Mary Jo Weidrick v. Joseph Biden, Jr., et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: Mary Jo Weidrick
Defendant / Appellee: Joseph R. Biden, Jr., President of the United States, parties acting in both professional and personal capacities, United States Military, Parties acting in both professional and personal capacities, Merrick B. Garland, U.S. Attorney General, parties acting in both professional and personal capacities, United States Congress, Parties acting in both professional and personal capacities, John G. Roberts, Chief Justice, parties acting in both professional and personal capacities, Amy Coney Barrett, Justice, parties acting in both professional and personal capacities, Sonia Sotomayor, Justice, parties acting in both professional and personal capacities, Brett M. Kavanaugh, Justice, parties acting in both professional and personal capacities, Clarence Thomas, Justice, parties acting in both professional and personal capacities, Stephen G. Breyer, Justice, parties acting in both professional and personal capacities and Samuel A. Alito, Jr., Justice, parties acting in both professional and personal capacities
Case Number: 22-5193
Filed: July 8, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2022 PER CURIAM JUDGMENT [1962024] filed (without memorandum) that the district courts order filed June 27, 2022, be affirmed , dismissing as moot motion to expedite case [ # 1954067-2 ], (SEE JUDGMENT FOR DETAILS), withholding issuance of the mandate. Before Judges: Henderson, Pillard and Katsas. [22-5193] [Entered: 09/02/2022 01:17 PM]
August 19, 2022 PER CURIAM ORDER [1959979] filed that the court will dispose of the appeal without oral argument on the basis of the record and presentations in the briefs pursuant to Fed. R. App. 34(a)(2); D.C.Cir.Rule 34(j). Before Judges: Henderson, Pillard and Katsas. [22-5193] [Entered: 08/19/2022 09:05 AM]
August 1, 2022 NOTICE [1957268] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court is granted [Case Number 22-5193: IFP] [22-5193] [Entered: 08/01/2022 01:43 PM]
July 22, 2022 LETTER [1956364] received from the Clerk of the Supreme Court of the United States notifying this court of the following activity in the case before it: A petition for writ of certiorari was filed and placed on the docket on 07/22/2022 as No. 22-5162. [22-5193] [Entered: 07/25/2022 06:55 PM]
July 12, 2022 FIRST CLASS MAIL SENT [1954538] of order [ # 1954505-2 ] to appellant [22-5193] [Entered: 07/12/2022 01:01 PM]
July 12, 2022 CLERK'S ORDER [1954505] filed dismissing as moot motion ifp in district court [ # 1954070-2 ] [22-5193] [Entered: 07/12/2022 11:47 AM]
July 8, 2022 COPY OF NOTICE OF APPEAL [1954072] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:22-cv-01531-UNA filed by Mary Jo Weidrick. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 22-5193. [22-5193] [Entered: 07/08/2022 10:58 AM]
July 8, 2022 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1954027] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:22-cv-01531-UNA filed by Mary Jo Weidrick. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 22-5193. [22-5193] [Entered: 07/08/2022 10:02 AM]
July 8, 2022 APPELLANT BRIEF [1954065] filed by Mary Jo Weidrick [Service Date: 07/08/2022 ] Length of Brief: 17 pages. [22-5193] [Entered: 07/08/2022 10:53 AM]
July 8, 2022 MOTION [1954067] to expedite case filed by Mary Jo Weidrick (Service Date: 07/08/2022 by Clerk, CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 1 page. [22-5193] [Entered: 07/08/2022 10:54 AM]
July 8, 2022 MOTION [1954070] leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court filed by Mary Jo Weidrick [Service Date: 07/08/2022 ] Length Certification: 7 pages. [22-5193] [Entered: 07/08/2022 10:57 AM]
July 8, 2022 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [22-5193] [Entered: 07/08/2022 10:02 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Mary Jo Weidrick v. Joseph Biden, Jr., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Mary Jo Weidrick
Represented By: Mary Jo Weidrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Joseph R. Biden, Jr., President of the United States, parties acting in both professional and personal capacities
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Military, Parties acting in both professional and personal capacities
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Merrick B. Garland, U.S. Attorney General, parties acting in both professional and personal capacities
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Congress, Parties acting in both professional and personal capacities
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John G. Roberts, Chief Justice, parties acting in both professional and personal capacities
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Amy Coney Barrett, Justice, parties acting in both professional and personal capacities
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sonia Sotomayor, Justice, parties acting in both professional and personal capacities
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Brett M. Kavanaugh, Justice, parties acting in both professional and personal capacities
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Clarence Thomas, Justice, parties acting in both professional and personal capacities
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Stephen G. Breyer, Justice, parties acting in both professional and personal capacities
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Samuel A. Alito, Jr., Justice, parties acting in both professional and personal capacities
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?