casualty, Geico General Insurance Company and Geico Indemnity (Service Date: 02/03/2021 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 1,679 words. [20-7120] (Levy, Barry) [Entered: 02/03/2021 04:27 PM]
January 29, 2021 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1882901] filed by Geico, Geico Casualty, Geico General Insurance Company and Geico Indemnity [Service Date: 01/29/2021 ] [20-7120] (Levy, Barry) [Entered: 01/29/2021 05:20 PM]
January 29, 2021 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1882900] filed by Mississippi Medical Board [Service Date: 01/29/2021 ] [20-7120] (Woods, Mary) [Entered: 01/29/2021 05:19 PM]
January 29, 2021 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1882889] filed by North Jersey Media Group, Inc. and Lindy Washburn [Service Date: 01/29/2021 ] [20-7120] (Oks, Caroline) [Entered: 01/29/2021 04:59 PM]
January 29, 2021 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1882851] filed by Barry I. Levy on behalf of Appellees Geico, Geico Casualty, Geico General Insurance Company and Geico Indemnity. [20-7120] (Levy, Barry) [Entered: 01/29/2021 03:44 PM]
January 29, 2021 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1882835] filed by Congress of Neurological Surgeons [Service Date: 01/29/2021 ] [20-7120] (Shulan, Jonathan) [Entered: 01/29/2021 03:13 PM]
January 29, 2021 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1882809] filed by American Society of Interventional Pain Physicians and Peter Staats [Service Date: 01/29/2021 ] [20-7120] (Hassler, Laura) [Entered: 01/29/2021 02:38 PM]
January 29, 2021 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1882806] filed by Laura M.K. Hassler on behalf of Appellees American Society of Interventional Pain Physicians and Peter Staats. [20-7120] (Hassler, Laura) [Entered: 01/29/2021 02:37 PM]
January 29, 2021 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1882797] filed by Atlantic Health System [Service Date: 01/29/2021 ] [20-7120] (Sosnowsky, Mark) [Entered: 01/29/2021 01:48 PM]
January 29, 2021 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1882783] filed by Richard Stanley [Service Date: 01/29/2021 ] [20-7120] (Kupperman, Stephen) [Entered: 01/29/2021 01:23 PM]
January 29, 2021 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1882728] filed by John Diiorio [Service Date: 01/29/2021 ] [20-7120] (Waters, Jason) [Entered: 01/29/2021 11:53 AM]
January 29, 2021 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1882726] filed by Jason R. Waters on behalf of Appellee John Diiorio. [20-7120] (Waters, Jason) [Entered: 01/29/2021 11:49 AM]
January 28, 2021 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1882588] filed by California Medical Board [Service Date: 01/28/2021 ] [20-7120] (Rhee, Christine) [Entered: 01/28/2021 05:41 PM]
January 28, 2021 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1882435] filed by Stephen H. Kupperman on behalf of Appellee Richard Stanley. [20-7120] (Kupperman, Stephen) [Entered: 01/28/2021 01:57 PM]
January 27, 2021 MOTION [1882269] to dismiss case (Response to Motion served by mail due on 02/08/2021) filed by Robert Garrett and Hackensack University Medical Center (Service Date: 01/27/2021 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail) Length Certification: 3,692 Words. [20-7120] (Steel, Laura) [Entered: 01/27/2021 10:15 PM]
January 27, 2021 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1882268] filed by Robert Garrett and Hackensack University Medical Center [Service Date: 01/27/2021 ] [20-7120] (Steel, Laura) [Entered: 01/27/2021 09:36 PM]
January 27, 2021 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1882267] filed by Laura N. Steel on behalf of Appellees Robert Garrett and Hackensack University Medical Center. [20-7120] (Steel, Laura) [Entered: 01/27/2021 09:32 PM]
January 27, 2021 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1882206] filed by Jonathan Ryan Shulan on behalf of Appellee Congress of Neurological Surgeons. [20-7120] (Shulan, Jonathan) [Entered: 01/27/2021 04:25 PM]
January 27, 2021 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1882192] filed by Mark H.M. Sosnowsky on behalf of Appellee Atlantic Health System. [20-7120] (Sosnowsky, Mark) [Entered: 01/27/2021 03:50 PM]
January 22, 2021 NOTICE [1882745] of filings in other cases filed by Richard Arjun Kaul [Service Date: 01/29/2021 ] [20-7120] [Entered: 01/29/2021 12:27 PM]
January 22, 2021 DUPLICATE NOTICE [1882693] filed by Richard Arjun Kaul [Service Date: 01/29/2021 ] [20-7120] [Entered: 01/29/2021 10:53 AM]
January 22, 2021 NOTICE [1882692] filed by Richard Arjun Kaul [Service Date: 01/29/2021 ] [20-7120] [Entered: 01/29/2021 10:52 AM]
January 21, 2021 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1881110] filed by Christine A. Rhee and co-counsel Ryan J. McEwan on behalf of Appellee California Medical Board. [20-7120] (Rhee, Christine) [Entered: 01/21/2021 04:24 PM]
January 11, 2021 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT [1881584] received from Unreadable [signed for on 01/05/2021] for order [1877763-2] sent to Appellant Arnold Erwin Feldman [20-7120] [Entered: 01/25/2021 12:21 PM]
January 11, 2021 FIRST CLASS MAIL RETURNED [1881579] marked "return to sender - not deliverable as addressed - unable to forward". Mail had been sent to Attorney Mr. Edward G. Sponzilli for Appellee Robert Heary. Found new address on firm webiste and resent. [20-7120] [Entered: 01/25/2021 12:11 PM]
January 8, 2021 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1879042] filed by Caroline E. Oks on behalf of Appellee North Jersey Media Group, Inc.. [20-7120] (Oks, Caroline) [Entered: 01/08/2021 12:13 PM]
January 5, 2021 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1878517] filed by Mary Jo Woods on behalf of Appellee Mississippi Medical Board. [20-7120] (Woods, Mary) [Entered: 01/05/2021 01:11 PM]
December 30, 2020 CERTIFIED MAIL and FIRST CLASS MAIL SENT [1877763] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.7017 3040 0001 1261 2014 for Richard Kaul, and 7017 3040 0001 1261 2021 for Arnold Feldman] of order [ # 1877726-2 ], [ # 1877693-2 ]. Certified Mail Receipt due 01/29/2021 from Arnold Erwin Feldman and Richard Arjun Kaul. [20-7120] [Entered: 12/30/2020 10:28 AM]
December 30, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1877726] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 01/29/2021. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 01/29/2021. APPELLANT statement of issues due 01/29/2021. APPELLANT underlying decision due 01/29/2021. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 01/29/2021. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 01/29/2021. APPELLANT transcript status report due 01/29/2021. APPELLANT procedural motions due 01/29/2021. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 02/16/2021; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 01/29/2021. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 01/29/2021. APPELLEE procedural motions due 01/29/2021. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 02/16/2021. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [20-7120] [Entered: 12/30/2020 09:03 AM]
December 29, 2020 CLERK'S ORDER [1877693] filed directing party to file motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis or payment of docketing fee. APPELLANT payment of docketing fee or motion to proceed in forma pauperis in district court due 01/28/2021. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [20-7120] [Entered: 12/29/2020 06:10 PM]
December 29, 2020 LETTER [1877691] sent regarding attorney membership to Winn Cullen Friddell for Allstate New Jersey Insurance Company and Richard Crist, Stephen R. Klaffky for Richard Stanley, Michael A. Kotula for GEICO General insurance Company, Geico, Geico Indemnity and Geico Casualty, Robert McGuire for Christopher J. Christie, New Jersey Board of Medical Examiners, Jay Howard Solomon, Steven Lomazow, Andrew Kaufman, Gregory Przybylski, Doreen Hafner and Eric Kanefsky, Christine A. Rhee for California Medical Board and Jonathan R. Shulan for Congress of Neurological Surgeons. Application for Admission due 01/28/2021. [20-7120] [Entered: 12/29/2020 06:00 PM]
December 29, 2020 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1877689] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-03050-TSC filed by Arnold Erwin Feldman and Richard Arjun Kaul. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 20-7120. [20-7120] [Entered: 12/29/2020 05:52 PM]
December 29, 2020 PRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. [20-7120] [Entered: 12/29/2020 05:51 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Richard Kaul, et al v. Federation of State Medical B, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Geico Indemnity
Represented By: Michael A. Kotula
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: American Society of Interventional Pain Physicians
Represented By: Laura M.K. Hassler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Robert Garrett
Represented By: Laura Nachowitz Steel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Brian R. Martinotti, ESQ. in his official and individual capacity
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: P.C. 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Doreen Hafner, ESQ.
Represented By: Robert McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: North Jersey Media Group, Inc.
Represented By: Caroline E. Oks Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Burdine, M.D. in his official and individual capacity
Represented By: Patricia Hill Wilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Eric Kanefsky, ESQ.
Represented By: Robert McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ABC Corp. 1-50, and/or XYZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Christopher J. Christie, ESQ. in his official and individual capacity
Represented By: Robert McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Mississippi Medical Board
Represented By: Mary Jo Woods
Represented By: Jeffrey David Skinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Richard Stanley, ESQ. in his official and individual capacity
Represented By: Stephen R. Klaffky
Represented By: Stephen Kupperman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GEICO General insurance Company
Represented By: Michael A. Kotula
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Cecelia Mouton, M.D. in her official and individual capacity
Represented By: Patricia Hill Wilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Robert Heary, M.D.
Represented By: Edward G. Sponzilli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Geico Casualty
Represented By: Michael A. Kotula
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Peter Staats, M.D.
Represented By: Laura M.K. Hassler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Doe 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Scott Metzger, M.D. in his official and individual capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Congress of Neurological Surgeons
Represented By: Jonathan R. Shulan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Allstate New Jersey Insurance Company
Represented By: Winn Cullen Friddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Federation of State Medical Boards
Represented By: Jay Ward Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Louisiana Medical Board
Represented By: Patricia Hill Wilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Pennsylvania Medical Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Daniel Stolz, ESQ.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Roe 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Marc Cohen, M.D.
Represented By: Benjamin James Vernia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Geico
Represented By: Michael A. Kotula
Represented By: Barry I. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Andrew Kaufman, M.D. in his individual capacity and official capacity
Represented By: Robert McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lewis Stein, ESQ.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Steven Lomazow, M.D.
Represented By: Robert McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Gregory Przybylski, M.D. in his individual capacity and official capacity
Represented By: Robert McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jay Howard Solomon, ESQ. in his official and individual capacity
Represented By: Robert McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: New Jersey Board of Medical Examiners
Represented By: Robert McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Richard Crist
Represented By: Winn Cullen Friddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Diiorio, ESQ.
Represented By: Jason Richard Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Atlantic Health System
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Rillotta
Represented By: Mark Henry Michael Sosnowsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TD Bank, NA
Represented By: Robert William Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lindy Washburn
Represented By: Caroline E. Oks Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Hackensack University Medical Center
Represented By: Laura Nachowitz Steel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: California Medical Board
Represented By: Christine A. Rhee
Represented By: Ryan McEwan
Represented By: Christine Rhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Richard Arjun Kaul, M.D.
Represented By: Richard Arjun Kaul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Arnold Erwin Feldman, M.D.
Represented By: Arnold Erwin Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?