Mike Webb v. Department of the Army, et al
Petitioner / Appellant: Mike Webb, Major, doing business as Friends for Mike Webb, also known as Major Mike Webb for Congress
Respondent / Appellee: Department of the Army, Defense Intelligence Agency, Merit Systems Protection Board and Axiom Coorporation of Atlanta
Case Number: 22-5292
Filed: November 7, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act of 1974
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2022 APPELLANT BRIEF [1978712] filed by Mike Webb [Service Date: 12/22/2022 ] Length of Brief: 14 pages. [22-5292] [Entered: 12/22/2022 10:30 AM]
December 20, 2022 APPENDIX [1978719] filed by Mike Webb [Volumes: 1] [Service Date: 12/22/2022 ] [22-5292] [Entered: 12/22/2022 10:41 AM]
November 28, 2022 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT [1976878] received from Mike Webb [signed for on 11/22/2022] for order [1972407-2] sent to Appellant Mike Webb [22-5292] [Entered: 12/08/2022 01:56 PM]
November 17, 2022 CLERK'S ORDER [1974034] filed dismissing as moot motion ifp in district court [ # 1973146-2 ] [22-5292] [Entered: 11/17/2022 09:47 AM]
November 7, 2022 CERTIFIED AND FIRST CLASS MAIL SENT [1972407] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.7021 0350 0001 9947 6697] of order [ # 1972396-5 ]. Certified Mail Receipt due 12/07/2022 from Mike Webb. [22-5292] [Entered: 11/07/2022 11:52 AM]
November 7, 2022 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [22-5292] [Entered: 11/07/2022 10:41 AM]
November 7, 2022 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1972392] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:22-cv-02236-UNA filed by Mike Webb. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 22-5292. [22-5292] [Entered: 11/07/2022 10:43 AM]
November 7, 2022 CLERK'S ORDER [1972396] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 12/27/2022. APPENDIX due 12/27/2022. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [22-5292] [Entered: 11/07/2022 10:48 AM]
November 4, 2022 SUPPLEMENT [1972583] to Notice of Appeal [ # 1972392-2 ] filed by Mike Webb [Service Date: 11/04/2022 ] [22-5292] [Entered: 11/08/2022 08:35 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Mike Webb v. Department of the Army, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: Mike Webb, Major, doing business as Friends for Mike Webb, also known as Major Mike Webb for Congress
Represented By: Mike Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: Department of the Army
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: Defense Intelligence Agency
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: Merit Systems Protection Board
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: Axiom Coorporation of Atlanta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?