Jane Doe v. USA
Plaintiff / Appellant: Jane Doe
Defendant / Appellee: United States of America, All 50 states
Case Number: 22-5201
Filed: July 26, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2022 NOTICE [1965349] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court that leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis is granted [22-5201]--[Edited 09/21/2022 by LMM] [Entered: 09/21/2022 02:54 PM]
September 21, 2022 CLERK'S ORDER [1965357] filed considering District Court notice ifp in district court [ # 1965349-3 ]; case is returned to active docket; referring Appellant brief [ # 1964813-2 ] and motion to extend time to file appendix and to appoint counsel [ # 1964810-3 ] to a special panel for disposition. [22-5201] [Entered: 09/21/2022 03:11 PM]
September 21, 2022 SUPPLEMENT [1965455] to Appellant/Petitioner brief [ # 1964813-2 ] filed by Jane Doe [Service Date: 09/22/2022 ] [22-5201] [Entered: 09/22/2022 08:08 AM]
September 19, 2022 SUPPLEMENT [1965094] to Appellant/Petitioner brief [ # 1964813-2 ] filed by Jane Doe [Service Date: 09/20/2022 ] [22-5201] [Entered: 09/20/2022 02:10 PM]
September 16, 2022 APPELLANT BRIEF [1964813] filed by Jane Doe [Service Date: 09/19/2022 ] Length of Brief: 43 pages. [22-5201] [Entered: 09/19/2022 01:33 PM]
September 16, 2022 MOTION [1964810] to extend time to file appendix and to appoint counsel filed by Jane Doe (Service Date: 09/19/2022 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 1 pages. [22-5201] [Entered: 09/19/2022 01:26 PM]
September 8, 2022 CLERK'S ORDER [1962580] filed referring motion ifp motion or docket fee [ # 1962571-2 ] to the district court for consideration, holding case in abeyance. Case 22-5201 held in abeyance pending decision in 1:22cv1337-UNA from U.S. District Court. The Clerk is directed to transmit a copy of this order and the original motion to the district court. [22-5201] [Entered: 09/08/2022 09:23 AM]
September 7, 2022 MOTION [1962571] to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis filed by Jane Doe (Service Date: 09/08/2022 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 7 pages. [22-5201] [Entered: 09/08/2022 08:57 AM]
July 26, 2022 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1956382] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:22-cv-01337-UNA filed by Jane Doe. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 22-5201. [22-5201] [Entered: 07/26/2022 08:58 AM]
July 26, 2022 CLERK'S ORDER [1956480] filed directing party to file motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis or payment of docketing fee. APPELLANT payment of docketing fee or motion to proceed in forma pauperis in district court due 08/25/2022. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to transmit a copy of this order to appellant, return receipt requested. [22-5201] [Entered: 07/26/2022 01:13 PM]
July 26, 2022 CLERK'S ORDER [1956483] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 09/14/2022. APPENDIX due 09/14/2022. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to transmit a copy of this order to appellant, return receipt requested. [22-5201] [Entered: 07/26/2022 01:21 PM]
July 26, 2022 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [22-5201] [Entered: 07/26/2022 08:55 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jane Doe v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jane Doe
Represented By: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States of America, All 50 states
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?