American Academy of Pediatrics, et al v. EPA, et al
Petitioner: Natural Resources Council of Maine, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Public Health Association, Sierra Club, Appalachian Mountain Club, American Lung Association, Natural Resources Defense Council, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Law and Policy Center, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc., Clean Air Council, National Parks Conservation Association, Environment America and Environmental Defense Fund
Respondent: Environmental Protection Agency and Jane Nishida, Acting Administrator, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency
Intervenor: American Wood Council, State of Mississippi, State of Montana, American Forest & Paper Association, American Chemistry Council, American Petroleum Institute, State of Arkansas, State of Missouri, State of Louisiana, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and State of Texas
Case Number: 21-1060
Filed: February 11, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2021 MOTION [1886099] for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] filed by States of Texas, Arkansas, Louisiana, Mississippi, Missouri and Montana [Service Date: 02/18/2021 ] [21-1028, 21-1060]--[Edited 02/19/2021 by SRJ] (Stone, Judd) [Entered: 02/18/2021 11:33 PM]
February 18, 2021 MOTION [1886030] for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, the American Petroleum Institute, the American Forest & Paper Association, the American Wood Council, and the American Chemistry Council [Service Date: 02/18/2021 ] [21-1028, 21-1060]--[Edited 02/19/2021 by SRJ] (Bieke, James) [Entered: 02/18/2021 03:01 PM]
February 17, 2021 UNOPPOSED MOTION [1885865] to hold case in abeyance filed by Jane Nishida and EPA in 21-1028, 21-1060 [Service Date: 02/17/2021 ] Length Certification: 598 words. [21-1028, 21-1060] (Carlisle, Benjamin) [Entered: 02/17/2021 05:52 PM]
February 17, 2021 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1885845] filed by Benjamin Carlisle on behalf of Respondents EPA and Jane Nishida in 21-1028, 21-1060. [21-1028, 21-1060] (Carlisle, Benjamin) [Entered: 02/17/2021 05:15 PM]
February 17, 2021 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1885688] filed by Claiborne E. Walthall and co-counsel Michael J. Myers, Steven C. Wu on behalf of Petitioner State of New York in 21-1028. [21-1028, 21-1060] (Myers, Michael) [Entered: 02/17/2021 12:06 PM]
February 16, 2021 CLERK'S ORDER [1885376] filed consolidating cases 21-1060 (Consolidation started 02/16/2021) with 21-1028; directing party to file in 21-1060 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 03/18/2021. PETITIONER statement of issues due 03/18/2021 [21-1028, 21-1060] [Entered: 02/16/2021 01:07 PM]
February 16, 2021 CERTIFIED COPY [1885369] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1885367-2 ] [21-1060] [Entered: 02/16/2021 12:47 PM]
February 11, 2021 PETITION FOR REVIEW [1885367] of a decision by federal agency filed by American Academy of Pediatrics, American Lung Association, American Public Health Association, Appalachian Mountain Club, Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc., Clean Air Council, Conservation Law Foundation, Environment America, Environmental Defense Fund, Environmental Law and Policy Center, National Parks Conservation Association, Natural Resources Council of Maine, Natural Resources Defense Council and Sierra Club [Service Date: 02/11/2021 ] Disclosure Statement: Attached. [21-1060] [Entered: 02/16/2021 12:46 PM]
February 11, 2021 PETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [21-1060] [Entered: 02/16/2021 12:12 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: American Academy of Pediatrics, et al v. EPA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Natural Resources Council of Maine
Represented By: Ann Brewster Weeks Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: American Academy of Pediatrics
Represented By: Seth L. Johnson
Represented By: Marvin C. Brown IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: American Public Health Association
Represented By: Seth L. Johnson
Represented By: Marvin C. Brown IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sierra Club
Represented By: Seth L. Johnson
Represented By: Marvin C. Brown IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Appalachian Mountain Club
Represented By: Seth L. Johnson
Represented By: Marvin C. Brown IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: American Lung Association
Represented By: Seth L. Johnson
Represented By: Marvin C. Brown IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Natural Resources Defense Council
Represented By: John DuVal Walke Esquire
Represented By: Seth L. Johnson
Represented By: Emily Kingsbury Davis
Represented By: Marvin C. Brown IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Conservation Law Foundation
Represented By: Ann Brewster Weeks Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Environmental Law and Policy Center
Represented By: Howard Learner
Represented By: Ann Jaworski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Jon Alan Mueller
Represented By: Ariel E. Solaski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Clean Air Council
Represented By: Ann Brewster Weeks Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: National Parks Conservation Association
Represented By: Seth L. Johnson
Represented By: Marvin C. Brown IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Environment America
Represented By: Michael Landis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Environmental Defense Fund
Represented By: Peter Michel Zalzal Esquire
Represented By: Rachel E. Fullmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Benjamin Carlisle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jane Nishida, Acting Administrator, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Benjamin Carlisle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: American Wood Council
Represented By: James Robert Bieke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Mississippi
Represented By: Judd Edward Stone II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Montana
Represented By: Judd Edward Stone II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: American Forest & Paper Association
Represented By: James Robert Bieke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: American Chemistry Council
Represented By: James Robert Bieke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: American Petroleum Institute
Represented By: James Robert Bieke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Arkansas
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Vincent M. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Missouri
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Louisiana
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Schon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: State of Texas
Represented By: Judd Edward Stone II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?