Simon Kinsella v. Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: Simon V. Kinsella
Defendant / Appellee: Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Amanda Lefton, in her official capacity as Director, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, James F. Bennett, in his official capacity, working for the Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Michelle Morin, in her official capacity as Chief, Environment Branch for Renewable Energy, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Mary Boatman, in her official capacity as Environmental Studies Chief, Office of Renewable Energy Programs, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Emma Chaiken, in her official capacity as Economist, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Mark Jensen, in his official capacity as Economist, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Jennifer Draher, in her official capacity, working for the Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Brian Hooker, in his official capacity as Biologist, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Debra A. Haaland, Secretary of the Interior, U.S. Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Interior, Laura Daniels-Davis, in her official capacity as Principal Deputy Assistant Secretary, Land and Mineral Management, Michael S. Regan, Administrator, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency and Environmental Protection Agency
Intervenor Defendant / Appellee: South Fork Wind, LLC
Case Number: 22-5316
Filed: November 30, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act of 1974
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2023 REPLY [1983159] filed by South Fork Wind, LLC to response [ # 1981904-2 ] [Service Date: 01/25/2023 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 503 Words. [22-5316] (Schneider, Janice) [Entered: 01/25/2023 04:39 PM]
January 24, 2023 REPLY [1982913] filed by James F. Bennett, Mary Boatman, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Emma Chaiken, Laura Daniels-Davis, DOI, Jennifer Draher, EPA, Debra A. Haaland, Brian Hooker, Mark Jensen, Amanda Lefton, Michelle Morin and Michael S. Regan to response [ # 1981551-2 ] [Service Date: 01/24/2023 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 1,373 Words. [22-5316] (Anderson, Christopher) [Entered: 01/24/2023 03:37 PM]
January 23, 2023 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1982686] to motion [ # 1981455-2 ] filed by James F. Bennett, Mary Boatman, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Emma Chaiken, Laura Daniels-Davis, DOI, Jennifer Draher, EPA, Debra A. Haaland, Brian Hooker, Mark Jensen, Amanda Lefton, Michelle Morin and Michael S. Regan [Service Date: 01/23/2023 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 5,019 Words. [22-5316] (Anderson, Christopher) [Entered: 01/23/2023 04:58 PM]
January 23, 2023 REPLY [1982437] filed by Mr. Simon V. Kinsella to response [ # 1982288-2 ] [Service Date: 01/23/2023 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: Word count 2,971, pages 11. [22-5316] (Kinsella, Simon) [Entered: 01/23/2023 04:06 AM]
January 20, 2023 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1982288] to motion [ # 1981455-2 ] filed by South Fork Wind, LLC [Service Date: 01/20/2023 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 5,193 Words. [22-5316] (Schneider, Janice) [Entered: 01/20/2023 12:29 PM]
January 18, 2023 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1981907] to motion [ # 1980499-2 ] filed by Mr. Simon V. Kinsella [Service Date: 01/18/2023 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: Pages: 4, Word count: 703. [22-5316] (Kinsella, Simon) [Entered: 01/18/2023 02:51 PM]
January 18, 2023 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1981904] to motion [ # 1980499-2 ] filed by Mr. Simon V. Kinsella [Service Date: 01/18/2023 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: Pages: 4, Word count: 703. [22-5316] (Kinsella, Simon) [Entered: 01/18/2023 02:41 PM]
January 17, 2023 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1981551] to motion to dismiss case for lack of jurisdiction [ # 1980934-2 ] filed by Mr. Simon V. Kinsella [Service Date: 01/17/2023 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: Pages: 20, Word count: 4,591. [22-5316] (Kinsella, Simon) [Entered: 01/17/2023 03:07 AM]
January 13, 2023 MOTION [1981455] temporary restraining order filed by Mr. Simon V. Kinsella (Service Date: 01/13/2023 by Email, Clerk, CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: Word count: 6,431. Page count: 30.. [22-5316] (Kinsella, Simon) [Entered: 01/13/2023 02:18 PM]
January 11, 2023 CORRECTED STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1980954] filed by Mr. Simon V. Kinsella [Service Date: 01/11/2023 ] [22-5316] (Kinsella, Simon) [Entered: 01/11/2023 03:23 AM]
January 11, 2023 AFFIDAVIT [1981133] filed by Mr. Simon V. Kinsella [Service Date: 01/11/2023 ] [22-5316]--[Edited 01/12/2023 by TAM] (Kinsella, Simon) [Entered: 01/11/2023 04:47 PM]
January 11, 2023 SEALED AFFIDAVIT [1981190] filed by Mr. Simon V. Kinsella [Service Date: 01/12/2023 ] [22-5316] [Entered: 01/12/2023 10:08 AM]
January 10, 2023 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1980866] to motion [ # 1980154-2 ], motion [ # 1980587-3 ] filed by South Fork Wind, LLC [Service Date: 01/10/2023 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 2,034 Words. [22-5316] (Schneider, Janice) [Entered: 01/10/2023 01:30 PM]
January 10, 2023 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1980943] to motion [ # 1980587-3 ], motion [ # 1980154-2 ] filed by James F. Bennett, Mary Boatman, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Emma Chaiken, Laura Daniels-Davis, DOI, Jennifer Draher, EPA, Debra A. Haaland, Brian Hooker, Mark Jensen, Amanda Lefton, Michelle Morin and Michael S. Regan [Service Date: 01/10/2023 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 376 words. [22-5316] (Anderson, Christopher) [Entered: 01/10/2023 04:25 PM]
January 10, 2023 MOTION [1980934] to dismiss case for lack of jurisdiction filed by James F. Bennett, Mary Boatman, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Emma Chaiken, Laura Daniels-Davis, DOI, Jennifer Draher, EPA, Debra A. Haaland, Brian Hooker, Mark Jensen, Amanda Lefton, Michelle Morin and Michael S. Regan (Service Date: 01/10/2023 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 2,215 words. [22-5316] (Anderson, Christopher) [Entered: 01/10/2023 03:49 PM]
January 10, 2023 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT [1980944] to motion for other relief [ # 1980499-2 ] filed by James F. Bennett, Mary Boatman, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Emma Chaiken, Laura Daniels-Davis, DOI, Jennifer Draher, EPA, Debra A. Haaland, Brian Hooker, Mark Jensen, Amanda Lefton, Michelle Morin and Michael S. Regan [Service Date: 01/10/2023 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 248 words. [22-5316] (Anderson, Christopher) [Entered: 01/10/2023 04:28 PM]
January 10, 2023 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1980953] filed by Mr. Simon V. Kinsella [Service Date: 01/10/2023 ] [22-5316] (Kinsella, Simon) [Entered: 01/10/2023 11:57 PM]
January 7, 2023 AMENDED MOTION [1980587] for leave to file second amended complaint filed by Mr. Simon V. Kinsella (Service Date: 01/07/2023 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 170 words. [22-5316]--[Edited 01/09/2023 by TAM] (Kinsella, Simon) [Entered: 01/07/2023 10:11 PM]
January 6, 2023 MOTION [1980499] to Strike Plaintiff-Appellant's Addenda filed by South Fork Wind, LLC (Service Date: 01/06/2023 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 817 words. [22-5316] (VanBelleghem, Stacey) [Entered: 01/06/2023 02:31 PM]
January 6, 2023 NOTICE [1980562] filed Word count: 380, Page count: 2 filed by Mr. Simon V. Kinsella [Service Date: 01/06/2023 ] [22-5316] (Kinsella, Simon) [Entered: 01/06/2023 04:39 PM]
January 6, 2023 REPLY [1980494] filed by South Fork Wind, LLC to response [ # 1979671-2 ] [Service Date: 01/06/2023 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 2,583 words. [22-5316] (VanBelleghem, Stacey) [Entered: 01/06/2023 02:23 PM]
January 4, 2023 MOTION [1980154] for leave to file second amended complaint filed by Mr. Simon V. Kinsella (Service Date: 01/04/2023 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: N/A. [22-5316]--[Edited 01/05/2023 by TAM] (Kinsella, Simon) [Entered: 01/04/2023 08:28 PM]
January 3, 2023 RESPONSE [1979943] to letter [ # 1979900-2 ], letter [ # 1979900-3 ] filed by Mr. Simon V. Kinsella [Service Date: 01/03/2023 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 432 words, 2 pages. [22-5316] (Kinsella, Simon) [Entered: 01/03/2023 06:33 PM]
January 3, 2023 AMENDED DOCKETING STATEMENT [1979953] filed by Mr. Simon V. Kinsella [Service Date: 01/03/2023 ] [22-5316] (Kinsella, Simon) [Entered: 01/03/2023 10:48 PM]
January 3, 2023 LETTER [1979900] to Clerk pursuant to Circuit Rule 12(e) filed by South Fork Wind, LLC [Service Date: 01/03/2023 ] [22-5316] (VanBelleghem, Stacey) [Entered: 01/03/2023 04:07 PM]
January 2, 2023 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1979684] submitted by Mr. Simon V. Kinsella [Service Date: 01/02/2023 ] [22-5316] (Kinsella, Simon) [Entered: 01/02/2023 05:31 PM]
December 31, 2022 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1979678] filed by Mr. Simon V. Kinsella [Service Date: 12/31/2022 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [22-5316] (Kinsella, Simon) [Entered: 12/31/2022 02:51 PM]
December 30, 2022 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1979588] filed by James F. Bennett, Mary Boatman, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Emma Chaiken, Laura Daniels-Davis, DOI, Jennifer Draher, EPA, Debra A. Haaland, Brian Hooker, Mark Jensen, Amanda Lefton, Michelle Morin and Michael S. Regan [Service Date: 12/30/2022 ] [22-5316] (Anderson, Christopher) [Entered: 12/30/2022 11:21 AM]
December 30, 2022 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1979671] to motion [ # 1978478-2 ] filed by Mr. Simon V. Kinsella [Service Date: 12/30/2022 by Email, CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: Pl.-Appellant's Resp to Def.-Intervenor-Appellee South Fork Wind LLC's Motion to Dismiss is 4,547 Words and 20 pages.. [22-5316] (Kinsella, Simon) [Entered: 12/30/2022 05:25 PM]
December 27, 2022 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1979226] filed by Mr. Simon V. Kinsella [Service Date: 12/27/2022 ] [22-5316] (Kinsella, Simon) [Entered: 12/27/2022 04:00 PM]
December 27, 2022 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1979228] filed by Simon V. Kinsella pro se on behalf of Appellant Mr. Simon V. Kinsella. [22-5316] (Kinsella, Simon) [Entered: 12/27/2022 04:11 PM]
December 27, 2022 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1979231] filed by Mr. Simon V. Kinsella [Service Date: 12/27/2022 ] [22-5316] (Kinsella, Simon) [Entered: 12/27/2022 04:24 PM]
December 27, 2022 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1979239] filed by Mr. Simon V. Kinsella [Service Date: 12/27/2022 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - All transcripts needed for the appeal have been completed and received. [22-5316] (Kinsella, Simon) [Entered: 12/27/2022 04:50 PM]
December 22, 2022 CLERK'S ORDER [1978775] filed granting motion to permit pro se electronic filing [ # 1975608-2 ] [22-5316] [Entered: 12/22/2022 12:07 PM]
December 20, 2022 MOTION [1978478] to dismiss case for lack of jurisdiction filed by South Fork Wind, LLC (Service Date: 12/20/2022 by US Mail, CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 3,428 Words. [22-5316] (Schneider, Janice) [Entered: 12/20/2022 06:02 PM]
December 20, 2022 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1978475] filed by Janice M. Schneider and co-counsel Stacey L. VanBelleghem and Devin M. O'Connor on behalf of Appellee South Fork Wind, LLC. [22-5316] (Schneider, Janice) [Entered: 12/20/2022 05:54 PM]
December 7, 2022 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1976759] filed by Christopher Anderson on behalf of Appellees James F. Bennett, Mary Boatman, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Emma Chaiken, Laura Daniels-Davis, DOI, Jennifer Draher, EPA, Debra A. Haaland, Brian Hooker, Mark Jensen, Amanda Lefton, Michelle Morin and Michael S. Regan. [22-5316] (Anderson, Christopher) [Entered: 12/07/2022 03:33 PM]
November 30, 2022 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1975591] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:22-cv-02147-JMC filed by Simon V. Kinsella. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 22-5316. [22-5316] [Entered: 11/30/2022 03:41 PM]
November 30, 2022 CLERK'S ORDER [1975602] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 12/30/2022. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 12/30/2022. APPELLANT statement of issues due 12/30/2022. APPELLANT underlying decision due 12/30/2022. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 12/30/2022. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 12/30/2022. APPELLANT transcript status report due 12/30/2022. APPELLANT procedural motions due 12/30/2022. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 01/17/2023; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 12/30/2022. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 12/30/2022. APPELLEE procedural motions due 12/30/2022. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 01/17/2023. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [22-5316] [Entered: 11/30/2022 04:05 PM]
November 30, 2022 CERTIFIED AND FIRST CLASS MAIL SENT [1975610] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.7021 0350 0001 9947 6758] of order [ # 1975602-6 ]. Certified Mail Receipt due 12/30/2022 from Simon V. Kinsella. [22-5316] [Entered: 11/30/2022 04:19 PM]
November 30, 2022 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [22-5316] [Entered: 11/30/2022 03:40 PM]
November 30, 2022 MOTION [1975608] to permit pro se electronic filing status filed by Simon V. Kinsella (Service Date: 11/30/2022 by CM/ECF NDA, Clerk) Length Certification: 2 pages. [22-5316] [Entered: 11/30/2022 04:18 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Simon Kinsella v. Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Simon V. Kinsella
Represented By: Simon V. Kinsella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Bureau of Ocean Energy Management
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Christopher Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Amanda Lefton, in her official capacity as Director, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Christopher Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: James F. Bennett, in his official capacity, working for the Bureau of Ocean Energy Management
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Christopher Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Michelle Morin, in her official capacity as Chief, Environment Branch for Renewable Energy, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Christopher Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Mary Boatman, in her official capacity as Environmental Studies Chief, Office of Renewable Energy Programs, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Christopher Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Emma Chaiken, in her official capacity as Economist, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Christopher Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Mark Jensen, in his official capacity as Economist, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Christopher Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jennifer Draher, in her official capacity, working for the Bureau of Ocean Energy Management
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Christopher Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Brian Hooker, in his official capacity as Biologist, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Christopher Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Debra A. Haaland, Secretary of the Interior, U.S. Department of the Interior
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Christopher Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Department of the Interior
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Christopher Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Laura Daniels-Davis, in her official capacity as Principal Deputy Assistant Secretary, Land and Mineral Management
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Christopher Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Michael S. Regan, Administrator, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: R. Craig Lawrence
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Christopher Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Christopher Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant / appellee: South Fork Wind, LLC
Represented By: Janice M. Schneider
Represented By: Devin O'Connor
Represented By: Stacey Lynn VanBelleghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?