Kentucky Municipal Energy Agen, et al v. FERC
Petitioner: City of Providence, Kentucky, City of Barbourville, Kentucky, acting through the Barbourville Utility Commission, Electric Plant Board of the City of Paducah, Kentucky, d/b/a Paducah Power System, Kentucky Municipal Energy Agency, Frankfort Electric and Water Plant Board, City of Madisonville, Kentucky, City of Paris, Kentucky, Kentucky Municipal Power Agency, a joint public agency operating under the Interlocal Cooperation Act of the Commonwealth of Kentucky, City of Falmouth, Kentucky, City of Corbin, Kentucky, acting through the City Utilities Commission of Corbin, City Utility Commission of the City of Owensboro, a/k/a Owensboro Municipal Utilities, City of Bardwell, Kentucky, Electric Plant Board of the City of Princeton, Kentucky, City of Berea, Kentucky and City of Benham, Kentucky, acting through its Electric Plant Board doing business as the Benham Power Board
Respondent: Federal Energy Regulatory Commission
Case Number: 21-1025
Filed: January 18, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2021 JOINT UNOPPOSED MOTION [1882656] to govern future proceedings filed by FERC in 19-1236, 19-1237, 20-1282, 20-1326, 20-1452, 20-1459, 21-1013, 21-1025 [Service Date: 01/29/2021 ] Length Certification: 424 words. [19-1236, 19-1237, 20-1282, 20-1326, 20-1452, 20-1459, 21-1013, 21-1025] (Ediger, Scott) [Entered: 01/29/2021 10:01 AM]
January 28, 2021 CERTIFIED INDEX TO RECORD [1882386] filed by FERC in 19-1236, 19-1237, 20-1282, 20-1326, 20-1452, 20-1459, 21-1013, 21-1025 [Service Date: 01/28/2021 ] [19-1236, 19-1237, 20-1282, 20-1326, 20-1452, 20-1459, 21-1013, 21-1025] (Ediger, Scott) [Entered: 01/28/2021 11:24 AM]
January 26, 2021 CLERK'S ORDER [1881870] filed consolidating cases 21-1025 (Consolidation started 01/26/2021) with 19-1236, The January 29, 2021 motions to govern deadline established in the lead case remains in effect. [19-1236, 19-1237, 20-1282, 20-1326, 20-1452, 20-1459, 21-1013, 21-1025] [Entered: 01/26/2021 01:28 PM]
January 26, 2021 CERTIFIED COPY [1881862] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1881860-2 ] [21-1025] [Entered: 01/26/2021 01:01 PM]
January 18, 2021 PETITION FOR REVIEW [1881860] of a decision by federal agency filed by City Utility Commission of the City of Owensboro, City of Barbourville, Kentucky, City of Bardwell, Kentucky, City of Benham, Kentucky, City of Berea, Kentucky, City of Corbin, Kentucky, City of Falmouth, Kentucky, City of Madisonville, Kentucky, City of Paris, Kentucky, City of Providence, Kentucky, Electric Plant Board of the City of Paducah, Kentucky, Electric Plant Board of the City of Princeton, Kentucky, Frankfort Electric and Water Plant Board, Kentucky Municipal Energy Agency and Kentucky Municipal Power Agency [Service Date: 01/18/2021 ] Disclosure Statement: Attached. [21-1025] [Entered: 01/26/2021 01:00 PM]
January 18, 2021 PETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [21-1025] [Entered: 01/26/2021 12:57 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Kentucky Municipal Energy Agen, et al v. FERC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of Providence, Kentucky
Represented By: Benjamin Reiter
Represented By: David E. Pomper
Represented By: Latif Mohamed Nurani
Represented By: Thomas Charles Trauger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of Barbourville, Kentucky, acting through the Barbourville Utility Commission
Represented By: Benjamin Reiter
Represented By: David E. Pomper
Represented By: Latif Mohamed Nurani
Represented By: Thomas Charles Trauger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Electric Plant Board of the City of Paducah, Kentucky, d/b/a Paducah Power System
Represented By: Benjamin Reiter
Represented By: David E. Pomper
Represented By: Latif Mohamed Nurani
Represented By: Thomas Charles Trauger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kentucky Municipal Energy Agency
Represented By: Benjamin Reiter
Represented By: David E. Pomper
Represented By: Latif Mohamed Nurani
Represented By: Thomas Charles Trauger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Frankfort Electric and Water Plant Board
Represented By: Benjamin Reiter
Represented By: David E. Pomper
Represented By: Latif Mohamed Nurani
Represented By: Thomas Charles Trauger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of Madisonville, Kentucky
Represented By: Benjamin Reiter
Represented By: David E. Pomper
Represented By: Latif Mohamed Nurani
Represented By: Thomas Charles Trauger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of Paris, Kentucky
Represented By: Benjamin Reiter
Represented By: David E. Pomper
Represented By: Latif Mohamed Nurani
Represented By: Thomas Charles Trauger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kentucky Municipal Power Agency, a joint public agency operating under the Interlocal Cooperation Act of the Commonwealth of Kentucky
Represented By: Benjamin Reiter
Represented By: David E. Pomper
Represented By: Latif Mohamed Nurani
Represented By: Thomas Charles Trauger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of Falmouth, Kentucky
Represented By: Benjamin Reiter
Represented By: David E. Pomper
Represented By: Latif Mohamed Nurani
Represented By: Thomas Charles Trauger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of Corbin, Kentucky, acting through the City Utilities Commission of Corbin
Represented By: Benjamin Reiter
Represented By: David E. Pomper
Represented By: Latif Mohamed Nurani
Represented By: Thomas Charles Trauger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City Utility Commission of the City of Owensboro, a/k/a Owensboro Municipal Utilities
Represented By: Benjamin Reiter
Represented By: David E. Pomper
Represented By: Latif Mohamed Nurani
Represented By: Thomas Charles Trauger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of Bardwell, Kentucky
Represented By: Benjamin Reiter
Represented By: David E. Pomper
Represented By: Latif Mohamed Nurani
Represented By: Thomas Charles Trauger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Electric Plant Board of the City of Princeton, Kentucky
Represented By: Benjamin Reiter
Represented By: David E. Pomper
Represented By: Latif Mohamed Nurani
Represented By: Thomas Charles Trauger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of Berea, Kentucky
Represented By: Benjamin Reiter
Represented By: David E. Pomper
Represented By: Latif Mohamed Nurani
Represented By: Thomas Charles Trauger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of Benham, Kentucky, acting through its Electric Plant Board doing business as the Benham Power Board
Represented By: Benjamin Reiter
Represented By: David E. Pomper
Represented By: Latif Mohamed Nurani
Represented By: Thomas Charles Trauger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Federal Energy Regulatory Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?