Momolu Sirleaf, Jr., et al v. Merrick Garland, et al
Petitioner: Paul White
Petitioner / Appellant: Momolu V.S. Sirleaf, Jr.
Respondent / Appellee: Merrick B. Garland and United States of America
Case Number: 22-5073
Filed: March 25, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2022 RECEIPT [1945442] received from for documents [ # 1940580-2 ] sent to Appellant Momolu V.S. Sirleaf, Jr. [Per Warden:detainee has been deported] [22-5073] [Entered: 05/04/2022 12:13 PM]
April 7, 2022 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT [1942496] received from illegible [signed for on 04/04/2022] for order [1941399-2] sent to Appellant Momolu V.S. Sirleaf, Jr. [22-5073] [Entered: 04/11/2022 09:34 AM]
March 31, 2022 CLERK'S ORDER [1941378] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 05/20/2022. APPENDIX due 05/20/2022. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [22-5073] [Entered: 03/31/2022 01:02 PM]
March 31, 2022 CERTIFIED AND FIRST CLASS MAIL SENT [1941399] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.7021 0350 0001 8649 6289] of orders [ # 1941378-5 ], [ # 1941377-2 ]. Certified Mail Receipt due 05/02/2022 from Momolu V.S. Sirleaf Jr.. [22-5073] [Entered: 03/31/2022 02:02 PM]
March 31, 2022 CLERK'S ORDER [1941377] filed vacating Clerk order [ # 1940575-5 ]; directing party to file motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis or payment of docketing fee. APPELLANT payment of docketing fee or motion to proceed in forma pauperis in district court due 05/02/2022. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to send this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [22-5073] [Entered: 03/31/2022 12:52 PM]
March 28, 2022 NOTICE [1941162] of change of address filed by Momolu V.S. Sirleaf, Jr. [Service Date: 03/30/2022 ] [22-5073] [Entered: 03/30/2022 10:33 AM]
March 25, 2022 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1940562] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:21-cv-03398-UNA filed by Momolu V.S. Sirleaf, Jr.. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 22-5073. [22-5073] [Entered: 03/25/2022 11:41 AM]
March 25, 2022 [THIS ORDER VACATED BY ORDER OF 03/31/2022]--CLERK'S ORDER [1940575] filed to show cause regarding payment of docketing fee. Response to Order due 04/25/2022. The response may not exceed the length limitations established in the order. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to send this order to appellant by whatever means necessary to ensure receipt. [22-5073]--[Edited 03/31/2022 by AH] [Entered: 03/25/2022 12:02 PM]
March 25, 2022 LETTER [1940580] sent to warden sending Clerk order of docketing fee payment [ # 1940575-2 ]. Prisoner acknowledgment of receipt from Warden due 04/25/2022. [22-5073] [Entered: 03/25/2022 12:16 PM]
March 25, 2022 US PRISONER CASE docketed. [22-5073] [Entered: 03/25/2022 11:33 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Momolu Sirleaf, Jr., et al v. Merrick Garland, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: Momolu V.S. Sirleaf, Jr.
Represented By: Momolu V.S. Sirleaf Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Paul White
Represented By: Warden (Bowling Green CDF)
Represented By: Paul White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: Merrick B. Garland
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: United States of America
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?