Alexander Cameron, et al v. DC
Plaintiff / Appellant: Alexander Cameron, Benjamin Tan, Destiny Robinson, Jonah Angeles and Jake Oster, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Defendant / Appellee: District of Columbia
Case Number: 22-7130
Filed: September 30, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2022 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1971821] submitted by Jonah Angeles, Alexander Cameron, Jake Oster, Destiny Robinson and Benjamin Tan [Service Date: 11/02/2022 ] [22-7130] (Michelman, Scott) [Entered: 11/02/2022 02:48 PM]
November 2, 2022 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1971820] filed by Jonah Angeles, Alexander Cameron, Jake Oster, Destiny Robinson and Benjamin Tan [Service Date: 11/02/2022 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [22-7130] (Michelman, Scott) [Entered: 11/02/2022 02:47 PM]
November 2, 2022 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [1971822] to record [ # 1971821-2 ], report status of transcript (final) [ # 1971820-2 ], statement [ # 1971817-2 ], statement [ # 1971816-2 ], statement [ # 1971815-2 ], certificate [ # 1971814-2 ] filed by Jonah Angeles, Alexander Cameron, Jake Oster, Destiny Robinson and Benjamin Tan. [22-7130] (Michelman, Scott) [Entered: 11/02/2022 02:51 PM]
November 2, 2022 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1971874] filed by Marcella Coburn and co-counsel Ashwin P. Phatak, Carl J. Schifferle on behalf of Appellee DC. [22-7130] (Coburn, Marcella) [Entered: 11/02/2022 04:29 PM]
November 2, 2022 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1971875] filed by DC [Service Date: 11/02/2022 ] [22-7130] (Coburn, Marcella) [Entered: 11/02/2022 04:30 PM]
November 2, 2022 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1971819] filed by Scott Michelman and co-counsel Arthur B. Spitzer on behalf of Appellants Jonah Angeles, Alexander Cameron, Jake Oster, Destiny Robinson and Benjamin Tan. [22-7130] (Michelman, Scott) [Entered: 11/02/2022 02:46 PM]
November 2, 2022 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1971817] filed by Jonah Angeles, Alexander Cameron, Jake Oster, Destiny Robinson and Benjamin Tan [Service Date: 11/02/2022 ] [22-7130] (Michelman, Scott) [Entered: 11/02/2022 02:45 PM]
November 2, 2022 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1971814] filed by Jonah Angeles, Alexander Cameron, Jake Oster, Destiny Robinson and Benjamin Tan [Service Date: 11/02/2022 ] [22-7130] (Michelman, Scott) [Entered: 11/02/2022 02:43 PM]
November 2, 2022 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1971815] filed by Jonah Angeles, Alexander Cameron, Jake Oster, Destiny Robinson and Benjamin Tan [Service Date: 11/02/2022 ] [22-7130] (Michelman, Scott) [Entered: 11/02/2022 02:43 PM]
November 2, 2022 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1971816] filed by Jonah Angeles, Alexander Cameron, Jake Oster, Destiny Robinson and Benjamin Tan [Service Date: 11/02/2022 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [22-7130] (Michelman, Scott) [Entered: 11/02/2022 02:44 PM]
October 3, 2022 CLERK'S ORDER [1967182] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 11/02/2022. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 11/02/2022. APPELLANT statement of issues due 11/02/2022. APPELLANT underlying decision due 11/02/2022. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 11/02/2022. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 11/02/2022. APPELLANT transcript status report due 11/02/2022. APPELLANT procedural motions due 11/02/2022. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 11/17/2022; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 11/02/2022. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 11/02/2022. APPELLEE procedural motions due 11/02/2022. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 11/17/2022 [22-7130] [Entered: 10/03/2022 01:39 PM]
September 30, 2022 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1967180] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:21-cv-02908-APM filed by Jonah Angeles, Alexander Cameron, Jake Oster, Destiny Robinson and Benjamin Tan. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 22-7130. [22-7130] [Entered: 10/03/2022 01:38 PM]
September 30, 2022 PRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. [22-7130] [Entered: 10/03/2022 01:37 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Alexander Cameron, et al v. DC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Alexander Cameron
Represented By: Jeffrey Louis Light
Represented By: Kristin Leigh McGough
Represented By: Scott Matthew Michelman
Represented By: Tara L. Reinhart Esquire
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Benjamin Tan
Represented By: Tara L. Reinhart Esquire
Represented By: Scott Matthew Michelman
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Destiny Robinson
Represented By: Tara L. Reinhart Esquire
Represented By: Scott Matthew Michelman
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jonah Angeles
Represented By: Tara L. Reinhart Esquire
Represented By: Scott Matthew Michelman
Represented By: Arthur B. Spitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jake Oster, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Tara L. Reinhart Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: District of Columbia
Represented By: Caroline S. Van Zile
Represented By: Marcella Coburn
Represented By: Ashwin Pradyumna Phatak
Represented By: Carl James Schifferle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?