National Security Archive v. CIA
Plaintiff / Appellant: National Security Archive
Defendant / Appellee: Central Intelligence Agency
Case Number: 23-5017
Filed: January 25, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act of 1974

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
June 7, 2024 Summary National Security Archive v. CIA

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2023 CLERK'S ORDER [1991322] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 05/01/2023. APPELLEE Brief due on 05/31/2023. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 06/21/2023. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 06/28/2023. Final Briefs due 07/12/2023. [23-5017] [Entered: 03/22/2023 03:12 PM]
February 21, 2023 STATEMENT [1986703] with Disclosure Listing filed by National Security Archive [Service Date: 02/21/2023 ] [23-5017] (Jacobs, Hilary) [Entered: 02/21/2023 12:03 PM]
February 17, 2023 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1986477] filed by National Security Archive [Service Date: 02/17/2023 ] [23-5017] (Jacobs, Hilary) [Entered: 02/17/2023 03:01 PM]
February 17, 2023 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1986479] submitted by National Security Archive [Service Date: 02/17/2023 ] [23-5017] (Jacobs, Hilary) [Entered: 02/17/2023 03:03 PM]
February 17, 2023 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1986482] filed by National Security Archive [Service Date: 02/17/2023 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [23-5017] (Jacobs, Hilary) [Entered: 02/17/2023 03:07 PM]
February 17, 2023 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1986476] filed by National Security Archive [Service Date: 02/17/2023 ] [23-5017] (Jacobs, Hilary) [Entered: 02/17/2023 03:00 PM]
February 17, 2023 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1986480] filed by National Security Archive [Service Date: 02/17/2023 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [23-5017] (Jacobs, Hilary) [Entered: 02/17/2023 03:05 PM]
February 17, 2023 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1986473] filed by National Security Archive [Service Date: 02/17/2023 ] [23-5017] (Jacobs, Hilary) [Entered: 02/17/2023 02:59 PM]
February 17, 2023 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1986472] filed by John S. Guttman and co-counsel Hilary T. Jacobs on behalf of Appellant National Security Archive. [23-5017] (Jacobs, Hilary) [Entered: 02/17/2023 02:57 PM]
February 2, 2023 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1984375] filed by Lewis S. Yelin and co-counsel Sharon Swingle on behalf of Appellee CIA. [23-5017] (Yelin, Lewis) [Entered: 02/02/2023 03:01 PM]
February 2, 2023 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1984403] filed by CIA [Service Date: 02/02/2023 ] [23-5017] (Yelin, Lewis) [Entered: 02/02/2023 04:20 PM]
January 25, 2023 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1982966] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:21-cv-02857-JEB filed by National Security Archive. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 23-5017. [23-5017] [Entered: 01/25/2023 08:26 AM]
January 25, 2023 CLERK'S ORDER [1982968] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 02/24/2023. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 02/24/2023. APPELLANT statement of issues due 02/24/2023. APPELLANT underlying decision due 02/24/2023. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 02/24/2023. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 02/24/2023. APPELLANT transcript status report due 02/24/2023. APPELLANT procedural motions due 02/24/2023. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 03/13/2023; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 02/24/2023. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 02/24/2023. APPELLEE procedural motions due 02/24/2023. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 03/13/2023 [23-5017] [Entered: 01/25/2023 08:27 AM]
January 25, 2023 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [23-5017] [Entered: 01/25/2023 08:24 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: National Security Archive v. CIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: National Security Archive
Represented By: Hilary Jacobs
Represented By: John Stephen Guttmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Central Intelligence Agency
Represented By: DOJ Appellate Counsel
Represented By: Lewis Yelin
Represented By: Sharon Swingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?