George Washington University v. Factory Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff / Appellant: George Washington University
Defendant / Appellee: Factory Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 22-7132
Filed: October 5, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2022 REPLY [1974623] filed by George Washington University to response [ # 1973629-2 ] [Service Date: 11/21/2022 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 2,597 words. [22-7132] (Schlesinger, Matthew) [Entered: 11/21/2022 08:32 PM]
November 14, 2022 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1973629] to motion to certify question of law [ # 1972302-2 ] filed by Factory Mutual Insurance Company [Service Date: 11/14/2022 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 5,180 Words. [22-7132] (Friedman, Bryce) [Entered: 11/14/2022 09:16 PM]
November 4, 2022 MOTION [1972302] to certify question of law filed by George Washington University (Service Date: 11/04/2022 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 5,157 Words. [22-7132] (Itami, Todd) [Entered: 11/04/2022 05:17 PM]
November 4, 2022 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1972303] filed by George Washington University [Service Date: 11/04/2022 ] [22-7132] (Itami, Todd) [Entered: 11/04/2022 05:19 PM]
November 4, 2022 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1972306] filed by George Washington University [Service Date: 11/04/2022 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [22-7132] (Itami, Todd) [Entered: 11/04/2022 05:23 PM]
November 4, 2022 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1972300] filed by Factory Mutual Insurance Company [Service Date: 11/04/2022 ] [22-7132] (Friedman, Bryce) [Entered: 11/04/2022 05:13 PM]
November 4, 2022 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1972304] filed by George Washington University [Service Date: 11/04/2022 ] [22-7132] (Itami, Todd) [Entered: 11/04/2022 05:20 PM]
November 4, 2022 STATEMENT [1972299] with Disclosure Listing filed by Factory Mutual Insurance Company [Service Date: 11/04/2022 ] [22-7132] (Friedman, Bryce) [Entered: 11/04/2022 05:10 PM]
November 4, 2022 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1972298] filed by Todd T. Itami and co-counsel Matthew J. Schlesinger on behalf of Appellant George Washington University. [22-7132] (Itami, Todd) [Entered: 11/04/2022 05:08 PM]
November 4, 2022 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1972297] filed by Bryce L. Friedman and co-counsel Isaac Rethy on behalf of Appellee Factory Mutual Insurance Company. [22-7132] (Friedman, Bryce) [Entered: 11/04/2022 04:59 PM]
October 5, 2022 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1967636] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:21-cv-03006-DLF filed by George Washington University. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 22-7132. [22-7132] [Entered: 10/05/2022 12:00 PM]
October 5, 2022 CLERK'S ORDER [1967638] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 11/04/2022. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 11/04/2022. APPELLANT statement of issues due 11/04/2022. APPELLANT underlying decision due 11/04/2022. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 11/04/2022. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 11/04/2022. APPELLANT transcript status report due 11/04/2022. APPELLANT procedural motions due 11/04/2022. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 11/21/2022; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 11/04/2022. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 11/04/2022. APPELLEE procedural motions due 11/04/2022. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 11/21/2022 [22-7132] [Entered: 10/05/2022 12:05 PM]
October 5, 2022 LETTER [1967639] sent regarding attorney membership to Matthew J. Schlesinger for George Washington University. Application for Admission due 11/04/2022. [22-7132] [Entered: 10/05/2022 12:09 PM]
October 5, 2022 PRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. [22-7132] [Entered: 10/05/2022 11:58 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: George Washington University v. Factory Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: George Washington University
Represented By: Matthew J. Schlesinger
Represented By: Todd Takashi Itami
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Factory Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Abram Jeremy Ellis
Represented By: Bryce Friedman
Represented By: Isaac Rethy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?