American Train Dispatchers As, et al v. National Railway Labor Confer, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: Transportation Communications Union - IAM, Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT, Transport Workers Union, International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers (Smart) - Transportation Division, Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen, a Division of the Rail Conference of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen, International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers (Smart) - Mechanical Division, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, American Train Dispatchers Association, International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, International Association of Machinists & Aerospace Workers, AFL-CIO ("IAM") and National Conference of Firemen & Oilers District of Local 32BJ, SEIU
Defendant / Appellee: Norfolk Southern Railway Company, BNSF Railway Company, Kansas City Southern Railway Company, CSX Transportation, Inc., Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company, doing business as Canadian National Railway, Union Pacific Railroad Company, National Railway Labor Conference and Soo Line Railroad Company, doing business as Canadian Pacific Railway
Case Number: 21-7029
Filed: March 29, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2021 MANDATE ISSUED to Clerk, U.S. District Court. [21-7029] [Entered: 05/07/2021 02:15 PM]
May 7, 2021 CLERK'S ORDER [1897802] filed granting motion to dismiss case voluntarily [ # 1897199-2 ]. The Clerk is directed to issue the mandate forthwith to the district court. [21-7029] [Entered: 05/07/2021 02:13 PM]
May 4, 2021 UNOPPOSED MOTION [1897199] to dismiss case voluntarily filed by American Train Dispatchers Association, Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen, Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT, Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen, International Association of Machinists & Aerospace Workers, AFL-CIO ("IAM"), International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers (Smart) - Mechanical Division, International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers (Smart) - Transportation Division, International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, National Conference of Firemen & Oilers District of Local 32BJ, SEIU, Transport Workers Union and Transportation Communications Union - IAM [Service Date: 05/04/2021 ] Length Certification: 76 words.. [21-7029] (Grunert, John) [Entered: 05/04/2021 12:04 PM]
April 28, 2021 CLERK'S ORDER [1896408] filed granting motion to extend time [ # 1896084-2 ]; extending Clerk order initial submissions for appellant/petitioner [ # 1892120-2 ] APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 05/28/2021. APPELLANT statement of issues due 05/28/2021. APPELLANT underlying decision due 05/28/2021. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 05/28/2021. APPELLANT procedural motions due 05/28/2021. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 06/14/2021. Next APPELLANT transcript status report due 05/28/2021. Extending Clerk order initial submissions for appellee/respondent [ # 1892120-3 ] APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 05/28/2021. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 05/28/2021. APPELLEE procedural motions due 05/28/2021. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 06/14/2021 [21-7029] [Entered: 04/28/2021 12:38 PM]
April 26, 2021 UNOPPOSED MOTION [1896084] to extend time to file initial submissions to 05/28/2021 filed by American Train Dispatchers Association, Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen, Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT, Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen, International Association of Machinists & Aerospace Workers, AFL-CIO ("IAM"), International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers (Smart) - Mechanical Division, International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers (Smart) - Transportation Division, International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, National Conference of Firemen & Oilers District of Local 32BJ, SEIU, Transport Workers Union and Transportation Communications Union - IAM [Service Date: 04/26/2021 ] Length Certification: 484. [21-7029] (Grunert, John) [Entered: 04/26/2021 05:56 PM]
April 26, 2021 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1896073] filed by American Train Dispatchers Association, Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen, Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT, Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen, International Association of Machinists & Aerospace Workers, AFL-CIO ("IAM"), International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers (Smart) - Mechanical Division, International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers (Smart) - Transportation Division, International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, National Conference of Firemen & Oilers District of Local 32BJ, SEIU, Transport Workers Union and Transportation Communications Union - IAM [Service Date: 04/26/2021 ] [21-7029] (Grunert, John) [Entered: 04/26/2021 04:59 PM]
April 26, 2021 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1896052] filed by Elizabeth A. Roma and co-counsel John J. Grunert on behalf of Appellants American Train Dispatchers Association, Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen, Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT, Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen, International Association of Machinists & Aerospace Workers, AFL-CIO (IAM), International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers (Smart) - Mechanical Division, International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers (Smart) - Transportation Division, International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, National Conference of Firemen & Oilers District of Local 32BJ, SEIU, Transport Workers Union and Transportation Communications Union - IAM. [21-7029] (Grunert, John) [Entered: 04/26/2021 04:34 PM]
March 29, 2021 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1892118] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:20-cv-02139-TNM filed by American Train Dispatchers Association, Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen, Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT, Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen, International Association of Machinists & Aerospace Workers, AFL-CIO ("IAM"), International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers (Smart) - Mechanical Division, International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers (Smart) - Transportation Division, International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, National Conference of Firemen & Oilers District of Local 32BJ, SEIU, Transport Workers Union and Transportation Communications Union - IAM. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 21-7029. [21-7029] [Entered: 03/29/2021 01:22 PM]
March 29, 2021 CLERK'S ORDER [1892120] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 04/28/2021. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 04/28/2021. APPELLANT statement of issues due 04/28/2021. APPELLANT underlying decision due 04/28/2021. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 04/28/2021. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 04/28/2021. APPELLANT transcript status report due 04/28/2021. APPELLANT procedural motions due 04/28/2021. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 05/13/2021; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 04/28/2021. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 04/28/2021. APPELLEE procedural motions due 04/28/2021. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 05/13/2021 [21-7029] [Entered: 03/29/2021 01:23 PM]
March 29, 2021 PRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. [21-7029] [Entered: 03/29/2021 01:21 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: American Train Dispatchers As, et al v. National Railway Labor Confer, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Transportation Communications Union - IAM
Represented By: John Joseph Grunert Esquire Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth Roma Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employes Division/IBT
Represented By: John Joseph Grunert Esquire Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth Roma Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Transport Workers Union
Represented By: John Joseph Grunert Esquire Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth Roma Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers (Smart) - Transportation Division
Represented By: John Joseph Grunert Esquire Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth Roma Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Brotherhood of Locomotive Engineers and Trainmen, a Division of the Rail Conference of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters
Represented By: John Joseph Grunert Esquire Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth Roma Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen
Represented By: John Joseph Grunert Esquire Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth Roma Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers (Smart) - Mechanical Division
Represented By: John Joseph Grunert Esquire Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth Roma Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers
Represented By: John Joseph Grunert Esquire Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth Roma Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: American Train Dispatchers Association
Represented By: John Joseph Grunert Esquire Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth Roma Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: International Brotherhood of Boilermakers
Represented By: John Joseph Grunert Esquire Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth Roma Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: International Association of Machinists & Aerospace Workers, AFL-CIO ("IAM")
Represented By: John Joseph Grunert Esquire Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth Roma Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: National Conference of Firemen & Oilers District of Local 32BJ, SEIU
Represented By: John Joseph Grunert Esquire Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth Roma Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: Aaron S. Markel Esquire
Represented By: Donald J. Munro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Aaron S. Markel Esquire
Represented By: Donald J. Munro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kansas City Southern Railway Company
Represented By: Aaron S. Markel Esquire
Represented By: Donald J. Munro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron S. Markel Esquire
Represented By: Donald J. Munro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company, doing business as Canadian National Railway
Represented By: Aaron S. Markel Esquire
Represented By: Donald J. Munro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Aaron S. Markel Esquire
Represented By: Donald J. Munro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: National Railway Labor Conference
Represented By: Aaron S. Markel Esquire
Represented By: Donald J. Munro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Soo Line Railroad Company, doing business as Canadian Pacific Railway
Represented By: Aaron S. Markel Esquire
Represented By: Donald J. Munro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?