Cato Institute v. FBI, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: Cato Institute
Defendant / Appellee: Federal Bureau of Investigation and United States Department of Justice
Case Number: 22-5342
Filed: December 27, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act of 1974
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2023 CLERK'S ORDER [1986081] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 03/27/2023. APPENDIX due 03/27/2023. APPELLEE Brief due on 04/26/2023. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 05/17/2023 [22-5342] [Entered: 02/15/2023 12:25 PM]
January 30, 2023 STATEMENT [1983827] with Disclosure Listing filed by Cato Institute [Service Date: 01/30/2023 ] [22-5342] (Topic, Matthew) [Entered: 01/30/2023 03:55 PM]
January 26, 2023 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1983281] filed by Cato Institute [Service Date: 01/26/2023 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [22-5342] (Topic, Matthew) [Entered: 01/26/2023 12:31 PM]
January 26, 2023 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1983282] filed by Cato Institute [Service Date: 01/26/2023 ] [22-5342] (Topic, Matthew) [Entered: 01/26/2023 12:32 PM]
January 26, 2023 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1983284] submitted by Cato Institute [Service Date: 01/26/2023 ] [22-5342] (Topic, Matthew) [Entered: 01/26/2023 12:35 PM]
January 26, 2023 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1983279] filed by Cato Institute [Service Date: 01/26/2023 ] [22-5342] (Topic, Matthew) [Entered: 01/26/2023 12:30 PM]
January 26, 2023 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1983283] filed by Cato Institute [Service Date: 01/26/2023 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [22-5342] (Topic, Matthew) [Entered: 01/26/2023 12:34 PM]
January 26, 2023 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1983278] filed by Cato Institute [Service Date: 01/26/2023 ] [22-5342] (Topic, Matthew) [Entered: 01/26/2023 12:29 PM]
January 26, 2023 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1983276] filed by Matthew Topic on behalf of Appellant Cato Institute. [22-5342] (Topic, Matthew) [Entered: 01/26/2023 12:28 PM]
January 23, 2023 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1982603] filed by DOJ and FBI [Service Date: 01/23/2023 ] [22-5342] (Kennedy, Kevin) [Entered: 01/23/2023 02:18 PM]
January 23, 2023 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1982450] filed by Kevin J. Kennedy on behalf of Appellees DOJ and FBI. [22-5342] (Kennedy, Kevin) [Entered: 01/23/2023 09:31 AM]
January 6, 2023 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1980560] filed by Sarah Carroll on behalf of Appellees DOJ and FBI. [22-5342] (Carroll, Sarah) [Entered: 01/06/2023 04:34 PM]
December 27, 2022 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1979233] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:20-cv-03338-JEB filed by Cato Institute. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 22-5342. [22-5342] [Entered: 12/27/2022 04:28 PM]
December 27, 2022 CLERK'S ORDER [1979235] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 01/26/2023. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 01/26/2023. APPELLANT statement of issues due 01/26/2023. APPELLANT underlying decision due 01/26/2023. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 01/26/2023. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 01/26/2023. APPELLANT transcript status report due 01/26/2023. APPELLANT procedural motions due 01/26/2023. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 02/10/2023; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 01/26/2023. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 01/26/2023. APPELLEE procedural motions due 01/26/2023. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 02/10/2023 [22-5342] [Entered: 12/27/2022 04:30 PM]
December 27, 2022 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [22-5342] [Entered: 12/27/2022 04:27 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Cato Institute v. FBI, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Cato Institute
Represented By: Matthew Topic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Sarah Carroll
Represented By: Kevin J. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Sarah Carroll
Represented By: Kevin J. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?