John Page v. Donald Trump, et al
Plaintiff: John H. Page
Defendant: Donald J. Trump, John G. Roberts, Jr., In both his personal and professional capacity and Joint Congressional Committee on Inaugural Ceremonies, In the person of Chairwoman Rep. A. Klobuchar
Case Number: 25-5036
Filed: February 20, 2025
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2025 NOTICE [2111260] to supplement record filed by Mr. John H. Page [Service Date: 04/15/2025 ] [25-5036] (Page, John) [Entered: 04/15/2025 05:02 PM]
April 11, 2025 INCORRECT DOCKET ENTRY-DISREGARD--APPELLANT BRIEF [2110715] filed by Mr. John H. Page [Service Date: 04/11/2025 ] Length of Brief: 1,740 words. [25-5036]--[Edited 04/18/2025 by EMT] (Page, John) [Entered: 04/11/2025 06:34 PM]
March 20, 2025 CLERK'S ORDER [2106662] filed granting motion to permit pro se electronic filing [ # 2104231-2 ] [25-5036] [Entered: 03/20/2025 09:07 AM]
March 6, 2025 SUPPLEMENT [2104692] to motion to permit pro se electronic filing [ # 2104231-2 ] filed by Mr. John H. Page [Service Date: 02/27/2025 ] [25-5036] [Entered: 03/10/2025 11:36 AM]
March 4, 2025 MOTION [2104231] to permit pro se electronic filing status filed by Mr. John H. Page (Service Date: 02/27/2025 by US Mail) Length Certification: 1 page. [25-5036] [Entered: 03/06/2025 11:36 AM]
February 21, 2025 CERTIFIED AND FIRST CLASS MAIL SENT [2101894] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.9589 0710 5270 2357 8534 73] of order [ # 2101698-5 ]. Certified Mail Receipt due 03/24/2025 from John H. Page. [25-5036] [Entered: 02/21/2025 10:22 AM]
February 20, 2025 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [25-5036] [Entered: 02/20/2025 03:21 PM]
February 20, 2025 NOTICE OF APPEAL [2101693] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:25-cv-00018-TJK filed by Mr. John H. Page. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 25-5036. [25-5036] [Entered: 02/20/2025 03:22 PM]
February 20, 2025 CLERK'S ORDER [2101698] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 04/11/2025. APPENDIX due 04/11/2025. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [25-5036] [Entered: 02/20/2025 03:31 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: John Page v. Donald Trump, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John H. Page
Represented By: John H. Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J. Trump
Represented By: Jane M. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John G. Roberts, Jr., In both his personal and professional capacity
Represented By: Jane M. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joint Congressional Committee on Inaugural Ceremonies, In the person of Chairwoman Rep. A. Klobuchar
Represented By: Jane M. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?