State of California, et al v. EPA
Petitioner: State of Delaware, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, City of Chicago, State of Rhode Island, State of Wisconsin, Commonwealth of Virginia, State of New Jersey, State of Illinois, State of Oregon, State of California, by and through Attorney General Xavier Becerra, and the California Air Resources Board, State of Maryland, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, City of New York, State of New York and State of Washington
Respondent: Environmental Protection Agency
Case Number: 21-1034
Filed: January 19, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2021 CLERK'S ORDER [1882227] filed consolidating cases 21-1034 (Consolidation started 01/27/2021) with 21-1024 [21-1024, 21-1034] [Entered: 01/27/2021 04:47 PM]
January 27, 2021 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1882196] filed by Perry M. Rosen on behalf of Respondent EPA. [21-1034] (Rosen, Perry) [Entered: 01/27/2021 04:04 PM]
January 26, 2021 CLERK'S ORDER [1881887] filed directing party to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 02/25/2021. PETITIONER certificate as to parties due 02/25/2021. PETITIONER statement of issues due 02/25/2021. PETITIONER underlying decision due 02/25/2021. PETITIONER deferred appendix statement due 02/25/2021. PETITIONER procedural motions due 02/25/2021. PETITIONER dispositive motions due 03/12/2021; directing party to file initial submissions: RESPONDENT entry of appearance due 02/25/2021. RESPONDENT procedural motions due 02/25/2021. RESPONDENT certified index to record due 03/12/2021. RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 03/12/2021 [21-1034] [Entered: 01/26/2021 02:22 PM]
January 26, 2021 CERTIFIED COPY [1881886] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1881882-2 ] [21-1034] [Entered: 01/26/2021 02:19 PM]
January 19, 2021 PETITION FOR REVIEW [1881882] of a decision by federal agency filed by City of Chicago, City of New York, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, State of California, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Maryland, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Washington and State of Washington [Service Date: 01/19/2021 ] Disclosure Statement: Not Applicable to this Party. [21-1034] [Entered: 01/26/2021 02:18 PM]
January 19, 2021 PETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [21-1034] [Entered: 01/26/2021 02:15 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: State of California, et al v. EPA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Delaware
Represented By: Valerie Melissa Edge
Represented By: Christian Douglas Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Commonwealth of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Ann R. Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of Chicago
Represented By: Benna Ruth Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Rhode Island
Represented By: Gregory Stage Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Wisconsin
Represented By: Lorraine C. Stoltzfus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Commonwealth of Virginia
Represented By: Caitlin O'Dwyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of New Jersey
Represented By: Lisa Jo Morelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Illinois
Represented By: Daniel Isaac Rottenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Oregon
Represented By: Steven Novick
Represented By: Paul Andrew Garrahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of California, by and through Attorney General Xavier Becerra, and the California Air Resources Board
Represented By: Meredith Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Maryland
Represented By: Joshua Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Represented By: Carol A. Iancu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of New York
Represented By: Christopher Gene King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of New York
Represented By: Gavin Geraghty McCabe
Represented By: Brian Murray Lusignan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Washington
Represented By: Emily C. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Perry M. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?