Kelvin Miles v. David Paul
Plaintiff / Appellant: Kelvin J. Miles
Defendant / Appellee: David Paul, Warden of Federal Medical Center (F.M.C.)
Case Number: 21-5078
Filed: March 31, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2021 LETTER [1897421] sent to warden sending Clerk order [ # 1897417-6 ]. Prisoner acknowledgment of receipt from Warden due 06/04/2021. [21-5078] [Entered: 05/05/2021 03:08 PM]
May 5, 2021 CLERK'S ORDER [1897417] filed removing case from abeyance, setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 07/06/2021. APPENDIX due 07/06/2021. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to send this order to appellant by whatever means necessary to ensure receipt. [21-5078] [Entered: 05/05/2021 02:55 PM]
May 4, 2021 NOTICE [1897385] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court for certificate of appealability [COA Status: COA denied] [21-5078] [Entered: 05/05/2021 11:54 AM]
April 2, 2021 CLERK'S ORDER [1892940] filed holding case in abeyance. Case 21-5078 held in abeyance pending decision in 1:18cv1154 from U.S. District Court; The Clerk is directed to transmit a copy of this order to the district court. [21-5078] [Entered: 04/02/2021 03:11 PM]
March 31, 2021 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1892936] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:18-cv-01154-UNA filed by Kelvin J. Miles. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 21-5078. [21-5078] [Entered: 04/02/2021 03:06 PM]
March 31, 2021 US PRISONER CASE docketed. [21-5078] [Entered: 04/02/2021 03:04 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Kelvin Miles v. David Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Kelvin J. Miles
Represented By: Warden (Rochester)
Represented By: Kelvin J. Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: David Paul, Warden of Federal Medical Center (F.M.C.)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?