Childrens Health Defense, et al v. FCC, et al
Petitioner: Childrens Health Defense, Erica Elliot, Jonathan Mirin, Ginger Kesler and Angela Tsiang
Respondent: Federal Communications Commission and United States of America
Case Number: 21-1075
Filed: February 26, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2021 CLERK'S ORDER [1888231] filed directing party to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 04/02/2021. PETITIONER certificate as to parties due 04/02/2021. PETITIONER statement of issues due 04/02/2021. PETITIONER underlying decision due 04/02/2021. PETITIONER deferred appendix statement due 04/02/2021. PETITIONER procedural motions due 04/02/2021. PETITIONER dispositive motions due 04/19/2021; directing party to file initial submissions: RESPONDENT procedural motions due 04/02/2021. RESPONDENT certified index to record due 04/19/2021. RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 04/19/2021 [21-1075] [Entered: 03/03/2021 03:49 PM]
March 1, 2021 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1887714] filed by William J. Scher and co-counsel Jacob M. Lewis on behalf of Respondent FCC. [21-1075] (Scher, William) [Entered: 03/01/2021 01:17 PM]
March 1, 2021 CERTIFIED COPY [1887685] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1887680-2 ] [21-1075] [Entered: 03/01/2021 11:54 AM]
February 26, 2021 PETITION FOR REVIEW [1887680] of a decision by federal agency filed by Childrens Health Defense, Dr. Erica Elliot, Ginger Kesler, Jonathan Mirin and Angela Tsiang [Service Date: 02/26/2021 ] Disclosure Statement: Attached. [21-1075] [Entered: 03/01/2021 11:49 AM]
February 26, 2021 PETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [21-1075] [Entered: 03/01/2021 11:41 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Childrens Health Defense, et al v. FCC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Childrens Health Defense
Represented By: William Scott McCollough
Represented By: Robert Francis Kennedy Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Erica Elliot
Represented By: William Scott McCollough
Represented By: Robert Francis Kennedy Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jonathan Mirin
Represented By: William Scott McCollough
Represented By: Robert Francis Kennedy Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ginger Kesler
Represented By: William Scott McCollough
Represented By: Robert Francis Kennedy Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Angela Tsiang
Represented By: William Scott McCollough
Represented By: Robert Francis Kennedy Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Federal Communications Commission
Represented By: Jacob M. Lewis
Represented By: William J. Scher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?