Mark Townsend v. USA, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: Mark William Townsend
Defendant / Appellee: United States of America, Environmental Protection Agency, Robert Perciasepe, In his official capacity as Deputy Administrator (retired), James Jones, In his official capacity as Assistant Administrator for the Office of Chemical Safety and Pollution Prevention, Louise Wise, In her official capacity as Deputy Assistant Administrator for the Office of Chemical Safety and Pollution Prevention, Martha Monell, Deputy Directior of Management Office of Pesticides Program, Unknown Named Officials of the Environmental Protection Agency, Michael S. Regan, Administrator of the EPA, Wendy Cleland-Hamnett, Former Director, Office of Pollution Prevention and Toxics, EPA and Tala Rae Henry, Director, Risk Assessment Division, EPA
Case Number: 22-5283
Filed: October 28, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2022 CLERK'S ORDER [1977998] filed granting motion to extend time [ # 1977552-2 ]; extending Clerk order initial submissions for appellant/petitioner [ # 1971044-2 ] APPELLANT docketing statement due 03/31/2023. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 03/31/2023. APPELLANT statement of issues due 03/31/2023. APPELLANT underlying decision due 03/31/2023. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 03/31/2023. APPELLANT procedural motions due 03/31/2023. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 04/07/2023. Next APPELLANT transcript status report due 03/31/2023; extending Clerk order initial submissions for appellee/respondent [ # 1971044-3 ] APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 03/31/2023. APPELLEE procedural motions due 03/31/2023. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 04/07/2023 [22-5283] [Entered: 12/16/2022 03:26 PM]
December 14, 2022 MOTION [1977552] to extend time to file initial submissions to 04/07/2023 filed by Mark William Townsend (Service Date: 12/14/2022 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 570 Words. [22-5283] (Heilbrun, Mark) [Entered: 12/14/2022 09:28 AM]
November 15, 2022 CLERK'S ORDER [1973825] filed granting motion to extend time [ # 1972567-2 ]; extending Clerk order initial submissions for appellant/petitioner [ # 1971044-2 ] APPELLANT docketing statement due 12/28/2022. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 12/28/2022. APPELLANT statement of issues due 12/28/2022. APPELLANT underlying decision due 12/28/2022. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 12/28/2022. APPELLANT procedural motions due 12/28/2022. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 01/27/2023. Next APPELLANT transcript status report due 12/28/2022; extending Clerk order initial submissions for appellee/respondent [ # 1971044-3 ] APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 12/28/2022. APPELLEE procedural motions due 12/28/2022. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 01/27/2023 [22-5283] [Entered: 11/15/2022 04:37 PM]
November 8, 2022 UNOPPOSED MOTION [1972567] to extend time to file initial submissions to 01/27/2023 filed by Mark William Townsend [Service Date: 11/08/2022 ] Length Certification: 698 Words. [22-5283] (Heilbrun, Mark) [Entered: 11/08/2022 04:25 AM]
November 6, 2022 CONSENT ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1972320] filed by Mark Ramsey Heilbrun on behalf of Appellant Mark William Townsend. [22-5283] (Heilbrun, Mark) [Entered: 11/06/2022 06:49 PM]
October 31, 2022 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1971279] filed by Joshua M. Koppel and co-counsel Melissa N. Patterson on behalf of Appellees Wendy Cleland-Hamnett, EPA, Tala Rae Henry, James Jones, Martha Monell, Robert Perciasepe, Michael S. Regan, Unknown Named Officials of the Environmental Protection Agency, USA and Louise Wise. [22-5283] (Koppel, Joshua) [Entered: 10/31/2022 12:20 PM]
October 28, 2022 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1971031] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:15-cv-01644-BAH filed by Mark William Townsend. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 22-5283. [22-5283] [Entered: 10/28/2022 11:39 AM]
October 28, 2022 CLERK'S ORDER [1971044] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 11/28/2022. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 11/28/2022. APPELLANT statement of issues due 11/28/2022. APPELLANT underlying decision due 11/28/2022. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 11/28/2022. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 11/28/2022. APPELLANT transcript status report due 11/28/2022. APPELLANT procedural motions due 11/28/2022. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 12/12/2022; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 11/28/2022. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 11/28/2022. APPELLEE procedural motions due 11/28/2022. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 12/12/2022 [22-5283] [Entered: 10/28/2022 12:23 PM]
October 28, 2022 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [22-5283] [Entered: 10/28/2022 11:38 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Mark Townsend v. USA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Mark William Townsend
Represented By: Mark Ramsey Heilbrun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States of America
Represented By: Joshua Michael Koppel
Represented By: Melissa Nicole Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Joshua Michael Koppel
Represented By: Melissa Nicole Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Robert Perciasepe, In his official capacity as Deputy Administrator (retired)
Represented By: Joshua Michael Koppel
Represented By: Melissa Nicole Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: James Jones, In his official capacity as Assistant Administrator for the Office of Chemical Safety and Pollution Prevention
Represented By: Joshua Michael Koppel
Represented By: Melissa Nicole Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Louise Wise, In her official capacity as Deputy Assistant Administrator for the Office of Chemical Safety and Pollution Prevention
Represented By: Joshua Michael Koppel
Represented By: Melissa Nicole Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Martha Monell, Deputy Directior of Management Office of Pesticides Program
Represented By: Joshua Michael Koppel
Represented By: Melissa Nicole Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Unknown Named Officials of the Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Joshua Michael Koppel
Represented By: Melissa Nicole Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Michael S. Regan, Administrator of the EPA
Represented By: Joshua Michael Koppel
Represented By: Melissa Nicole Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Wendy Cleland-Hamnett, Former Director, Office of Pollution Prevention and Toxics, EPA
Represented By: Joshua Michael Koppel
Represented By: Melissa Nicole Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Tala Rae Henry, Director, Risk Assessment Division, EPA
Represented By: Joshua Michael Koppel
Represented By: Melissa Nicole Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?