Sara Gonzalez Flavell v. Tracy Marshall, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: Sara Gonzalez Flavell
Defendant / Appellee: Tracy Jane Marshall and Reed Group, Ltd
Case Number: 22-7041
Filed: April 11, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Medical Malpractice
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2022 MOTION [1949337] to correct record filed by Sara Gonzalez Flavell (Service Date: 06/03/2022 by US Mail) Length Certification: 12 pages. [22-7041] [Entered: 06/06/2022 10:09 AM]
May 10, 2022 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1946098] filed by Tracy Jane Marshall and Reed Group, Ltd [Service Date: 05/10/2022 ] [22-7041] (Scotti, Brian) [Entered: 05/10/2022 10:02 AM]
May 10, 2022 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1946096] filed by Brian A. Scotti on behalf of Appellees Tracy Jane Marshall and Reed Group, Ltd. [22-7041] (Scotti, Brian) [Entered: 05/10/2022 09:58 AM]
May 10, 2022 STATEMENT [1946099] with Disclosure Listing filed by Tracy Jane Marshall and Reed Group, Ltd [Service Date: 05/10/2022 ] [22-7041] (Scotti, Brian) [Entered: 05/10/2022 10:05 AM]
May 6, 2022 NOTICE [1945976] for payment of docketing fee [Case Number 22-7041: Fee Paid] filed by Sara Gonzalez Flavell [Service Date: 05/06/2022 ] [22-7041] [Entered: 05/09/2022 02:11 PM]
May 4, 2022 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1945521] filed by Sara Gonzalez Flavell [Service Date: 05/04/2022 ] [22-7041] [Entered: 05/05/2022 10:01 AM]
May 3, 2022 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1945308] filed by Sara Gonzalez Flavell [Service Date: 05/03/2022 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [22-7041] [Entered: 05/03/2022 01:56 PM]
May 3, 2022 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1945309] submitted by Sara Gonzalez Flavell [Service Date: 05/03/2022 ] [22-7041] [Entered: 05/03/2022 01:57 PM]
May 3, 2022 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1945311] filed by Sara Gonzalez Flavell [Service Date: 05/03/2022 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [22-7041] [Entered: 05/03/2022 01:57 PM]
May 3, 2022 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1945305] filed by Sara Gonzalez Flavell [Service Date: 05/03/2022 ] [22-7041] [Entered: 05/03/2022 01:55 PM]
May 3, 2022 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1945293] filed by Sara Gonzalez Flavell [Service Date: 05/03/2022 ] [22-7041] [Entered: 05/03/2022 12:47 PM]
May 3, 2022 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1945292] filed by Sara Gonzalez Flavell. [22-7041] [Entered: 05/03/2022 12:46 PM]
April 13, 2022 NOTICE [1942980] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court for payment of docketing fee [Case Number 22-7041: Fee Paid] [22-7041] [Entered: 04/13/2022 03:20 PM]
April 12, 2022 NOTICE [1942704] filed by Sara Gonzalez Flavell [Service Date: 04/12/2022 ] [22-7041] [Entered: 04/12/2022 10:26 AM]
April 11, 2022 CLERK'S ORDER [1942559] filed directing party to file motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis or payment of docketing fee. APPELLANT payment of docketing fee or motion to proceed in forma pauperis in district court due 05/11/2022. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [22-7041] [Entered: 04/11/2022 01:11 PM]
April 11, 2022 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1942543] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:21-cv-01406-DLF filed by Sara Gonzalez Flavell. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 22-7041. [22-7041] [Entered: 04/11/2022 11:39 AM]
April 11, 2022 CLERK'S ORDER [1942562] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 05/11/2022. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 05/11/2022. APPELLANT statement of issues due 05/11/2022. APPELLANT underlying decision due 05/11/2022. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 05/11/2022. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 05/11/2022. APPELLANT transcript status report due 05/11/2022. APPELLANT procedural motions due 05/11/2022. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 05/26/2022; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 05/11/2022. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 05/11/2022. APPELLEE procedural motions due 05/11/2022. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 05/26/2022. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [22-7041] [Entered: 04/11/2022 01:19 PM]
April 11, 2022 CERTIFIED AND FIRST CLASS MAIL SENT [1942570] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.7021 0350 0001 8679 5312] of order [ # 1942562-6 ], [ # 1942559-5 ]. Certified Mail Receipt due 05/11/2022 from Sara Gonzalez Flavell. [22-7041] [Entered: 04/11/2022 01:34 PM]
April 11, 2022 PRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. [22-7041] [Entered: 04/11/2022 11:37 AM]
April 11, 2022 LETTER [1942567] sent regarding attorney membership to Jeremy D Camacho, I for Tracy Jane Marshall and Reed Group, Ltd. Application for Admission due 05/11/2022. [22-7041] [Entered: 04/11/2022 01:29 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Sara Gonzalez Flavell v. Tracy Marshall, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Sara Gonzalez Flavell
Represented By: Sara Gonzalez Flavell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Tracy Jane Marshall
Represented By: Jeremy Camacho I
Represented By: Brian Adam Scotti Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Reed Group, Ltd
Represented By: Jeremy Camacho I
Represented By: Brian Adam Scotti Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?