Mohammed Bin Lep v. Joseph Biden, Jr.
Petitioner / Appellant: Mohammed Nazir Bin Lep
Respondent / Appellee: Joseph R. Biden, Jr.
Case Number: 22-5026
Filed: January 27, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2022 UNOPPOSED MOTION [1939324] to consolidate cases filed by Mohammed Nazir Bin Lep in 21-5014, 22-5026 [Service Date: 03/16/2022 ] Length Certification: 2,154. [21-5014, 22-5026] (Paradis, Michel) [Entered: 03/16/2022 02:33 PM]
March 15, 2022 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1939182] filed by Mohammed Nazir Bin Lep in 21-5014, 22-5026 [Service Date: 03/15/2022 ] [21-5014, 22-5026] (Paradis, Michel) [Entered: 03/15/2022 02:39 PM]
March 15, 2022 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1939181] submitted by Mohammed Nazir Bin Lep in 21-5014, 22-5026 [Service Date: 03/15/2022 ] [21-5014, 22-5026] (Paradis, Michel) [Entered: 03/15/2022 02:38 PM]
March 15, 2022 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1939184] filed by Mohammed Nazir Bin Lep in 21-5014, 22-5026 [Service Date: 03/15/2022 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - All transcripts needed for the appeal have been completed and received. [21-5014, 22-5026] (Paradis, Michel) [Entered: 03/15/2022 02:40 PM]
March 15, 2022 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1939186] filed by Mohammed Nazir Bin Lep in 21-5014, 22-5026 [Service Date: 03/15/2022 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [21-5014, 22-5026] (Paradis, Michel) [Entered: 03/15/2022 02:45 PM]
March 15, 2022 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1939238] filed by Joseph R. Biden, Jr. in 21-5014, 22-5026 [Service Date: 03/15/2022 ] [21-5014, 22-5026] (Neumeister, McKaye) [Entered: 03/15/2022 06:28 PM]
March 15, 2022 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1939178] filed by Michel Paradis and co-counsel Brian Bouffard on behalf of Appellant Mohammed Nazir Bin Lep in 21-5014, 22-5026. [21-5014, 22-5026] (Paradis, Michel) [Entered: 03/15/2022 02:37 PM]
March 15, 2022 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1939177] filed by Mohammed Nazir Bin Lep in 21-5014, 22-5026 [Service Date: 03/15/2022 ] [21-5014, 22-5026] (Paradis, Michel) [Entered: 03/15/2022 02:36 PM]
March 15, 2022 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1939154] filed by Charles Blanchard and co-counsel Drew Harker, Patrick Dorsey, on behalf of Appellant Mohammed Nazir Bin Lep in 21-5014, 22-5026. [21-5014, 22-5026] (Blanchard, Charles) [Entered: 03/15/2022 01:11 PM]
March 14, 2022 CLERK'S ORDER [1938949] filed granting motion to extend time [ # 1938818-2 ] in 21-5014; extending Clerk order initial submissions for appellant/petitioner [ # 1881390-2 ] in 21-5014 APPELLANT procedural motions due 04/05/2022. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 04/19/2022; extending Clerk order initial submissions for appellee/respondent [ # 1881390-3 ] in 21-5014 APPELLEE procedural motions due 04/05/2022. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 04/19/2022 [21-5014, 22-5026] [Entered: 03/14/2022 03:04 PM]
March 11, 2022 CONSENT UNOPPOSED MOTION [1938818] to extend time to file motion to 04/05/2022 filed by Joseph R. Biden, Jr. in 21-5014, 22-5026 [Service Date: 03/11/2022 ] Length Certification: 533 Words. [21-5014, 22-5026] (Neumeister, McKaye) [Entered: 03/11/2022 06:02 PM]
January 27, 2022 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1932576] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:20-cv-03344-JDB filed by Mohammed Nazir Bin Lep. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 22-5026. [22-5026]--[Edited 01/28/2022 by SHA-Document Replaced by the Clerk's Office] [Entered: 01/27/2022 02:13 PM]
January 27, 2022 CLERK'S ORDER [1932582] filed consolidating cases 22-5026 (Consolidation started 01/27/2022) with 21-5014, the deadlines established in case number 21-5014 by order of January 11, 2022 remain in effect [21-5014, 22-5026] [Entered: 01/27/2022 02:22 PM]
January 27, 2022 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [22-5026] [Entered: 01/27/2022 02:12 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Mohammed Bin Lep v. Joseph Biden, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: Mohammed Nazir Bin Lep
Represented By: Michel David Paradis Esquire
Represented By: Charles Alan Blanchard
Represented By: Patrick Orr Dorsey
Represented By: Drew A. Harker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: Joseph R. Biden, Jr.
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Sharon Swingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?