Huguette Young v. Muriel Bowser
Defendant / Appellee: Muriel Bowser
Plaintiff / Appellant: Huguette Nicole Young
Case Number: 21-7002
Filed: January 11, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2021 CLERK'S ORDER [1889165] filed dismissing as moot motion to extend time [ # 1883451-2 ] [21-7002] [Entered: 03/10/2021 11:24 AM]
March 2, 2021 CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED [1888304] marked "Return to sender; unclaimed; unable to forward". Certified Mail [1879448-2] had been sent to Party Huguette Nicole Young. [21-7002] [Entered: 03/04/2021 10:04 AM]
February 18, 2021 CLERK'S ORDER [1885939] filed granting motion to permit pro se electronic filing [ # 1883434-2 ] [21-7002] [Entered: 02/18/2021 10:20 AM]
February 5, 2021 NOTICE [1883954] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court is filed [Case Number 21-7002: IFP] [21-7002] [Entered: 02/05/2021 12:52 PM]
February 3, 2021 CLERK'S ORDER [1883468] filed referring motion ifp in district court [ # 1883453-2 ] to the district court for consideration., holding case in abeyance. Case 21-7002 held in abeyance pending decision in 1:20cv2883-UNA from U.S. District Court; The Clerk is directed to transmit a copy of this order and the original motion to the district court. [21-7002] [Entered: 02/03/2021 11:11 AM]
January 31, 2021 APPELLANT BRIEF AND APPENDIX [1883454] filed by Huguette Nicole Young [Service Date: 02/03/2021 ] Length of Brief: 8822 words,. [21-7002] [Entered: 02/03/2021 10:53 AM]
January 31, 2021 MOTION [1883453] leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court filed by Huguette Nicole Young [Service Date: 02/03/2021 ] Length Certification: 6 pages. [21-7002] [Entered: 02/03/2021 10:51 AM]
January 31, 2021 MOTION [1883451] to extend time filed by Huguette Nicole Young [Service Date: 01/31/2021 ] Length Certification: 17 pages. [21-7002] [Entered: 02/03/2021 10:45 AM]
January 29, 2021 MOTION [1883434] to permit pro se electronic filing status filed by Huguette Nicole Young [Service Date: 02/03/2021 ] Length Certification: 1 page. [21-7002] [Entered: 02/03/2021 09:54 AM]
January 28, 2021 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT and ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1882706] filed by Huguette Nicole Young. [21-7002] [Entered: 01/29/2021 11:27 AM]
January 28, 2021 CLERK'S ORDER [1882525] filed dismissing as moot in part and denying in part motion to permit pro se electronic filing [ # 1880218-2 ] [21-7002] [Entered: 01/28/2021 04:11 PM]
January 21, 2021 SUPPLEMENT [1881201] to motion to permit pro se electronic filing [ # 1880218-2 ] filed by Huguette Nicole Young [21-7002] [Entered: 01/22/2021 08:15 AM]
January 14, 2021 MOTION [1880218] to permit pro se electronic filing status filed by Huguette Nicole Young [Service Date: 01/15/2021 ] Length Certification: 3 pages. [21-7002] [Entered: 01/15/2021 06:16 AM]
January 11, 2021 CERTIFIED MAIL and FIRST CALL MAIL SENT [1879448] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.7017 3040 0001 1261 2052] of order [ # 1879325-5 ], [ # 1879322-2 ]. Certified Mail Receipt due 02/10/2021 from Huguette Nicole Young. [21-7002] [Entered: 01/11/2021 05:03 PM]
January 11, 2021 CLERK'S ORDER [1879325] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 03/02/2021. APPENDIX due 03/02/2021. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [21-7002] [Entered: 01/11/2021 12:49 PM]
January 11, 2021 CLERK'S ORDER [1879322] filed directing party to file motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis or payment of docketing fee. APPELLANT payment of docketing fee or motion to proceed in forma pauperis in district court due 02/10/2021. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [21-7002] [Entered: 01/11/2021 12:43 PM]
January 11, 2021 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1879318] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:20-cv-02883-UNA filed by Huguette Nicole Young. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 21-7002. [21-7002] [Entered: 01/11/2021 12:36 PM]
January 11, 2021 PRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. [21-7002] [Entered: 01/11/2021 12:35 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Huguette Young v. Muriel Bowser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Muriel Bowser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Huguette Nicole Young
Represented By: Huguette Nicole Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?