I.M. v. United States Customs and Border Protection, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: I.M.
Defendant / Appellee: United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security, in his official capacity., Chris Magnus, Commissioner of U.S. Customs & Border Protection, in his official capacity., Timothy J. Klein, Customs & Border Protection Officer, in his official capacity., Bock, Officer, Customs & Border Protection Officer, in his official capacity and Joseph Chavez, Chief Customs & Border Protection Officer, in his official capacity.
Case Number: 22-5071
Filed: March 24, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2022 CLERK'S ORDER [1947404] filed granting appellant's unopposed motion to extend time [ # 1947320-2 ], The following revised briefing schedule will now apply: APPELLANT Brief due 07/27/2022. APPENDIX due 07/27/2022. APPELLEE Brief due on 08/26/2022. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 09/16/2022 [22-5071] [Entered: 05/20/2022 10:30 AM]
May 19, 2022 UNOPPOSED MOTION [1947320] to extend time to file brief to 07/27/2022 filed by I.M. [Service Date: 05/19/2022 ] Length Certification: 280 Words. [22-5071] (Herzog, L. Allison) [Entered: 05/19/2022 03:19 PM]
May 18, 2022 CLERK'S ORDER [1947078] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 06/27/2022. APPENDIX due 06/27/2022. APPELLEE Brief due on 07/27/2022. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 08/17/2022 [22-5071] [Entered: 05/18/2022 10:44 AM]
May 18, 2022 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1947115] filed by Keren Hart Zwick on behalf of Appellant I.M.. [22-5071] (Zwick, Keren) [Entered: 05/18/2022 12:44 PM]
April 25, 2022 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1944227] filed by I.M. [Service Date: 04/25/2022 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [22-5071] (Herzog, L. Allison) [Entered: 04/25/2022 02:37 PM]
April 25, 2022 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1944229] filed by James Henry Barker, III and co-counsel Joseph Begun, Jacob Rush on behalf of Appellant I.M.. [22-5071] (Begun, Joseph) [Entered: 04/25/2022 02:46 PM]
April 25, 2022 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1944297] filed by Bock, Joseph Chavez, DHS, Timothy J. Klein, Chris Magnus, Alejandro N. Mayorkas and United States Customs and Border Protection [Service Date: 04/25/2022 ] [22-5071] (Bingham, Lauren) [Entered: 04/25/2022 06:38 PM]
April 25, 2022 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1944226] submitted by I.M. [Service Date: 04/25/2022 ] [22-5071] (Herzog, L. Allison) [Entered: 04/25/2022 02:35 PM]
April 25, 2022 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1944224] filed by I.M. [Service Date: 04/25/2022 ] [22-5071] (Herzog, L. Allison) [Entered: 04/25/2022 02:33 PM]
April 25, 2022 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1944223] filed by I.M. [Service Date: 04/25/2022 ] [22-5071] (Herzog, L. Allison) [Entered: 04/25/2022 02:31 PM]
April 25, 2022 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1944221] filed by I.M. [Service Date: 04/25/2022 ] [22-5071] (Herzog, L. Allison) [Entered: 04/25/2022 02:28 PM]
April 11, 2022 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1942548] filed by Lauren C. Bingham on behalf of Appellees Bock, Joseph Chavez, DHS, Timothy J. Klein, Chris Magnus, Alejandro N. Mayorkas and United States Customs and Border Protection. [22-5071] (Bingham, Lauren) [Entered: 04/11/2022 11:51 AM]
March 24, 2022 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1940422] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:20-cv-03576-DLF filed by I.M.. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 22-5071. [22-5071] [Entered: 03/24/2022 02:57 PM]
March 24, 2022 CLERK'S ORDER [1940426] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 04/25/2022. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 04/25/2022. APPELLANT statement of issues due 04/25/2022. APPELLANT underlying decision due 04/25/2022. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 04/25/2022. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 04/25/2022. APPELLANT transcript status report due 04/25/2022. APPELLANT procedural motions due 04/25/2022. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 05/09/2022; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 04/25/2022. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 04/25/2022. APPELLEE procedural motions due 04/25/2022. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 05/09/2022 [22-5071] [Entered: 03/24/2022 03:09 PM]
March 24, 2022 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1940469] filed by James Henry Barker, III and co-counsel L. Allison Herzog on behalf of Appellant I.M.. [22-5071] (Barker, James) [Entered: 03/24/2022 05:37 PM]
March 24, 2022 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [22-5071] [Entered: 03/24/2022 02:55 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: I.M. v. United States Customs and Border Protection, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: I.M.
Represented By: James Henry Barker III
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Dubner
Represented By: L. Allison Herzog
Represented By: Sean A. Lev
Represented By: Keren Hart Zwick
Represented By: Joseph Begun
Represented By: Jacob Rush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Lauren C. Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Lauren C. Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security, in his official capacity.
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Lauren C. Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Chris Magnus, Commissioner of U.S. Customs & Border Protection, in his official capacity.
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Lauren C. Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Timothy J. Klein, Customs & Border Protection Officer, in his official capacity.
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Lauren C. Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Bock, Officer, Customs & Border Protection Officer, in his official capacity
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Lauren C. Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Joseph Chavez, Chief Customs & Border Protection Officer, in his official capacity.
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Lauren C. Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?