Steven Greenbaum, et al v. Islamic Republic of Iran, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: Steven M. Greenbaum, on behalf of himself individually and as Administrator of the Estate of Judith (Shoshana) Lillian Greenbaum, deceased, Alan D. Hayman and Shirlee Hayman
Defendant / Appellee: Islamic Republic of Iran and Iranian Ministry of Information and Security
Intervenor / Appellee: United States of America
Case Number: 22-5080
Filed: March 28, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2022 CLERK'S ORDER [1947394] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 06/29/2022. APPENDIX due 06/29/2022. APPELLEE Brief due on 07/29/2022. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 08/19/2022 [22-5080, 22-5081, 22-5083, 22-5085] [Entered: 05/20/2022 10:19 AM]
April 28, 2022 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1944733] filed by Steven M. Greenbaum, Alan D. Hayman and Shirlee Hayman in 22-5080, David Kirschenbaum, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Jason Kirschenbaum, Joshua J. Kirschenbaum, Martin Kirschenbaum and Danielle Lynn Teitlebaum in 22-5081, Carlos Acosta, Maria Acosta, Tova Ettinger, Baruch Kahane, Libby Kahane, Norman Kahane, Cipporah Kaplan and Elizabeth Rich in 22-5083, Anna Beer, Harry Beer, Estelle Carroll and Phyllis Maisel in 22-5085 [Service Date: 04/28/2022 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [22-5080, 22-5081, 22-5083, 22-5085] (Petrocelli, Patrick) [Entered: 04/28/2022 12:51 PM]
April 28, 2022 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1944738] submitted by Steven M. Greenbaum, Alan D. Hayman and Shirlee Hayman in 22-5080, David Kirschenbaum, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Jason Kirschenbaum, Joshua J. Kirschenbaum, Martin Kirschenbaum and Danielle Lynn Teitlebaum in 22-5081, Carlos Acosta, Maria Acosta, Tova Ettinger, Baruch Kahane, Libby Kahane, Norman Kahane, Cipporah Kaplan and Elizabeth Rich in 22-5083, Anna Beer, Harry Beer, Estelle Carroll and Phyllis Maisel in 22-5085 [Service Date: 04/28/2022 ] [22-5080, 22-5081, 22-5083, 22-5085] (Petrocelli, Patrick) [Entered: 04/28/2022 12:58 PM]
April 28, 2022 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1944850] filed by USA in 22-5080, 22-5081, 22-5083, 22-5085 [Service Date: 04/28/2022 ] [22-5080, 22-5081, 22-5083, 22-5085] (Hudak, Brian) [Entered: 04/28/2022 08:18 PM]
April 28, 2022 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1944731] filed by Steven M. Greenbaum, Alan D. Hayman and Shirlee Hayman in 22-5080, David Kirschenbaum, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Jason Kirschenbaum, Joshua J. Kirschenbaum, Martin Kirschenbaum and Danielle Lynn Teitlebaum in 22-5081, Carlos Acosta, Maria Acosta, Tova Ettinger, Baruch Kahane, Libby Kahane, Norman Kahane, Cipporah Kaplan and Elizabeth Rich in 22-5083, Anna Beer, Harry Beer, Estelle Carroll and Phyllis Maisel in 22-5085 [Service Date: 04/28/2022 ] [22-5080, 22-5081, 22-5083, 22-5085] (Petrocelli, Patrick) [Entered: 04/28/2022 12:48 PM]
April 28, 2022 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1944849] filed by Brian P. Hudak and co-counsel Jane M. Lyons and Peter Pfaffenroth on behalf of Appellee USA in 22-5080, 22-5081, 22-5083, 22-5085. [22-5080, 22-5081, 22-5083, 22-5085] (Hudak, Brian) [Entered: 04/28/2022 08:16 PM]
April 28, 2022 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1944730] filed by Steven M. Greenbaum, Alan D. Hayman and Shirlee Hayman in 22-5080, David Kirschenbaum, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Jason Kirschenbaum, Joshua J. Kirschenbaum, Martin Kirschenbaum and Danielle Lynn Teitlebaum in 22-5081, Carlos Acosta, Maria Acosta, Tova Ettinger, Baruch Kahane, Libby Kahane, Norman Kahane, Cipporah Kaplan and Elizabeth Rich in 22-5083, Anna Beer, Harry Beer, Estelle Carroll and Phyllis Maisel in 22-5085 [Service Date: 04/28/2022 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [22-5080, 22-5081, 22-5083, 22-5085] (Petrocelli, Patrick) [Entered: 04/28/2022 12:47 PM]
April 28, 2022 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1944723] filed by Steven M. Greenbaum, Alan D. Hayman and Shirlee Hayman in 22-5080, David Kirschenbaum, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Jason Kirschenbaum, Joshua J. Kirschenbaum, Martin Kirschenbaum and Danielle Lynn Teitlebaum in 22-5081, Carlos Acosta, Maria Acosta, Tova Ettinger, Baruch Kahane, Libby Kahane, Norman Kahane, Cipporah Kaplan and Elizabeth Rich in 22-5083, Anna Beer, Harry Beer, Estelle Carroll and Phyllis Maisel in 22-5085 [Service Date: 04/28/2022 ] [22-5080, 22-5081, 22-5083, 22-5085] (Petrocelli, Patrick) [Entered: 04/28/2022 12:25 PM]
April 28, 2022 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1944724] filed by Steven M. Greenbaum, Alan D. Hayman and Shirlee Hayman in 22-5080, David Kirschenbaum, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Jason Kirschenbaum, Joshua J. Kirschenbaum, Martin Kirschenbaum and Danielle Lynn Teitlebaum in 22-5081, Carlos Acosta, Maria Acosta, Tova Ettinger, Baruch Kahane, Libby Kahane, Norman Kahane, Cipporah Kaplan and Elizabeth Rich in 22-5083, Anna Beer, Harry Beer, Estelle Carroll and Phyllis Maisel in 22-5085 [Service Date: 04/28/2022 ] [22-5080, 22-5081, 22-5083, 22-5085] (Petrocelli, Patrick) [Entered: 04/28/2022 12:28 PM]
April 28, 2022 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1944726] filed by Patrick N. Petrocelli and co-counsel James L. Bernard on behalf of Appellants Steven M. Greenbaum, Alan D. Hayman and Shirlee Hayman in 22-5080, Appellants David Kirschenbaum, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Jason Kirschenbaum, Joshua J. Kirschenbaum, Martin Kirschenbaum and Danielle Lynn Teitlebaum in 22-5081, Appellants Carlos Acosta, Maria Acosta, Tova Ettinger, Baruch Kahane, Libby Kahane, Norman Kahane, Cipporah Kaplan and Elizabeth Rich in 22-5083, Appellants Anna Beer, Harry Beer, Estelle Carroll and Phyllis Maisel in 22-5085. [22-5080, 22-5081, 22-5083, 22-5085] (Petrocelli, Patrick) [Entered: 04/28/2022 12:30 PM]
March 29, 2022 CLERK'S ORDER [1941116] filed consolidating cases 22-5081, 22-5083, 22-5085 (Consolidation started 03/29/2022) with 22-5080. Directing the parties to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 04/28/2022; APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 04/28/2022; APPELLANT statement of issues due 04/28/2022; APPELLANT underlying decision due 04/28/2022; APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 04/28/2022; APPELLANT entry of appearance due 04/28/2022; APPELLANT transcript status report due 04/28/2022; APPELLANT procedural motions due 04/28/2022; APPELLANT dispositive motions due 05/13/2022; APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 04/28/2022; APPELLEE entry of appearance due 04/28/2022; APPELLEE procedural motions due 04/28/2022; APPELLEE dispositive motions due 05/13/2022. [22-5080, 22-5081, 22-5083, 22-5085] [Entered: 03/29/2022 06:20 PM]
March 28, 2022 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1940830] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:02-cv-02148-RCL filed by Steven M. Greenbaum, Alan D. Hayman and Shirlee Hayman. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 22-5080. [22-5080] [Entered: 03/28/2022 03:24 PM]
March 28, 2022 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [22-5080] [Entered: 03/28/2022 03:23 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Steven Greenbaum, et al v. Islamic Republic of Iran, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Steven M. Greenbaum, on behalf of himself individually and as Administrator of the Estate of Judith (Shoshana) Lillian Greenbaum, deceased
Represented By: James Bernard Esquire
Represented By: Barry L. Leibowitz
Represented By: Patrick Petrocelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Alan D. Hayman
Represented By: James Bernard Esquire
Represented By: Barry L. Leibowitz
Represented By: Patrick Petrocelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Shirlee Hayman
Represented By: James Bernard Esquire
Represented By: Barry L. Leibowitz
Represented By: Patrick Petrocelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Islamic Republic of Iran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Iranian Ministry of Information and Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor / appellee: United States of America
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: Brian Paul Hudak Esquire
Represented By: Jane M. Lyons
Represented By: Peter C. Pfaffenroth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?