Michael Lynch v. Broomall Operating Company LP, et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: Michael P. Lynch, Administrator of the Estate of John J. Lynch, Sr., deceased
Defendant / Appellant: Broomall Operating Company LP, doing business as Broomall Rehabilitation and Nursing Center, Broomall Operating GP LLC, Vincent Rupert and Elizabeth Marasco-Kennedy
Defendant / Appellee: John Does, 1-5, Fictitious Defendant(s)
Case Number: 22-7006
Filed: January 18, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Medical Malpractice
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2022 REPLY [1939535] filed by Leon M. Hereford in 22-7005, Michael P. Lynch in 22-7006, Rochelle M. Johnson in 22-7007, Patrick M. Smith in 22-7008 to response [ # 1939005-2 ] [Service Date: 03/17/2022 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 1,551 words. [22-7005, 22-7006, 22-7007, 22-7008] (Pulver, Adam) [Entered: 03/17/2022 04:40 PM]
March 14, 2022 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1939005] to motion to dismiss case for lack of jurisdiction [ # 1937523-2 ] filed by Broomall Operating Company LP, Broomall Operating GP LLC, Elizabeth Marasco-Kennedy and Vincent Rupert in 22-7005, 22-7006, 22-7007, 22-7008 [Service Date: 03/14/2022 by Clerk, CM/ECF NDA, Email] Length Certification: 5190. [22-7005, 22-7006, 22-7007, 22-7008] (Solomon, Deva) [Entered: 03/14/2022 04:57 PM]
March 3, 2022 MOTION [1937523] to dismiss case for lack of jurisdiction filed by Leon M. Hereford in 22-7005, Michael P. Lynch in 22-7006, Rochelle M. Johnson in 22-7007, Patrick M. Smith in 22-7008 (Service Date: 03/03/2022 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 5,048 words. [22-7005, 22-7006, 22-7007, 22-7008] (Pulver, Adam) [Entered: 03/03/2022 11:13 AM]
February 18, 2022 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1935741] filed by Broomall Operating Company LP, Broomall Operating GP LLC, Elizabeth Marasco-Kennedy and Vincent Rupert [Service Date: 02/18/2022 ] [22-7006] (Solomon, Deva) [Entered: 02/18/2022 09:53 AM]
February 18, 2022 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1935740] filed by Broomall Operating Company LP, Broomall Operating GP LLC, Elizabeth Marasco-Kennedy and Vincent Rupert [Service Date: 02/18/2022 ] [22-7005] (Solomon, Deva) [Entered: 02/18/2022 09:52 AM]
February 18, 2022 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1935742] filed by Broomall Operating Company LP, Broomall Operating GP LLC, Elizabeth Marasco-Kennedy and Vincent Rupert [Service Date: 02/18/2022 ] [22-7007] (Solomon, Deva) [Entered: 02/18/2022 09:54 AM]
February 18, 2022 STATEMENT [1935894] with Disclosure Listing filed by Broomall Operating Company LP and Broomall Operating GP LLC in 22-7005, 22-7006, 22-7007, 22-7008 [Service Date: 02/18/2022 ] [22-7005, 22-7006, 22-7007, 22-7008] (Solomon, Deva) [Entered: 02/18/2022 04:49 PM]
February 18, 2022 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1935736] filed by Broomall Operating Company LP, Broomall Operating GP LLC, Elizabeth Marasco-Kennedy and Vincent Rupert in 22-7005, 22-7006, 22-7007, 22-7008 [Service Date: 02/18/2022 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [22-7005, 22-7006, 22-7007, 22-7008] (Solomon, Deva) [Entered: 02/18/2022 09:50 AM]
February 18, 2022 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1935746] filed by Leon M. Hereford in 22-7005, Michael P. Lynch in 22-7006, Rochelle M. Johnson in 22-7007, Patrick M. Smith in 22-7008 [Service Date: 02/18/2022 ] [22-7005, 22-7006, 22-7007, 22-7008] (Pulver, Adam) [Entered: 02/18/2022 10:01 AM]
February 18, 2022 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1935744] filed by Broomall Operating Company LP, Broomall Operating GP LLC, Vincent Rupert and Elizabeth Marasco-Kennedy [Service Date: 02/18/2022 ] [22-7008] (Solomon, Deva) [Entered: 02/18/2022 09:55 AM]
February 18, 2022 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1935735] filed by Broomall Operating Company LP, Broomall Operating GP LLC, Vincent Rupert and Elizabeth Marasco-Kennedy in 22-7005, 22-7006, 22-7007, 22-7008 [Service Date: 02/18/2022 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - All transcripts needed for the appeal have been completed and received. [22-7005, 22-7006, 22-7007, 22-7008] (Solomon, Deva) [Entered: 02/18/2022 09:49 AM]
February 18, 2022 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1935731] submitted by Broomall Operating Company LP, Broomall Operating GP LLC, Elizabeth Marasco-Kennedy and Vincent Rupert in 22-7005, 22-7006, 22-7007, 22-7008 [Service Date: 02/18/2022 ] [22-7005, 22-7006, 22-7007, 22-7008] (Solomon, Deva) [Entered: 02/18/2022 09:44 AM]
February 18, 2022 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1935732] filed by Broomall Operating Company LP, Broomall Operating GP LLC, Elizabeth Marasco-Kennedy and Vincent Rupert in 22-7005, 22-7006, 22-7007, 22-7008 [Service Date: 02/18/2022 ] [22-7005, 22-7006, 22-7007, 22-7008] (Solomon, Deva) [Entered: 02/18/2022 09:46 AM]
February 18, 2022 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1935729] filed by Deva A Solomon on behalf of Appellants Broomall Operating Company LP, Broomall Operating GP LLC, Elizabeth Marasco-Kennedy and Vincent Rupert in 22-7005, 22-7006, 22-7007, 22-7008. [22-7005, 22-7006, 22-7007, 22-7008] (Solomon, Deva) [Entered: 02/18/2022 09:42 AM]
February 18, 2022 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1935734] filed by Broomall Operating Company LP, Broomall Operating GP LLC, Vincent Rupert and Elizabeth Marasco-Kennedy in 22-7005, 22-7006, 22-7007, 22-7008 [Service Date: 02/18/2022 ] [22-7005, 22-7006, 22-7007, 22-7008] (Solomon, Deva) [Entered: 02/18/2022 09:47 AM]
January 21, 2022 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1931814] filed by Adam R. Pulver and co-counsel Allison M. Zieve, Scott L. Nelson on behalf of Appellee Leon M. Hereford in 22-7005, Appellee Michael P. Lynch in 22-7006, Appellee Rochelle M. Johnson in 22-7007, Appellee Patrick M. Smith in 22-7008. [22-7005, 22-7006, 22-7007, 22-7008] (Pulver, Adam) [Entered: 01/21/2022 05:47 PM]
January 20, 2022 NOTICES [1931536] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court for payment of the docketing fees. [22-7005, 22-7006, 22-7007, 22-7008] [Entered: 01/20/2022 04:51 PM]
January 19, 2022 CLERK'S ORDER [1931201] filed consolidating cases 22-7006, 22-7007, 22-7008 (Consolidation started 01/19/2022) with 22-7005. Directing the parties to file: APPELLANT payment of docketing fee due 02/18/2022, APPELLANT docketing statement due 02/18/2022, APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 02/18/2022, APPELLANT statement of issues due 02/18/2022, APPELLANT underlying decision due 02/18/2022, APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 02/18/2022; APPELLANT entry of appearance due 02/18/2022, APPELLANT transcript status report due 02/18/2022, APPELLANT procedural motions due 02/18/2022, APPELLANT dispositive motions due 03/07/2022, APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 02/18/2022, APPELLEE entry of appearance due 02/18/2022, APPELLEE procedural motions due 02/18/2022, APPELLEE dispositive motions due 03/07/2022. [22-7005, 22-7006, 22-7007, 22-7008] [Entered: 01/19/2022 11:51 AM]
January 18, 2022 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1931106] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 2:21-cv-03924-ER filed by Broomall Operating Company LP, Broomall Operating GP LLC, Elizabeth Marasco-Kennedy and Vincent Rupert. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 22-7006. [22-7006] [Entered: 01/18/2022 06:21 PM]
January 18, 2022 LETTER [1931113] sent regarding attorney membership to Christopher J. Culleton for Leon M. Hereford in 22-7005, Christopher J. Culleton for Michael P. Lynch in 22-7006, Christopher J. Culleton for Rochelle M. Johnson in 22-7007, Christopher J. Culleton for Patrick M. Smith in 22-7008. Application for Admission due 02/17/2022. [22-7005, 22-7006, 22-7007, 22-7008] [Entered: 01/18/2022 06:24 PM]
January 18, 2022 PRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. [22-7006] [Entered: 01/18/2022 04:49 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Michael Lynch v. Broomall Operating Company LP, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Michael P. Lynch, Administrator of the Estate of John J. Lynch, Sr., deceased
Represented By: Christopher J. Culleton
Represented By: Adam R. Pulver
Represented By: Scott Lawrence Nelson
Represented By: Allison M. Zieve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Broomall Operating Company LP, doing business as Broomall Rehabilitation and Nursing Center
Represented By: Deva Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Broomall Operating GP LLC
Represented By: Deva Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Vincent Rupert
Represented By: Deva Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Elizabeth Marasco-Kennedy
Represented By: Deva Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Does, 1-5, Fictitious Defendant(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?