Jaime Luevano v. Radio Show Satellites, et al
Petitioner / Appellant: Jaime Luevano
Respondent / Appellee: Radio Show Satellites, Google, Devices and Visuals
Case Number: 23-7003
Filed: January 11, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2023 CLERK'S ORDER [1987219] filed considering motion to extend time [ # 1986582-2 ]; directing response to Clerk order to show cause [ # 1980969-2 ] due 03/27/2023. Failure to respond may result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution; the Clerk is directed to send this order to appellant by whatever means necessary to ensure receipt. [23-7003] [Entered: 02/23/2023 12:08 PM]
February 23, 2023 LETTER [1987226] sent to warden sending Clerk order order by warden letter [ # 1987219-3 ]. Prisoner acknowledgment of receipt from Warden due 03/27/2023. [23-7003] [Entered: 02/23/2023 12:33 PM]
February 16, 2023 MOTION [1986582] to extend time filed by Jaime Luevano [Service Date: 02/21/2023 ] Length Certification: 2 pages. [23-7003] [Entered: 02/21/2023 09:46 AM]
January 30, 2023 RECEIPT [1984074] received from Jaime Luevano [signed for on 01/22/2023] for documents [ # 1980974-2 ] sent to Appellant Jaime Luevano [23-7003] [Entered: 02/01/2023 09:09 AM]
January 11, 2023 LETTER [1980974] sent to warden sending Clerk order [ # 1980969-5 ]. Prisoner acknowledgment of receipt from Warden due 02/10/2023. [23-7003] [Entered: 01/11/2023 09:02 AM]
January 11, 2023 NOTICE OF APPEAL [1980965] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:22-cv-03596-UNA filed by Jaime Luevano. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 23-7003. [23-7003] [Entered: 01/11/2023 08:38 AM]
January 11, 2023 CLERK'S ORDER [1980969] filed to show cause regarding payment of docketing fee. Response to Order due 02/10/2023. The response may not exceed the length limitations established in the order. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to send this order to appellant by whatever means necessary to ensure receipt. [23-7003] [Entered: 01/11/2023 08:43 AM]
January 11, 2023 PRIVATE PRISONER CASE docketed. [23-7003] [Entered: 01/11/2023 08:37 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jaime Luevano v. Radio Show Satellites, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: Jaime Luevano
Represented By: Jaime Luevano
Represented By: Warden (Gatesville ADH)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: Radio Show Satellites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: Google
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: Devices
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: Visuals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?