Mark Shaffer, et al v. George Washington University, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: Margaret Mauldin, 20cv1417; Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, Marc Lessin, Mark Shaffer, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated and Charafeddine Zaitoun, 20cv1417; Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated
Defendant / Appellee: George Washington University and Board of Trustees of George Washington University, 20cv1417
Case Number: 21-7040
Filed: April 28, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
March 8, 2022 Summary Shaffer v. George Washington University

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2021 CLERK'S ORDER [1902772] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 07/27/2021. APPENDIX due 07/27/2021. APPELLEE Brief due on 08/26/2021. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 09/16/2021 [21-7040] [Entered: 06/17/2021 01:00 PM]
June 1, 2021 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1900853] filed by Daniel J. Kurowski on behalf of Appellants Marc Lessin, Margaret Mauldin, Mark Shaffer and Charafeddine Zaitoun. [21-7040] (Kurowski, Daniel) [Entered: 06/01/2021 03:23 PM]
May 28, 2021 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1900608] filed by Marc Lessin, Margaret Mauldin, Mark Shaffer and Charafeddine Zaitoun [Service Date: 05/28/2021 ] [21-7040] (Berman, Steve) [Entered: 05/28/2021 03:06 PM]
May 28, 2021 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1900606] filed by Marc Lessin, Margaret Mauldin, Mark Shaffer and Charafeddine Zaitoun [Service Date: 05/28/2021 ] [21-7040] (Berman, Steve) [Entered: 05/28/2021 03:05 PM]
May 28, 2021 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1900611] filed by Marc Lessin, Margaret Mauldin, Mark Shaffer and Charafeddine Zaitoun [Service Date: 05/28/2021 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [21-7040]--[Edited 05/28/2021 by AY] (Berman, Steve) [Entered: 05/28/2021 03:08 PM]
May 28, 2021 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1900618] filed by Marc Lessin, Margaret Mauldin, Mark Shaffer and Charafeddine Zaitoun [Service Date: 05/28/2021 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [21-7040] (Berman, Steve) [Entered: 05/28/2021 03:13 PM]
May 28, 2021 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1900605] filed by Marc Lessin, Margaret Mauldin, Mark Shaffer and Charafeddine Zaitoun [Service Date: 05/28/2021 ] [21-7040] (Berman, Steve) [Entered: 05/28/2021 03:04 PM]
May 28, 2021 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1900615] submitted by Marc Lessin, Margaret Mauldin, Mark Shaffer and Charafeddine Zaitoun [Service Date: 05/28/2021 ] [21-7040] (Berman, Steve) [Entered: 05/28/2021 03:11 PM]
May 24, 2021 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1899885] filed by George Washington University and Board of Trustees of George Washington University [Service Date: 05/24/2021 ] [21-7040] (Schoenfeld, Alan) [Entered: 05/24/2021 04:14 PM]
May 14, 2021 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1898746] filed by Steve W. Berman on behalf of Appellants Marc Lessin, Margaret Mauldin, Mark Shaffer and Charafeddine Zaitoun. [21-7040] (Berman, Steve) [Entered: 05/14/2021 04:16 PM]
May 5, 2021 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1897395] filed by Alan Schoenfeld and co-counsel Jamie Gorelick and Bruce Berman on behalf of Appellees Board of Trustees of George Washington University and George Washington University. [21-7040] (Berman, Bruce) [Entered: 05/05/2021 12:53 PM]
May 4, 2021 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1897278] filed by Alan Schoenfeld on behalf of Appellees George Washington University and Board of Trustees of George Washington University. [21-7040] (Schoenfeld, Alan) [Entered: 05/04/2021 03:53 PM]
May 4, 2021 STATEMENT [1897279] with Disclosure Listing filed by George Washington University and Board of Trustees of George Washington University [Service Date: 05/04/2021 ] [21-7040] (Schoenfeld, Alan) [Entered: 05/04/2021 04:00 PM]
April 28, 2021 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1896395] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:20-cv-01145-RJL filed by Marc Lessin, Margaret Mauldin, Mark Shaffer and Charafeddine Zaitoun. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 21-7040. [21-7040] [Entered: 04/28/2021 12:02 PM]
April 28, 2021 CLERK'S ORDER [1896400] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 05/28/2021. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 05/28/2021. APPELLANT statement of issues due 05/28/2021. APPELLANT underlying decision due 05/28/2021. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 05/28/2021. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 05/28/2021. APPELLANT transcript status report due 05/28/2021. APPELLANT procedural motions due 05/28/2021. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 06/14/2021; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 05/28/2021. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 05/28/2021. APPELLEE procedural motions due 05/28/2021. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 06/14/2021 [21-7040] [Entered: 04/28/2021 12:04 PM]
April 28, 2021 PRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. [21-7040] [Entered: 04/28/2021 12:00 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Mark Shaffer, et al v. George Washington University, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Margaret Mauldin, 20cv1417; Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Daniel Kurowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Marc Lessin
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Daniel Kurowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Mark Shaffer, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Daniel Kurowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Charafeddine Zaitoun, 20cv1417; Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Daniel Kurowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: George Washington University
Represented By: Bruce M. Berman
Represented By: Alan Evan Schoenfeld
Represented By: Jamie S. Gorelick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Board of Trustees of George Washington University, 20cv1417
Represented By: Bruce M. Berman
Represented By: Alan Evan Schoenfeld
Represented By: Jamie S. Gorelick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?