HONEYWELL INTL V NOKIA CORP
Defendant-Appellee: FUJIFILM Corporation, Fujifilm U.S.A., Samsung SDI America Inc. and Samsung SDI Co. Ltd.
Plaintiff-Appellant: Honeywell Intellectual Properties Inc. and Honeywell International Inc.
Samsung SDI Co. Ltd.:
Case Number: 10-1121
Filed: December 1, 2009
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit
Presiding Judge:
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
November 1, 2010 HONEYWELL INTL V NOKIA CORP
August 10, 2010 HONEYWELL INTL V NOKIA CORP
February 26, 2010 HONEYWELL INTL V NOKIA CORP
January 29, 2010 HONEYWELL INTL V NOKIA CORP

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: HONEYWELL INTL V NOKIA CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant-appellee: FUJIFILM Corporation
Represented By: ROSENTHAL, LAWRENCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant-appellee: Fujifilm U.S.A.
Represented By: ROSENTHAL, LAWRENCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant-appellee: Samsung SDI America Inc.
Represented By: KORNICZKY, STEPHEN S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant-appellee: Samsung SDI Co. Ltd.
Represented By: BRANN, ELIZABETH L.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff-appellant: Honeywell Intellectual Properties Inc.
Represented By: WOODS, MATTHEW L.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff-appellant: Honeywell International Inc.
Represented By: WOODS, MATTHEW L.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Samsung sdi co. ltd.:
Represented By: PRINCIPAL ATTORNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?